This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/17/2021 at 06:16:00 (UTC).

Chittranjan Thakkar v. Glassratner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 Chittranjan Thakkar filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Glassratner Advisory Capital Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-12872

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

CHITTRANJAN THAKKAR

Norcross, GA 30093

Defendant / Appellee

GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP, LLC

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Chittranjan Thakkar

3986 Steve Reynolds Blvd Bldg #L-101

Norcross, GA 30093

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Robert F. Parsley

Attorney at Miller & Martin, PLLC

1200 Volunteer Bldg, 832 Georgia Ave Ste 1200

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Paul M. Alexander

Attorney at Miller & Martin, PLLC

1180 West Peachtree St Nw Ste 2100

Atlanta, GA 30309

Frank William DeBorde

Attorney at Morris Manning & Martin, LLP

1600 Atlanta Financial Ctr, 3343 Peachtree Rd Ne

Atlanta, GA 30326

Lisa Wolgast

Attorney at Morris Manning & Martin, LLP

1600 Atlanta Financial Ctr, 3343 Peachtree Rd Ne

Atlanta, GA 30326

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Jonathan Akins

Attorney at Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP

1100 Peachtree St Ne Ste 800

Atlanta, GA 30309

John A. Christy

Attorney at Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP

1100 Peachtree St Ne Ste 800

Atlanta, GA 30309

M. Denise Dotson

Attorney at M. Denise Dotson, LLC

Po Box 767

Decatur, GA 30002

J. Carole Thompson Hord

Attorney at Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP

1100 Peachtree St Ne Ste 800

Atlanta, GA 30309

Kelly L. Walsh

Attorney at Schreeder Wheeler & Flint, LLP

1100 Peachtree St Ne Ste 800

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question with incorporated motion to dismiss appeal as untimely filed by Appellee Glassratner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC. [21-12872] (ECF: Robert Parsley) [Entered: 10/12/2021 04:36 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to consolidate briefing schedule filed by Chittranjan Thakkar. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9502578-1] [21-12872] (ECF: Chittranjan Thakkar) [Entered: 10/07/2021 04:23 PM]

Open Document

Reply to response filed by Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar. [21-12872] (ECF: Chittranjan Thakkar) [Entered: 10/06/2021 04:06 PM]

Open Document #2

JUR-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

JQ Issued

Open Document

RESPONSE to Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar [ # 9492795-2 ] filed by Attorney Robert F. Parsley for Appellee Glassratner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC. [21-12872] (ECF: Robert Parsley) [Entered: 10/01/2021 06:04 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to consolidate appeals 21-12846, 21-12872, and 21-12844 filed by Chittranjan Thakkar. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9492795-1] [21-12872] (ECF: Chittranjan Thakkar) [Entered: 09/24/2021 05:14 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of standing. filed by Glassratner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9491669-1] [21-12872] (ECF: Robert Parsley) [Entered: 09/23/2021 06:32 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paul M. Alexander for Glassratner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC. [21-12872] (ECF: Paul Alexander) [Entered: 09/17/2021 01:53 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar. [Entered: 09/17/2021 10:15 AM]

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/27/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 09/03/2021 09:22 AM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 09/01/2021 as to Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar. [Entered: 09/03/2021 08:19 AM]

Open Document

Notice of receipt: Notice to the Court- "Ladies and Gentlemen" as to Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar in 21-12844, 21-12846, 21-12872.. [21-12844, 21-12846, 21-12872] [Entered: 09/17/2021 10:13 AM]

Open Document #5

USDC Order DE 17

Open Document #4

USDC Judgment DE 18

Open Document #3

USDC Amended Judgment DE 19

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Jurisdictional Question with incorporated motion to dismiss appeal as untimely filed by Appellee Glassratner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC. [21-12872] (ECF: Robert Parsley) [Entered: 10/12/2021 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to consolidate briefing schedule filed by Chittranjan Thakkar. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9502578-1] [21-12872] (ECF: Chittranjan Thakkar) [Entered: 10/07/2021 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to response filed by Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar. [21-12872] (ECF: Chittranjan Thakkar) [Entered: 10/06/2021 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Chittranjan Thakkar. [Entered: 10/04/2021 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE to Motion to consolidate appeals filed by Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar [ # 9492795-2 ] filed by Attorney Robert F. Parsley for Appellee Glassratner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC. [21-12872] (ECF: Robert Parsley) [Entered: 10/01/2021 06:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to consolidate appeals 21-12846, 21-12872, and 21-12844 filed by Chittranjan Thakkar. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9492795-1] [21-12872] (ECF: Chittranjan Thakkar) [Entered: 09/24/2021 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of standing. filed by Glassratner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC. Opposition to Motion is Unknown. [9491669-1] [21-12872] (ECF: Robert Parsley) [Entered: 09/23/2021 06:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paul M. Alexander for Glassratner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC. [21-12872] (ECF: Paul Alexander) [Entered: 09/17/2021 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mandatory ECF sent to Chittranjan Thakkar. [21-12844, 21-12846, 21-12872] [Entered: 09/17/2021 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Robert F. Parsley for Glassratner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP) via the Court's public web-page. Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 09/16/2021 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Paul M. Alexander for Glassratner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC is a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar in inactive status. Your appearance form will not be processed until your bar membership has been renewed. [Entered: 09/15/2021 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Paul M. Alexander for GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC [21-12872] (ECF: Paul Alexander) [Entered: 09/15/2021 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Robert F. Parsley for GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-12872] (ECF: Robert Parsley) [Entered: 09/15/2021 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert F. Parsley for GlassRatner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC [21-12872] (ECF: Robert Parsley) [Entered: 09/15/2021 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of receipt: "Civil Appeal Statement" and "Motion for CM/ECF Password" as to Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN. The Civil Appeal Statement is not required for Appellants proceeding pro se. The "Motion for CM/ECF Password" is not required as the Appellant is already registered as an electronic filer.. [Entered: 09/17/2021 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar. [Entered: 09/17/2021 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of receipt: Notice to the Court- "Ladies and Gentlemen" as to Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar in 21-12844, 21-12846, 21-12872.. [21-12844, 21-12846, 21-12872] [Entered: 09/17/2021 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar. The appellant's brief is due on or before 09/27/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 09/03/2021 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 09/01/2021 as to Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar. [Entered: 09/03/2021 08:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar on 08/17/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/01/2021 as to Appellant Chittranjan Thakkar. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/15/2021 as to Appellee Glassratner Advisory & Capital Group, LLC [Entered: 08/24/2021 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer M. Denise Dotson