This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/03/2020 at 23:00:07 (UTC).

Christina Williams, et al v. Medley Opportunity Fund II, LP, et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 Christina Williams filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Medley Opportunity Fund II, LP. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2058

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Appellants

ONLINE LENDERS ALLIANCE

AMERICAN LEGISLATIVE EXCHANGE COUNCIL

AMERICAN CONSUMER INSTITUTE

CENTER FOR INDIVIDUAL FREEDOM

NATIVE AMERICAN FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION

ANTHONY M. SABINO

Mineola, NY 11501

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

MEDLEY OPPORTUNITY FUND II, LP

BRIAN MCGOWAN

MARK CURRY

VINCENT NEY

Defendant / Appellant

RED STONE INC, As Successor In Interest to MacFarlane Group Inc

Plaintiff / Appellees

MICHAEL STERMEL, On Behalf of Themselves and All Others Similarly Situated

CHRISTINA WILLIAMS

Amicus Curiae

AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR JUSTICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Patrick O. Daugherty Esq.

Attorney at Van Ness Feldman

1050 Thomas Jefferson Street, N.W., Seventh Floor

Washington, DC 20007

Anthony M. Sabino Esq.

92 Willis Avenue

Mineola, NY 11501

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

Michael R. Hackett Esq.

Attorney at Proskauer Rose

One International Place

Boston, MA 02110

Christopher E. Ondeck Esq.

Attorney at Proskauer Rose

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Suite 600 South

Washington, DC 20004

Jonathan P. Boughrum Esq.

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale

One Commerce Square, 2005 Market Street, 29Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Richard L. Scheff Esq.

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale

One Commerce Square, 2005 Market Street, 29Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

David F. Herman Esq.

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale

One Commerce Square, 2005 Market Street, 29Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Ellen C. Brotman Esq.

One South Broad Street

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Craig D. Singer Esq.

Attorney at Williams & Connolly

725 12Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Sarah M. Harris Esq.

Attorney at Williams & Connolly

725 12Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jonathan E. Paikin Esq.

Attorney at WilmerHale

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Tamara S. Grimm Esq.

Attorney at O'Hagan Meyer

100 North 18Th Street, Two Logan Square, Suite 700

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Charles K. Seyfarth Esq.

Attorney at O'Hagan Meyer

411 East Franklin Street, Suite 500

Richmond, VA 23219

Daniel Volchok Esq.

Attorney at WilmerHale

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Arpit K. Garg Esq.

Attorney at WilmerHale

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Molly M. Jennings Esq.

Attorney at WilmerHale

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Thomas L. Strickland Esq.

1899 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Seth P. Waxman Esq.

Attorney at WilmerHale

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20006

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Michael J. Quirk Esq.

Attorney at Motley Rice

40 West Evergreen Avenue, Suite 104

Philadelphia, PA 19118

Matthew W.H. Wessler Esq.

Attorney at Gupta Wessler

1900 L Street, N.W., Suite 312

Washington, DC 20036

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#113

#111

#109

#108

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #5

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #4

Standing Order

Open Document #3

Case Caption

Open Document #2

Distritc Court Order dated 050719

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#114) ECF FILER: SUMMARY OF ORAL ARGUMENT submitted by Attorney Matthew W.H. Wessler, Esq. for Appellees Michael Stermel and Christina Williams in 19-2058, Attorney Matthew W.H. Wessler, Esq. for Appellees Christina Williams and Michael Stermel in 19-2082. Case Summary: In this appeal, the defendants have asked this Court to depart from the unanimous view of the courts of appeal and hold that an arbitration contract requiring consumers to prospectively waive all relevant state and federal rights must be enforced.. Post Video: YES. [19-2058, 19-2082] (MWW) [Entered: 01/27/2020 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) ECF FILER: DIVISION OF TIME FORM filed by Attorney Sarah M. Harris, Esq. for Appellant Mark Curry in 19-2082, Attorney Sarah M. Harris, Esq. for Appellee Mark Curry in 19-2058. Certificate of Service dated 01/27/2020. Service made by ECF. [19-2082, 19-2058] (SMH) [Entered: 01/27/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#112) ECF FILER: SUMMARY OF ORAL ARGUMENT submitted by Attorney Daniel Volchok, Esq. for Appellant Red Stone Inc in 19-2058, Attorney Daniel Volchok, Esq. for Appellee Red Stone Inc in 19-2082. Case Summary: Plaintiffs allege that their loan agreement is unlawful; that agreement requires arbitration. This appeal asks: (1) whether a court may resolve the enforceability of the arbitration provision, and (2) if so, whether that provision is enforceable.. Post Video: YES. [19-2058, 19-2082] (DV) [Entered: 01/24/2020 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) AMENDED Oral Argument Notification for Wednesday, 02/05/2020. Courtroom & Time: Seitz Courtroom / 10:00am. Location: Philadelphia, PA. [19-2058, 19-2082] (PM) [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#110) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) Please be advised that the Courtroom location has been switched to the Collins J. Seitz Courtroom and the time of oral argument has been amended. Court will now begin at 10:00am. [19-2058, 19-2082] (PM) [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Mark C. Stephenson, Esq. for Amicus Appellants American Consumer Institute, American Legislative Exchange Council and Center for Individual Freedom in 19-2058 Oral argument not required and withdrawing the request.. Certificate of Service dated 01/21/2020. Service made by ECF. [19-2058, 19-2082] (MCS) [Entered: 01/21/2020 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) Oral Argument Notification for Wednesday, 02/05/2020. Courtroom & Time: Maris Courtroom / 9:30am. Location: Philadelphia, PA. [19-2058, 19-2082] (PM) [Entered: 01/21/2020 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Mark C. Stephenson, Esq. for Amicus Appellants American Consumer Institute, American Legislative Exchange Council and Center for Individual Freedom in 19-2058. Certificate of Service dated 12/20/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2058, 19-2082] (MCS) [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Sarah M. Harris, Esq. for Appellant Mark Curry in 19-2082, Attorney Sarah M. Harris, Esq. for Appellee Mark Curry in 19-2058. Certificate of Service dated 12/20/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2082, 19-2058] (SMH) [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Daniel Volchok, Esq. for Appellant Red Stone Inc in 19-2058, Attorney Daniel Volchok, Esq. for Appellee Red Stone Inc in 19-2082. Certificate of Service dated 12/18/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2058, 19-2082] (DV) [Entered: 12/18/2019 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Red Stone Inc, received. [19-2058] (JEP) [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Red Stone Inc, filed. [19-2058] (JEP) [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Red Stone Inc, filed. [19-2058] (JEP) [Entered: 05/24/2019 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan E. Paikin on behalf of Appellant(s) Red Stone, Inc. [19-2058] (JEP) [Entered: 05/23/2019 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Seth P. Waxman on behalf of Appellant(s) Red Stone, Inc. [19-2058] (SPW) [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael J Quirk on behalf of Appellee(s) Christina Williams, Michael Stermel. [19-2058, 19-2082] (MJQ) [Entered: 05/20/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER Consolidating Appeals at Nos. 19-2058 & 19-2082 for the purposes of scheduling, joint appendix and disposition, filed. [19-2058, 19-2082]. SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT. (SLC) [Entered: 05/16/2019 09:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketNotice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 05/10/2019. (PDB) [Entered: 05/13/2019 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketRECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Red Stone Inc in District Court No. 2-18-cv-02747. (PDB) [Entered: 05/10/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Red Stone, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MEDLEY OPPORTUNITY FUND II, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick O. Daugherty