This case was last updated from PACER on 04/25/2020 at 06:22:59 (UTC).

Chuck McCullough v. G. Dodkin

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 Chuck McCullough filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against G Dodkin. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-6271

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent

ALAN WILSON

Respondent / Appellee

WARDEN G. DODKIN

Petitioner / Appellant

CHUCK EDWARD MCCULLOUGH

Una, SC 29378-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

William Joseph Maye Esq.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA

P. O. Box 11549

Columbia, SC 29211-1549

Melody Jane Brown

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA

P. O. Box 11549

Columbia, SC 29211-1549

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Chuck Edward McCullough

Attorney at LIVESAY CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P. O. Box 580

Una, SC 29378-0000

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Chuck Edward McCullough. [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 03/24/2020 02:25 PM]

#5

(#5) INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Chuck McCullough. Informal Opening Brief due 04/03/2020 [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 03/10/2020 10:31 AM]

#4

(#4) DISTRICT COURT NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court for follow-up on COA limited remand determination.. [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 03/06/2020 10:35 AM]

#3

(#3) ORDER filed remanding case for limited purpose [4cca retains jurisdiction] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Chuck McCullough. [1000690741] [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 02/25/2020 04:45 PM]

#1

(#1) Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 4:19-cv-00388-MGL. Date notice of appeal filed: 02/20/2020. Case manager: JMoore. Did district court rule on COA? No. [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 02/25/2020 04:18 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Chuck Edward McCullough. [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 03/24/2020 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Chuck McCullough. Informal Opening Brief due 04/03/2020 [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 03/10/2020 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISTRICT COURT NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court for follow-up on COA limited remand determination.. [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 03/06/2020 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER filed remanding case for limited purpose [4cca retains jurisdiction] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Chuck McCullough. [1000690741] [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 02/25/2020 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#2) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 4:19-cv-00388-MGL. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. State court paper record requested in 2254 case?No [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 02/25/2020 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 4:19-cv-00388-MGL. Date notice of appeal filed: 02/20/2020. Case manager: JMoore. Did district court rule on COA? No. [20-6271] JHM [Entered: 02/25/2020 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less