Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2020 at 06:12:44 (UTC).

Christopher Oddo, et al v. Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Christopher Oddo filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2338

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLES MARVASSO, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendant / Appellee

BIMBO BAKERIES USA INC

Plaintiff / Appellants

PHILIP BRUCATO, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED

MICHAEL LENNON, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED

CHRISTOPHER ODDO, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND THOSE SIMILARLY SITUATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Bradley J. Crowell Esq.

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael J. Puma Esq.

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

James D. Nelson Esq.

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 800 North

Washington, DC 20004

David B. Salmons Esq.

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 800 North

Washington, DC 20004

Lauren E. Marzullo Esq.

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

301 Grant Street, One Oxford Centre, Suite 3200

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Justin L. Swidler Esq.

Attorney at Swartz Swidler

1101 Kings Highway North, Suite 402

Cherry Hill, NJ 08034

Richard S. Swartz Esq.

Attorney at Swartz Swidler

1101 Kings Highway North, Suite 402

Cherry Hill, NJ 08034

Matthew D. Miller Esq.

Attorney at Swartz Swidler

1101 Kings Highway North, Suite 402

Cherry Hill, NJ 08034

Joshua S. Boyette Esq.

Attorney at Swartz Swidler

1101 Kings Highway North, Suite 402

Cherry Hill, NJ 08034

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joshua S. Boyette, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Christopher Oddo, Phillip Brucato, Michael Lennon, Charles Marvasso, on behalf of themselves and all those similarly situated. [20-2338] (JSB) [Entered: 07/23/2020 01:28 PM]

13 #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

13 #1

Mediation Instructions

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Philip Brucato, Michael Lennon and Christopher Oddo. [20-2338] (MDM) [Entered: 07/15/2020 08:58 PM]

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Philip Brucato, Michael Lennon and Christopher Oddo. [20-2338] (MDM) [Entered: 07/15/2020 08:57 PM]

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Philip Brucato, Michael Lennon and Christopher Oddo advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [20-2338] (MDM) [Entered: 07/15/2020 08:56 PM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Charles Marvasso, on behalf of himself and those similarly situated. on behalf of Appellants Philip Brucato, Michael Lennon and Christopher Oddo. [20-2338] (MDM) [Entered: 07/15/2020 08:55 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew D. Miller, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Christopher Oddo, Philip Brucato, Michael Lennon, Charles Marvasso, on behalf of themselves and those similarly situated. [20-2338] (MDM) [Entered: 07/15/2020 08:53 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David B. Salmons on behalf of Appellee(s) Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc.. [20-2338] (DBS) [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:32 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc. [20-2338] (MJP) [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:29 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael J. Puma on behalf of Appellee(s) Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc.. [20-2338] (MJP) [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:27 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James D. Nelson on behalf of Appellee(s) Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc.. [20-2338] (JDN) [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:20 PM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lauren E. Marzullo on behalf of Appellee(s) Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc.. [20-2338] (LEM) [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:16 PM]

1 #5

Case Caption

1 #4

District Court Judgment

1 #3

District Court Order dated 052920

1 #2

District Court Order dated 081319

#1

Civil Case Docketed

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joshua S. Boyette, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Christopher Oddo, Phillip Brucato, Michael Lennon, Charles Marvasso, on behalf of themselves and all those similarly situated. [20-2338] (JSB) [Entered: 07/23/2020 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 07/22/2020 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Philip Brucato, Michael Lennon and Christopher Oddo. [20-2338] (MDM) [Entered: 07/15/2020 08:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Philip Brucato, Michael Lennon and Christopher Oddo. [20-2338] (MDM) [Entered: 07/15/2020 08:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Philip Brucato, Michael Lennon and Christopher Oddo advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [20-2338] (MDM) [Entered: 07/15/2020 08:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Charles Marvasso, on behalf of himself and those similarly situated. on behalf of Appellants Philip Brucato, Michael Lennon and Christopher Oddo. [20-2338] (MDM) [Entered: 07/15/2020 08:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew D. Miller, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Christopher Oddo, Philip Brucato, Michael Lennon, Charles Marvasso, on behalf of themselves and those similarly situated. [20-2338] (MDM) [Entered: 07/15/2020 08:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David B. Salmons on behalf of Appellee(s) Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc.. [20-2338] (DBS) [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc. [20-2338] (MJP) [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael J. Puma on behalf of Appellee(s) Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc.. [20-2338] (MJP) [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James D. Nelson on behalf of Appellee(s) Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc.. [20-2338] (JDN) [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lauren E. Marzullo on behalf of Appellee(s) Bimbo Bakeries USA Inc.. [20-2338] (LEM) [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 07/01/2020 08:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Philip Brucato, Michael Lennon and Christopher Oddo in District Court No. 2-17-cv-04775. (PDB) [Entered: 07/01/2020 08:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard S. Swartz Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSHUA S. BOYETTE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew D. Miller