This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/11/2020 at 06:11:52 (UTC).

Christopher Woodrow v. Worldview Entertainment Holdin, et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 Christopher Woodrow filed an Other lawsuit against Worldview Entertainment Holdin. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1140

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

CHRISTOPHER WOODROW

Debtor

In re: CHRISTOPHER WOODROW

Appellees

ROSELAND VENTURES LLC

WORLDVIEW ENTERTAINMENT PARTNERS VII LLC

WORLDVIEW ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS INC.

ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS LLC

WORLDVIEW ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

David W. Affeld

2049 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Damion D. D. Robinson

2049 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Damion Robinson

Attorney at Affeld Grivakes LLP

2049 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Appellee Attorneys

Paul B. Salvaty

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars

Los Angeles, CA 90067

David W. Skaar

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Notice of Referral

2 #1

Opening Letter

#2

Bankruptcy Court Notice Form

3 #1

Designation of Record

3 #2

Notice of Transcript

#3

Statement of Issues

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of the amended notice of appeal filed in Bk. Ct. 07/29/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 07/30/2020 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of Designation of Record, Notice of Transcript and Statement of Issues. filed in Bk. Ct. 06/25/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 06/26/2020 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice to all parties and Bankruptcy Court RE: BAP Case number assigned: 20-1140. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court.--[Edited 06/12/2020 by CLS] (CLS) [Entered: 06/12/2020 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 06/11/2020 and notice of referral. (CLS) [Entered: 06/12/2020 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Entertainment Holding is a litigant

Latest cases where Roseland Ventures LLC is a litigant