This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:01:12 (UTC).

Christina Magee v. Andrew Saul

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Christina Magee filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Andrew Saul. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2334

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

ANDREW M. SAUL, Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff / Appellant

CHRISTINA F. MAGEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Tina L. Nommay

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

1300 S. Harrison Street, 3128 Federal Building

Fort Wayne, IN 46802-0000

Cathleen C. McNulty

Attorney at SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

6401 Security Boulevard

Baltimore, MD 21235-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Randal S. Forbes

Attorney at FORBES LAW OFFICE

3472 N. Wayne Street, P.O. Box 374

Angola, IN 46703

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

Civil Case

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#4

(#4) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 3 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 09/23/2019 for Christina F. Magee. Appellee's brief due on or before 10/23/2019 for Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/13/2019 for Appellant Christina F. Magee. CMD [4] [7025599] [19-2334] (ER) [Entered: 08/23/2019 02:01 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 3 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 09/23/2019 for Christina F. Magee. Appellee's brief due on or before 10/23/2019 for Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 11/13/2019 for Appellant Christina F. Magee. CMD [4] [7025599] [19-2334] (ER) [Entered: 08/23/2019 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion filed by Appellant Christina F. Magee to extend time to file appellant brief. [3] [7025389] [19-2334] (Forbes, Randal) [Entered: 08/22/2019 05:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Appearance form filed by Attorney Cathleen McNulty for Appellee Andrew M. Saul. [2] [7019768] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-2334] [Edited 07/26/2019 by AG to reflect addition of counsel] (McNulty, Cathleen) [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) U.S. civil case docketed. IFP. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet filed. Appellant's brief due on or before 08/26/2019 for Christina F. Magee. [1] [7017289] [19-2334] (AG) [Entered: 07/15/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less