This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/22/2023 at 06:14:11 (UTC).

Chong Lim v. Jennifer Menne, et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Chong Lim filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Jennifer Menne,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-16798

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendants

COUNTY OF TULARE, Child Protective Services

LYDIA SUAREZ

UNKNOWN PARTIES, Unknown Public Employee 1, an individual; Unknown Public Employee 2, an individual

Plaintiff / Appellant

CHONG SOOK LIM

Porterville, CA 93257

Defendant / Appellees

JENNIFER MENNE

MELANIE HUERTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Chong Sook Lim

297 E. Vandalia Ave., Apt. G

Porterville, CA 93257

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Judith Chapman

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE COUNTY COUNSEL - TULARE COUNTY

2900 W. Burrel, County Civic Center

Visalia, CA 93291

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Streamlined request by Appellant Chong Sook Lim to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Chong Sook Lim opening brief due 02/22/2023. Appellees Melanie Huerta and Jennifer Menne answering brief due 03/24/2023. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12629112] (JN) [Entered: 01/12/2023 09:55 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Streamlined request by Appellant Chong Sook Lim to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Chong Sook Lim opening brief due 02/22/2023. Appellees Melanie Huerta and Jennifer Menne answering brief due 03/24/2023. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12629112] (JN) [Entered: 01/12/2023 09:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Chong Sook Lim opening brief due 01/23/2023. Appellees Melanie Huerta and Jennifer Menne answering brief due 02/23/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12594831] (RT) [Entered: 11/23/2022 10:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less