This case was last updated from PACER on 03/27/2020 at 06:00:24 (UTC).

Citibank, N.A. v. Najda, et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 Citibank, N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Najda. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1057

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

 

Party Details

3Rd Party Defendants

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

PENNYMAC, CORP

CITIMORTGAGE, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellee

CITIBANK, N.A., not in its individual capacity but solely as separate trustee for PMT NPL FINANCING 2015-1

Defendant / Appellants

ANDREW NAJDA

Concord, MA 01742

RENEE ANNA NAJDA

Concord, MA 01742

Interested Party

SANTANDER BANK N.A., f/k/a Sovereign Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

3Rd Party Defendant and Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Kevin Patrick Polansky

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

1 Post Office Sq, 30Th Flr

Boston, MA 02109

Christine Kingston

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

1 Post Office Sq, 30Th Flr

Boston, MA 02109

Jeffrey S. Patterson

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

1 Lincoln St

Boston, MA 02111-2950

Timothy R. DeMarco

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

1 Lincoln St

Boston, MA 02111-2950

Matthew Nelson Lowe

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

1 Lincoln St

Boston, MA 02111-2950

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Andrew Najda

71 Flint Rd

Concord, MA 01742

Renee Anna Najda

71 Flint Rd

Concord, MA 01742

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee CitiMortgage, Inc. in 19-1434, 20-1057 filed by Attorney Edward J. Mikolinski. Certificate of service dated 03/26/2020. [19-1434, 20-1057] (EJM) [Entered: 03/26/2020 12:26 PM]

Open Document #3

2020 03 05 Exhibit B for Motion to Vacate the March 4 2020 Order

Open Document #2

2020 03 05 Exhibit A for Motion to Vacate the March 4 2020 Order

Open Document #1

2020 03 05 Motion to Vacate the March 4 2020 Order

Open Document

NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss for failure to pay the filing fee. Fee due 03/18/2020. [20-1057] (GAK) [Entered: 03/04/2020 01:25 PM]

Open Document

ORDER entered: Appeal Nos. 19-1434 and 20-1057 are consolidated for purposes of briefing and oral argument. See Fed. R. App. P. 3(b)(2). The briefing schedule set in Appeal No. 19-1434 is hereby vacated. The clerk will set a new consolidated briefing schedule. [19-1434, 20-1057] (GB) [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:27 PM]

Open Document #2

Transcript Acknowledgment

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Andrew Najda and Renee Anna Najda indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 02/10/2020. [20-1057] (AN) [Entered: 02/10/2020 01:51 PM]

Open Document #2

Transcript Acknowledgment

Open Document #1

Order Form

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Andrew Najda and Renee Anna Najda indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 02/10/2020. [20-1057] (AN) [Entered: 02/10/2020 12:22 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Andrew Najda and Renee Anna Najda. Certificate of service dated 02/09/2020. [20-1057] (AN) [Entered: 02/09/2020 08:21 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for Attorney Matthew N. Lowe to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellee CitiMortgage, Inc. in 19-1434, 20-1057. Certificate of service dated 03/26/2020. [19-1434, 20-1057] (MNL) [Entered: 03/26/2020 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee CitiMortgage, Inc. in 19-1434, 20-1057 filed by Attorney Edward J. Mikolinski. Certificate of service dated 03/26/2020. [19-1434, 20-1057] (EJM) [Entered: 03/26/2020 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to Vacate the March 4 2020 Order filed by Appellants Andrew Najda and Renee Anna Najda. Certificate of service dated 03/05/2020. [20-1057] (AN) [Entered: 03/05/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of default and intent to dismiss for failure to pay the filing fee. Fee due 03/18/2020. [20-1057] (GAK) [Entered: 03/04/2020 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered: Appeal Nos. 19-1434 and 20-1057 are consolidated for purposes of briefing and oral argument. See Fed. R. App. P. 3(b)(2). The briefing schedule set in Appeal No. 19-1434 is hereby vacated. The clerk will set a new consolidated briefing schedule. [19-1434, 20-1057] (GB) [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Andrew Najda and Renee Anna Najda indicating the following transcript is being ordered: 11/02/2017, Motion Hearing. Transcript due 04/10/2020 from Court Reporter Marcia Gail Patrisso. [20-1057] (GB) [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Andrew Najda and Renee Anna Najda indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 02/10/2020. [20-1057] (AN) [Entered: 02/10/2020 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Andrew Najda and Renee Anna Najda indicating the following transcripts are being ordered: 05/31/2016, Status Conference; 09/14/2017, Status Conference. Transcripts due 04/10/2020 from Court Reporter Marcia Gail Patrisso. [20-1057] (GB) [Entered: 02/10/2020 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Andrew Najda and Renee Anna Najda indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 02/10/2020. [20-1057] (AN) [Entered: 02/10/2020 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Andrew Najda and Renee Anna Najda. Certificate of service dated 02/09/2020. [20-1057] (AN) [Entered: 02/09/2020 08:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Marcia Gail Patrisso: 11/02/2017, Motion Hearing. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [20-1057] (GB) [Entered: 01/28/2020 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #449) filed by Appellants Andrew Najda and Renee Anna Najda. Transcript Report/Order form, and Fee due 02/10/2020. [20-1057] (RMK) [Entered: 01/27/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITIBANK, N.A., not in its individual capacity but solely as separate trustee for PMT NPL FINANCING 2015-1 is a litigant

Latest cases where PENNYMAC CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where PennyMac Loan Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant