Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2020 at 08:18:55 (UTC).

Christopher Peek v. Suntrust Bank, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 Christopher Peek filed an Other lawsuit against Suntrust Bank, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-7059

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Christopher Earl Peek

Washington, DC 20018

Defendant / Appellee

Suntrust Bank, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Christopher Earl Peek

3721 30Th Place, Ne

Washington, DC 20018

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Matthew A. Egeli

Attorney at Egeli Law Firm, PLLC

Po Box 3208

Staunton, VA 24402-3208

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1856169] filed dismissing as moot motion to permit pro se electronic filing [ # 1853936-2 ]; Appellant was granted leave to participate as an ECF filer on 08/29/2018 in No. 18-7117; granting motion to extend time [ # 1853935-2 ]; APPELLANTand APPELLEE dispositive motions, if any, due 09/14/2020 [20-7059] [Entered: 08/12/2020 09:07 AM]

Open Document

MOTION [1853936] to permit pro se electronic filing status filed by Christopher Earl Peek [Service Date: 07/29/2020 ] Length Certification: 1 page. [20-7059] [Entered: 07/29/2020 11:08 AM]

Open Document

MOTION [1853935] to extend time to file initial submissions filed by Christopher Earl Peek (Service Date: 07/29/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2 pages. [20-7059] [Entered: 07/29/2020 11:06 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1853930] filed by Christopher Earl Peek [Service Date: 07/29/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-7059] [Entered: 07/29/2020 11:00 AM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1853928] filed by [Service Date: 07/29/2020 ] [20-7059] [Entered: 07/29/2020 10:59 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1853924] filed by Christopher Earl Peek. [20-7059] [Entered: 07/29/2020 10:52 AM]

Open Document

UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1853920] submitted by Christopher Earl Peek [Service Date: 07/29/2020 ] [20-7059] [Entered: 07/29/2020 10:48 AM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1853916] filed by Christopher Earl Peek [Service Date: 07/29/2020 ] [20-7059] [Entered: 07/29/2020 10:45 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1853915] filed by Christopher Earl Peek [Service Date: 07/29/2020 ] [20-7059] [Entered: 07/29/2020 10:44 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1852679] filed by Suntrust Bank, Inc. [Service Date: 07/21/2020 ] [20-7059] (Egeli, Matthew) [Entered: 07/21/2020 10:49 AM]

Open Document

STATEMENT [1852676] with Disclosure Listing filed by Suntrust Bank, Inc. [Service Date: 07/21/2020 ] [20-7059] (Egeli, Matthew) [Entered: 07/21/2020 10:41 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1852213] filed by Matthew A. Egeli on behalf of Appellee Suntrust Bank, Inc.. [20-7059] (Egeli, Matthew) [Entered: 07/17/2020 10:55 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1849526] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/30/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/30/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/30/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/30/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/30/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 07/30/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/30/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/30/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/14/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/30/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/30/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/30/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/14/2020. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [20-7059] [Entered: 06/30/2020 12:23 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1849520] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00658-CRC filed by Christopher Earl Peek. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-7059. [20-7059] [Entered: 06/30/2020 12:15 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1856169] filed dismissing as moot motion to permit pro se electronic filing [ # 1853936-2 ]; Appellant was granted leave to participate as an ECF filer on 08/29/2018 in No. 18-7117; granting motion to extend time [ # 1853935-2 ]; APPELLANTand APPELLEE dispositive motions, if any, due 09/14/2020 [20-7059] [Entered: 08/12/2020 09:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1853936] to permit pro se electronic filing status filed by Christopher Earl Peek [Service Date: 07/29/2020 ] Length Certification: 1 page. [20-7059] [Entered: 07/29/2020 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1853935] to extend time to file initial submissions filed by Christopher Earl Peek (Service Date: 07/29/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2 pages. [20-7059] [Entered: 07/29/2020 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1853930] filed by Christopher Earl Peek [Service Date: 07/29/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-7059] [Entered: 07/29/2020 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1853928] filed by [Service Date: 07/29/2020 ] [20-7059] [Entered: 07/29/2020 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1853924] filed by Christopher Earl Peek. [20-7059] [Entered: 07/29/2020 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1853920] submitted by Christopher Earl Peek [Service Date: 07/29/2020 ] [20-7059] [Entered: 07/29/2020 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1853916] filed by Christopher Earl Peek [Service Date: 07/29/2020 ] [20-7059] [Entered: 07/29/2020 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1853915] filed by Christopher Earl Peek [Service Date: 07/29/2020 ] [20-7059] [Entered: 07/29/2020 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1852679] filed by Suntrust Bank, Inc. [Service Date: 07/21/2020 ] [20-7059] (Egeli, Matthew) [Entered: 07/21/2020 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT [1852676] with Disclosure Listing filed by Suntrust Bank, Inc. [Service Date: 07/21/2020 ] [20-7059] (Egeli, Matthew) [Entered: 07/21/2020 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1852213] filed by Matthew A. Egeli on behalf of Appellee Suntrust Bank, Inc.. [20-7059] (Egeli, Matthew) [Entered: 07/17/2020 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1849626] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7017 3040 0001 1261 2984] of order [ # 1849526-6 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 07/30/2020 from Christopher Earl Peek. [20-7059] [Entered: 06/30/2020 06:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1849526] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/30/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/30/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/30/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/30/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/30/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 07/30/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/30/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/30/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/14/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/30/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/30/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/30/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/14/2020. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [20-7059] [Entered: 06/30/2020 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1849520] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-00658-CRC filed by Christopher Earl Peek. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-7059. [20-7059] [Entered: 06/30/2020 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-7059] [Entered: 06/30/2020 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNTRUST BANKS INC is a litigant