This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/14/2020 at 06:37:47 (UTC).

Christine Asia Co. Ltd v. Ma

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 Christine Asia Co Ltd filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Ma. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3823

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Defendants

Jonathan Zhaoxi Lu

Joseph C. Tsai

Maggie Wei Wu

Jack Yun Ma

Plaintiff / Appellees

Raymond Lee

Claire Rand

Placidius O'Silva

Ming Huang

Arthur Gabriel

James Ziolkowski

Devorah Klein

Manishkumar Khunt, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Gang Liu

Tai William

Christine Asia Co. Ltd.

Christine Ziolkowski

Abel Amoros

Defendant / Appellee

Alibaba Group Holding Limited

Plaintiff / Appellant

Myrtle Tan Chao

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Phillip C. Kim

Attorney at The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.

275 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Robert Craig Finkel Esq.

Attorney at Wolf Popper LLP

845 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Amber L. Eck Esq.

Attorney at Zeldes Haeggquist & Eck, LLP

225 Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Laurence Mathew Rosen Esq.

Attorney at Laurence Rosen, Esq.

275 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Joseph P. Guglielmo Esq.

Attorney at Scott & Scott, Attorneys at Law, LLP

The Helmsley Building, 230 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10169

Jeremy Alan Lieberman Esq.

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10016

David Avi Rosenfeld Esq.

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

58 South Service Road

Melville, NY 11747

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

George S. Wang

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Stephen Blake Esq.

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

2475 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Long Z. Liu Esq.

Attorney at The Liu Law Firm

529 East Valley Boulevard

San Gabriel, CA 91776

Abraham S. Odabachian Esq.

Attorney at Liu Law, Inc.

123 East Valley Boulevard

San Gabriel, CA 91776

 

Court Documents

#48

#47

#46

#40

#39

#31

#30

#28

#27

#24

#23

#22

#20

#17

#14

#7

6 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

6 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 01/02/2020, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][2741820] [19-3823] [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[2741798] [19-3823] [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[2741792] [19-3823] [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) CURED DEFECTIVE FRAP 42 STIPULATION, [ # 40 ], on behalf of Appellant Myrtle Tan Chao and Appellees Abel Amoros, Christine Asia Co. Ltd., Arthur Gabriel, Ming Huang, Manishkumar Khunt, Devorah Klein, Raymond Lee, Gang Liu, Placidius O'Silva, Claire Rand, Tai William, Christine Ziolkowski and James Ziolkowski, FILED.[2740560] [19-3823] [Entered: 12/30/2019 03:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 12/30/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2740454] [19-3823] [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FRAP 42 Stipulation, [38], on behalf of Appellant Myrtle Tan Chao and Appellees Abel Amoros, Christine Asia Co. Ltd., Arthur Gabriel, Ming Huang, Manishkumar Khunt, Devorah Klein, Raymond Lee, Gang Liu, Placidius O'Silva, Claire Rand, Tai William, Christine Ziolkowski and James Ziolkowski, FILED.[2740275] [19-3823] [Entered: 12/30/2019 12:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Docket(#38) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 12/30/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2740262] [19-3823] [Entered: 12/30/2019 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) CURED DEFECTIVE FRAP 42 Stipulation, [ # 31 ], on behalf of Appellant Myrtle Tan Chao and Appellees Abel Amoros, Christine Asia Co. Ltd., Arthur Gabriel, Ming Huang, Manishkumar Khunt, Devorah Klein, Raymond Lee, Gang Liu, Placidius O'Silva, Claire Rand, Tai William, Christine Ziolkowski and James Ziolkowski, FILED.[2738009] [19-3823] [Entered: 12/26/2019 10:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 12/23/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2737713] [19-3823] [Entered: 12/23/2019 05:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FRAP 42 Stipulation, [29], on behalf of Appellant Myrtle Tan Chao and Appellees Abel Amoros, Christine Asia Co. Ltd., Arthur Gabriel, Ming Huang, Manishkumar Khunt, Devorah Klein, Raymond Lee, Gang Liu, Placidius O'Silva, Claire Rand, Tai William, Christine Ziolkowski and James Ziolkowski, FILED.[2736602] [19-3823] [Entered: 12/23/2019 09:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellant Myrtle Tan Chao, FILED. Service date 11/20/2019 by email.[2711801] [19-3823] [Entered: 11/21/2019 09:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • Docket(#16) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Abraham S. Odabachian, Esq. for Appellant Myrtle Tan Chao, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2711787] [19-3823] [Entered: 11/21/2019 09:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellant Myrtle Tan Chao, FILED. Service date 09/26/2019 by US mail.[2711323] [19-3823] [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docket(#12) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Long Z. Liu, Esq. for Appellant Myrtle Tan Chao, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2711234] [19-3823] [Entered: 11/20/2019 01:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2709051] [19-3823] [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2709044] [19-3823] [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docket(#5) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Myrtle Tan Chao, district court receipt # ANYSDC-18067867, FILED.[2709038] [19-3823] [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 10/16/2019, RECEIVED.[2709030] [19-3823] [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 10/16/2019, RECEIVED.[2709028] [19-3823] [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Myrtle Tan Chao, FILED. [2709017] [19-3823] [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less