This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/20/2021 at 06:45:52 (UTC).

Ciaran Redmond v. USA

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Ciaran Redmond filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55142

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Petitioner / Appellant

CIARAN PAUL REDMOND, AKA Irish

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Saurish Appleby-Bhattacharjee

Bram Alden

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Benjamin Lee Coleman

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2021

Docket(#4) Streamlined request [3] by Appellant Ciaran Paul Redmond to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Ciaran Paul Redmond opening brief due 05/20/2021. Appellee United States of America answering brief due 06/21/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12076458] (BG) [Entered: 04/15/2021 05:03 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2021

Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Ciaran Paul Redmond. New requested due date is 05/20/2021. [12074999] [21-55142] (Coleman, Benjamin) [Entered: 04/15/2021 07:48 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2021

Docket(#2) Criminal Justice Act electronic voucher created. (Counsel: Mr. Benjamin Lee Coleman for Ciaran Paul Redmond) [12023095] (JN) [Entered: 03/03/2021 01:50 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Ciaran Paul Redmond opening brief due 04/20/2021. Appellee United States of America answering brief due 05/20/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12010309] (OC) [Entered: 02/19/2021 03:54 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less