This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:02:51 (UTC).

Christopher Wooten v. Stan Parker, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Christopher Wooten filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Stan Parker. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10782

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

FNU GREEN, Judge, Howard County

FNU AVERETT, Howard County Deputy Sheriff

STAN PARKER, Howard County Sheriff

TIMOTHY GREEN, Magistrate, Howard County

COLLEEN BARTON, Howard County District Clerk

ROBERT H. MOORE, III, Judge

FNU BUCHANAN, Howard County Deputy Sheriff

TIMOTHY D. YEATS, Howard County Judge, 118th District

Plaintiff / Appellant

CHRISTOPHER WOOTEN

Huntsville, TX 77349-0005

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Christopher Wooten

Attorney at CID Wynne Prison

810 Fm 2821, W. Highway 75, N.

Huntsville, TX 77349-0005

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9132520-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Wooten. [9132520-1] [19-10782] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:17 PM]

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Wooten [19-10782] (CCR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:54 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Review after Fee Issue is Resolved (PLRA case). [9102556-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 09/16/2019 for Appellant Christopher Wooten [19-10782] (CCR) [Entered: 07/22/2019 10:43 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Review after Fee Issue is Resolved (PLRA case). [9138732-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-10782] (WMJ) [Entered: 09/06/2019 09:59 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Review after Fee Issue is Resolved (PLRA case). [9138732-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-10782] (WMJ) [Entered: 09/06/2019 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9132520-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Wooten. [9132520-1] [19-10782] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Review after Fee Issue is Resolved (PLRA case). [9102556-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 09/16/2019 for Appellant Christopher Wooten [19-10782] (CCR) [Entered: 07/22/2019 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Wooten [19-10782] (CCR) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.