This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/29/2021 at 11:44:54 (UTC).

Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Gage Bros. Concrete Products

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Cincinnati Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Gage Bros Concrete Products. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2184

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Cincinnati Insurance Company

Defendant / Appellee

Gage Bros. Concrete Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Dennis Michael Dolan

Attorney at LITCHFIELD & CAVO

Suite 300, 303 W. Madison

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

Mark William Haigh

Attorney at EVANS & HAIGH

101 N. Main Avenue, P.O. Box 2790

Sioux Falls, SD 57101

Laurence J. Tooth

Attorney at LITCHFIELD & CAVO

Suite 300, 303 W. Madison

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Justin T. Clarke

Attorney at DAVENPORT & EVANS

206 W. 14Th Street, P.O. Box 1030

Sioux Falls, SD 57104-1030

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED. [5046627] [21-2184] (CRJ) [Entered: 06/17/2021 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - The case is dismissed in accordance with Rule 42(b), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Mandate shall issue forthwith. [5046623] [21-2184] (CRJ) [Entered: 06/17/2021 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION for dismissal filed by Appellant Cincinnati Insurance Company. w/service 06/16/2021 [5046198] [21-2184] (DMD) [Entered: 06/16/2021 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER from Appellant Cincinnati Insurance Company regarding Notification of possible settlement; notification of not filing Designation & Statement of of Issues, and possible motion to be filed seeking to extend the briefing schedule if matter is not dismissed before Apellant's brief is due on July 6, 2021.. w/service 06/09/2021 [5043599] [21-2184] (DMD) [Entered: 06/09/2021 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellant Cincinnati Insurance Company. No Transcript[5040984] [21-2184] (DMD) [Entered: 06/01/2021 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Cincinnati Insurance Company. - FOR CAL [5040832] [21-2184] (DMD) [Entered: 06/01/2021 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Mark W. Haigh for Appellant Cincinnati Insurance Company w/service 05/28/2021 [5040496] [21-2184] (MWH) [Entered: 05/28/2021 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Dennis M. Dolan for Appellant Cincinnati Insurance Company w/service 05/28/2021 [5040319] [21-2184] (DMD) [Entered: 05/28/2021 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 07/06/2021. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Cincinnati Insurance Company due 07/06/2021. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [5039497] [21-2184] (CBO) [Entered: 05/26/2021 12:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of docket entries, memorandum opinion and order filed 4/23/2021, judgment filed 4/23/2021, and notice of appeal filed 5/24/2021. [5039496] [21-2184] (CBO) [Entered: 05/26/2021 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [5039492] [21-2184] (CBO) [Entered: 05/26/2021 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin T. Clarke