This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:33 (UTC).

Christopher Nelson v. Tim Shoop

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Christopher Nelson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Tim Shoop. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3667

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

TIM SHOOP, Warden

Petitioner / Appellant

CHRISTOPHER D. NELSON

Chillicothe, OH 45601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Mary Anne Reese

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

441 Vine Street, Suite 1600

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Christopher D. Nelson

Attorney at Chillicothe Correctional Institution

P.O. Box 5500

Chillicothe, OH 45601

 

Court Documents

5 #2

show cause order filed

#9

(#9) RESPONSE filed to the show cause for jurisdiction - late noa, [ # 5 ]. Response filed by Party Christopher D. Nelson. (LAJ) [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:53 AM]

#3

(#3) Copy of notice of appeal filed in 6th Circuit, and forwarded to district court for filing. (LAJ) [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:15 AM]

#7

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant Christopher D. Nelson. Transcript needed: n. (LAJ) [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:02 PM]

#8

RESTRICTED

5 #1

Cover Letter

#6

(#6) Appellant MOTION filed by Christopher D. Nelson to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 07/19/2019. (LAJ) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:36 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Tim Shoop by Mary Anne Reese. Certificate of Service: 07/17/2019. [19-3667] (MAR) [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:53 AM]

10 #2

court order filed

10 #1

Cover Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the show-cause order is WITHDRAWN. Entered by order of the court. (LAJ) [Entered: 09/12/2019 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE filed to the show cause for jurisdiction - late noa, [ # 5 ]. Response filed by Party Christopher D. Nelson. (LAJ) [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Prisoner trust account statement filed. (LAJ) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Financial Affidavit filed by Party Christopher D. Nelson. Certificate of Service: 07/19/2019. (LAJ) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Appellant MOTION filed by Christopher D. Nelson to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 07/19/2019. (LAJ) [Entered: 07/29/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SHOW CAUSE order filed to have Appellant Christopher D. Nelson show cause for possible jurisdictional defect involving the filing of a late notice of appeal. Response due by 08/08/2019 for Christopher D. Nelson. (LAJ) [Entered: 07/18/2019 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Tim Shoop by Mary Anne Reese. Certificate of Service: 07/17/2019. [19-3667] (MAR) [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Copy of notice of appeal filed in 6th Circuit, and forwarded to district court for filing. (LAJ) [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Laura Jones (LAJ) [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied. Notice filed by Appellant Christopher D. Nelson. Transcript needed: n. (LAJ) [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.