This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/27/2020 at 06:12:10 (UTC).

Christopher Woodrow v. Worldview Entertainment Holdin, et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 Christopher Woodrow filed an Other lawsuit against Worldview Entertainment Holdin. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1128

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

CHRISTOPHER WOODROW

Debtor

In re: CHRISTOPHER WOODROW

Appellees

ROSELAND VENTURES LLC

WORLDVIEW ENTERTAINMENT PARTNERS VII LLC

WORLDVIEW ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS INC.

ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

David W. Affeld

2049 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Damion D. D. Robinson

2049 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Damion Robinson

Attorney at Affeld Grivakes LLP

2049 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Appellee Attorneys

Paul B. Salvaty

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars

Los Angeles, CA 90067

David W. Skaar

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Notice of Referral

2 #1

Opening Letter

#2

Bankruptcy Court Notice Form

2 #3

BAP Rules

2 #4

E-Filing Administrative Order

#3

4 #1

designation of record

4 #2

statement of issues

4 #3

notice of transcripts

#5

#6

#7

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of readiness docketed. (CLS) [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Sent Notice of Mandatory Attorney Electronic Filing form to David W. Affeld for Appellant Christopher Woodrow, Damion D. D. Robinson for Appellant Christopher Woodrow, Paul B. Salvaty for Appellees Worldview Entertainment Holdings Inc., Entertainment Holdings LLC, Roseland Ventures LLC and Worldview Entertainment Partners VII LLC and David W. Skaar for Appellees Worldview Entertainment Holdings Inc., Entertainment Holdings LLC, Roseland Ventures LLC and Worldview Entertainment Partners VII LLC with note that no further paper filings will be accepted. (CLS) [Entered: 06/24/2020 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Received from bk ct. regarding appellants response to the Clerks notice about finality ;served on 06/11/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 06/24/2020 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Received from Bankruptcy Court copy of Appellant's designation of record, statement of issues and notice of transcripts filed in Bk. Ct. 06/10/2020. (CLS) [Entered: 06/11/2020 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Clerk's Order (CLS) ; by TUESDAY, JUNE 23, 2020, appellant must file a written response either 1) providing a legally adequate explanation how the order on appeal is final and immediately reviewable on appeal or 2) moving for leave to appeal. Alternatively, if appellant no longer desires to appeal the order, he may file a motion or stipulation to voluntarily dismiss the appeal. See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8023. (CLS) [Entered: 06/02/2020 08:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice to all parties and Bankruptcy Court RE: BAP Case number assigned: 20-1128. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. (CLS) [Entered: 05/29/2020 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 05/27/2020 and notice of referral. (CLS) [Entered: 05/28/2020 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Entertainment Holding is a litigant