This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/20/2022 at 06:06:39 (UTC).

Citizens Insurance Company of America, et al v. Banyan Tree Management, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 Citizens Insurance Company of America, filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Banyan Tree Management, LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-13581

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

MASSACHUSETTS BAY INSURANCE COMPANY

Not Yet Classified

WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant / Appellant

STARR INDEMNITY & LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant / Appellees

BANYAN TREE MANAGEMENT, LLC

ALBANY DOWNTOWN HOTEL PARTNERS, LLC

JANE DOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Joel S. Isenberg

Attorney at Ely & Isenberg, LLC

3500 Blue Lake Dr Ste 345

Birmingham, AL 35243

Susan H. McCurry

Attorney at Ely & Isenberg, LLC

3500 Blue Lake Dr Ste 345

Birmingham, AL 35243

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Richard H. Hill Jr.

Attorney at Mabry & McClelland, LLP

2200 Century Pkwy Ne Ste 1000

Atlanta, GA 30345-3154

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Carey Michael Johnson

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith, PC

191 Peachtree St Ne Ste 2900

Atlanta, GA 30303

Thomas Kearney Wingfield

Attorney at The Johnson Insurance Law Group, LLC

1629 Monroe Dr Ne

Atlanta, GA 30324

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Shattuck Ely

Attorney at Fellows LaBriola, LLP

233 Peachtree St Ne Ste 2400

Atlanta, GA 30303

Spencer McCartney Taylor I

Attorney at Barze Taylor Noles Lowther, LLC

2204 Lakeshore Dr Ste 425

Birmingham, AL 35209

Sharika Zutshi

Attorney at Fellows LaBriola, LLP

233 Peachtree St Ne Ste 2400

Atlanta, GA 30303

Sarah C. McBrayer

Attorney at Barze Taylor Noles Lowther, LLC

2204 Lakeshore Dr Ste 425

Birmingham, AL 35209

Micajah D. Boatright

Attorney at Arnold & Itkin

6009 Memorial Dr

Houston, TX 77007

Roland T. Christensen

Attorney at Arnold & Itkin

6009 Memorial Dr

Houston, TX 77007

Charles Lloyd Clay Jr.

Attorney at Chuck Clay & Associates, LLC

4401 Northside Pkwy Ste 520

Atlanta, GA 30327

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) Appellant's brief filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. [22-13581] (ECF: Thomas Wingfield) [Entered: 12/14/2022 04:40 PM]

#37

(#37) Appellee-Cross Appellant's Brief filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant Citizens Insurance Company of America and Appellee Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. [22-13581] (ECF: Susan McCurry) [Entered: 12/14/2022 03:46 PM]

#36

(#36) Appellee-Cross Appellant's Brief filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant Westfield Insurance Company. [22-13581] (ECF: Richard Hill) [Entered: 12/14/2022 03:06 PM]

#35

(#35) Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant Citizens Insurance Company of America and Appellee Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company [22-13581] (ECF: Susan McCurry) [Entered: 12/12/2022 07:39 PM]

#34

(#34) Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant-Cross Appellee Starr Indemnity & Liability Company [22-13581] (ECF: Thomas Wingfield) [Entered: 12/12/2022 04:40 PM]

#33

(#33) Response to Jurisdictional Question with incorporated motion to adopt motions or responses filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant Westfield Insurance Company. [22-13581] (ECF: Richard Hill) [Entered: 12/12/2022 03:44 PM]

#32

(#32) MOTION to seal filed by Banyan Tree Management, LLC and Albany Downtown Hotel Partners, LLC. Motion is Unopposed. [32] [22-13581] (ECF: Spencer Taylor) [Entered: 12/09/2022 02:53 PM]

#31

(#31) Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Banyan Tree Management, LLC [22-13581] (ECF: Spencer Taylor) [Entered: 12/09/2022 02:41 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shattuck Ely for Albany Downtown Hotel Partners, LLC and Banyan Tree Management, LLC. [22-13581] (ECF: Shattuck Ely) [Entered: 11/04/2022 10:27 AM]

Open Document #3

USDC Order DE 137

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

USDC Order DE 137

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #3

USDC Order DE 137

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • Docket(#40) Received 4 paper copies of EBrief, filed by Appellant-Cross Appellee Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. [Entered: 12/19/2022 02:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • Docket(#39) Received 4 paper copies of EBrief, filed by Appellee Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company and Appellee-Cross Appellant Citizens Insurance Company of America. [Entered: 12/15/2022 10:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Appellant's brief filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. [22-13581] (ECF: Thomas Wingfield) [Entered: 12/14/2022 04:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Appellee-Cross Appellant's Brief filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant Citizens Insurance Company of America and Appellee Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. [22-13581] (ECF: Susan McCurry) [Entered: 12/14/2022 03:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Appellee-Cross Appellant's Brief filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant Westfield Insurance Company. [22-13581] (ECF: Richard Hill) [Entered: 12/14/2022 03:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant Citizens Insurance Company of America and Appellee Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company [22-13581] (ECF: Susan McCurry) [Entered: 12/12/2022 07:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant-Cross Appellee Starr Indemnity & Liability Company [22-13581] (ECF: Thomas Wingfield) [Entered: 12/12/2022 04:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Response to Jurisdictional Question with incorporated motion to adopt motions or responses filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant Westfield Insurance Company. [22-13581] (ECF: Richard Hill) [Entered: 12/12/2022 03:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION to seal filed by Banyan Tree Management, LLC and Albany Downtown Hotel Partners, LLC. Motion is Unopposed. [32] [22-13581] (ECF: Spencer Taylor) [Entered: 12/09/2022 02:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Banyan Tree Management, LLC [22-13581] (ECF: Spencer Taylor) [Entered: 12/09/2022 02:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Susan H. McCurry for Citizens Insurance Company of America and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company and Susan H. McCurry for Citizens Insurance Company of America and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. [22-13581] (ECF: Susan McCurry) [Entered: 11/04/2022 03:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Joel S. Isenberg for Appellee-Cross Appellant Citizens Insurance Company of America and Appellee Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company and Attorney Joel S. Isenberg for Appellee-Cross Appellant Citizens Insurance Company of America and Appellee Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. No hearings. [22-13581] (ECF: Joel Isenberg) [Entered: 11/04/2022 03:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joel S. Isenberg for Citizens Insurance Company of America and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company and Joel S. Isenberg for Citizens Insurance Company of America and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. [22-13581] (ECF: Joel Isenberg) [Entered: 11/04/2022 03:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Thomas Kearney Wingfield for Appellant-Cross Appellee Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. No hearings. [22-13581] (ECF: Thomas Wingfield) [Entered: 11/04/2022 12:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas K. Wingfield - Starr Indemnity & Liability Company [22-13581] (ECF: Thomas Wingfield) [Entered: 11/04/2022 12:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by C. Michael Johnson for Starr Indemnity & Liability Company Carey Michael Johnson for Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. [22-13581] (ECF: Carey Johnson) [Entered: 11/04/2022 12:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Shattuck Ely for Albany Downtown Hotel Partners, LLC and Banyan Tree Management, LLC. [22-13581] (ECF: Shattuck Ely) [Entered: 11/04/2022 10:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant Westfield Insurance Company on 10/21/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/30/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/09/2022 as to Appellee-Cross Appellant Westfield Insurance Company. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/23/2022 as to Appellee-Cross Appellant Citizens Insurance Company of America, Appellees Albany Downtown Hotel Partners, LLC, Banyan Tree Management, LLC, Jane Doe and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company and Appellant-Cross Appellee Starr Indemnity & Liability Company [Entered: 10/26/2022 02:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellee-Cross Appellant Citizens Insurance Company of America on 10/21/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/30/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/09/2022 as to Appellee-Cross Appellant Citizens Insurance Company of America. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/23/2022 as to Appellees Albany Downtown Hotel Partners, LLC, Banyan Tree Management, LLC, Jane Doe and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company, Appellant-Cross Appellee Starr Indemnity & Liability Company and Appellee-Cross Appellant Westfield Insurance Company [Entered: 10/26/2022 02:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Starr Indemnity & Liability Company on 10/21/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/30/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/09/2022 as to Appellant Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/23/2022 as to Appellees Albany Downtown Hotel Partners, LLC, Banyan Tree Management, LLC, Citizens Insurance Company of America, Jane Doe, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company and Westfield Insurance Company [Entered: 10/26/2022 01:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MASSACHESETTS BAY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Starr Indemnity & Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Citizens Insurance Company of America is a litigant