This case was last updated from PACER on 06/28/2019 at 06:09:34 (UTC).

Christine Dancel v. Groupon, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 Christine Dancel filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Groupon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1831

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

CHRISTINE DANCEL

Defendant / Appellee

GROUPON, INC., a Delaware Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Ryan D. Andrews

Attorney at EDELSON P.C.

350 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

John Lawson

Attorney at EDELSON, P.C.

123 Townsend Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

Benjamin Thomassen

Attorney at EDELSON P.C.

350 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher Sean Moore

Attorney at NOVACK & MACEY LLP

100 N. Riverside Plaza

Chicago, IL 60606-1501

Eric N. Macey

Attorney at NOVAK AND MACEY, LLP

100 N. Riverside Plaza

Chicago, IL 60606

Brian Eliot Cohen

Attorney at NOVACK & MACEY LLP

100 N. Riverside Plaza

Chicago, IL 60606-1501

Elizabeth Deshaies

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

35 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-9703

Linda T. Coberly

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

35 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-9703

Scott P. Glauberman

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

35 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-9703

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Order issued GRANTING unopposed motion to extend time to file appellee's brief. [ # 11 ] Appellee's brief due on or before 07/24/2019 for Groupon, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/14/2019 for Appellant Christine Dancel. CMD [12] [7011368] [19-1831] (ER) [Entered: 06/14/2019 12:28 PM]

#11

(#11) Motion filed by Appellee Groupon, Inc. to extend time to file appellee brief. [11] [7011330] [19-1831] (Coberly, Linda) [Entered: 06/14/2019 10:37 AM]

#10

(#10) Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Christine Dancel. Paper copies due on 06/18/2019. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/10/2019 for Groupon, Inc. Electronically Transmitted. [10] [7010378] [19-1831] (PNR) [Entered: 06/11/2019 09:01 AM]

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Benjamin S. Thomassen for Appellant Christine Dancel. [8] [7010335] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1831]--[Edited 06/11/2019 by FP to reflect that atty. Thomassen is added to the docket.] (Thomassen, Benjamin) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:17 PM]

#7

(#7) Docketing Statement filed by Appellee Groupon, Inc.. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 19-8006 [7] [7005462] [19-1831] (Coberly, Linda) [Entered: 05/17/2019 11:11 AM]

#6

(#6) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Christine Dancel. [6] [7004574] [19-1831] (JR) [Entered: 05/14/2019 02:11 PM]

#5

(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Scott Glauberman for Appellee Groupon, Inc.. [5] [7004172] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1831]--[Edited 05/13/2019 by FP to reflect that atty. Glauberman is added to the docket.] (Glauberman, Scott) [Entered: 05/13/2019 01:39 PM]

#4

(#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Elizabeth Deshaies for Appellee Groupon, Inc.. [4] [7004112] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1831]--[Edited 05/13/2019 by PS - to reflect addition of counsel.] (Deshaies, Elizabeth) [Entered: 05/13/2019 11:13 AM]

#3

(#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Linda Coberly for Appellee Groupon, Inc.. [3] [7004095] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1831] (Coberly, Linda) [Entered: 05/13/2019 10:25 AM]

#2

(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Christine Dancel. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. No. 19-8006 [2] [7002581] [19-1831] (Andrews, Ryan) [Entered: 05/03/2019 05:57 PM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • (#14) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Christopher Sean Moore for Appellee Groupon, Inc. has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [14] [7013986] [19-1831] (LJ) [Entered: 06/27/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • (#13) NOTICE: Circuit Rule 46(a) requires lead counsel be admitted to practice within 30 days of the date the appeal/petition was docketed. The rule also requires any attorney wishing to present oral argument to be admitted. Our records indicate as of this date Attorney Mr. Brian Eliot Cohen for Appellee Groupon, Inc. has/have not been admitted to practice in this court. Within 21 days, please file your application for admission by going to: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/forms/forms7.htm and choosing the link, "Application for Admission to Practice in the Seventh Circuit". [13] [7013903] [19-1831] (LJ) [Entered: 06/27/2019 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Order issued GRANTING unopposed motion to extend time to file appellee's brief. [ # 11 ] Appellee's brief due on or before 07/24/2019 for Groupon, Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 08/14/2019 for Appellant Christine Dancel. CMD [12] [7011368] [19-1831] (ER) [Entered: 06/14/2019 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Motion filed by Appellee Groupon, Inc. to extend time to file appellee brief. [11] [7011330] [19-1831] (Coberly, Linda) [Entered: 06/14/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Christine Dancel. Paper copies due on 06/18/2019. Appellee's brief due on or before 07/10/2019 for Groupon, Inc. Electronically Transmitted. [10] [7010378] [19-1831] (PNR) [Entered: 06/11/2019 09:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Submitted appellant brief by Ryan D Andrews for Appellant Christine Dancel. [9] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7010347] [19-1831] (Andrews, Ryan) [Entered: 06/10/2019 08:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Benjamin S. Thomassen for Appellant Christine Dancel. [8] [7010335] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1831]--[Edited 06/11/2019 by FP to reflect that atty. Thomassen is added to the docket.] (Thomassen, Benjamin) [Entered: 06/10/2019 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Docketing Statement filed by Appellee Groupon, Inc.. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. 19-8006 [7] [7005462] [19-1831] (Coberly, Linda) [Entered: 05/17/2019 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Christine Dancel. [6] [7004574] [19-1831] (JR) [Entered: 05/14/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Scott Glauberman for Appellee Groupon, Inc.. [5] [7004172] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1831]--[Edited 05/13/2019 by FP to reflect that atty. Glauberman is added to the docket.] (Glauberman, Scott) [Entered: 05/13/2019 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Elizabeth Deshaies for Appellee Groupon, Inc.. [4] [7004112] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1831]--[Edited 05/13/2019 by PS - to reflect addition of counsel.] (Deshaies, Elizabeth) [Entered: 05/13/2019 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Linda Coberly for Appellee Groupon, Inc.. [3] [7004095] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1831] (Coberly, Linda) [Entered: 05/13/2019 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Christine Dancel. Prior or Related proceedings: Yes. No. 19-8006 [2] [7002581] [19-1831] (Andrews, Ryan) [Entered: 05/03/2019 05:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Case transferred from Miscellaneous Docket No. 19-8006. [7001254-2] [7001254] [19-1831, 19-8006] (CAG) [Entered: 04/29/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Christine Dancel by 05/06/2019. Transcript information sheet due by 05/13/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/10/2019 for Christine Dancel. [1] [7001245] [19-1831] (CAG) [Entered: 04/29/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less