This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/17/2022 at 06:30:45 (UTC).

Chief Warrant Officer 4, et al v. Secretary of the United States Department of Defe, et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 Chief Warrant Officer 4, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Secretary of the United States Department of Defe,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-13522

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

CHIEF WARRANT OFFICER 4

LANCE CORPORAL 3

MIDSHIPMAN 2/C

GUNNERY SERGEANT

COLONEL FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT OFFICER

LIEUTENANT COLONEL 1

RESERVE LIEUTENANT COLONEL

CAPTAIN

CAPTAIN 2

CAPTAIN 3

FIRST LIEUTENANT

SECOND LIEUTENANT

CHIEF WARRANT OFFICER 3

LANCE CORPORAL 1

LANCE CORPORAL 2

Defendant / Appellants

SECRETARY OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE

COMMANDANT, UNITED STATES MARINE CORPS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Roger K. Gannam

Attorney at Liberty Counsel

Po Box 540774

Orlando, FL 32854

Richard L. Mast Jr.

Attorney at Liberty Counsel, Inc.

Po Box 11108

Lynchburg, VA 24506

Horatio Gabriel Mihet

Attorney at Liberty Counsel

Po Box 540774

Orlando, FL 32854

Daniel Joseph Schmid

Attorney at Liberty Counsel

Po Box 540774

Orlando, FL 32854

Mathew Duane Staver

Attorney at Liberty Counsel

Po Box 540774

Orlando, FL 32854

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Andrew Evan Carmichael

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

1100 L St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Sarah Carroll

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Ave Nw Rm 3706, Po Box 14403

Washington, DC 20044

Charles W. Scarborough

Attorney at U.S. Attorney General's Office

950 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Michael Patrick Clendenen

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

1100 L St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Liam C. Holland

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

1100 L St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Amy Elizabeth Powell

Attorney at DOJ-Civ

150 Fayetteville St Ste 2100

Raleigh, NC 27601

Stuart Justin Robinson

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

20 Massachusetts Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Cassie Snyder

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

1100 L St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Catherine Yang

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

1100 L St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

ORDER CERTIFYING CLASS AND ISSUING CLASSWIDE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION DE# 229

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Sarah Carroll for Secretary of the U.S. Department of Defense et al.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13522] (ECF: Sarah Carroll) [Entered: 11/04/2022 04:24 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah Carroll, representing Secretary of the U.S. Department of Defense; Commandant, U.S. Marine Corps [22-13522] (ECF: Sarah Carroll) [Entered: 11/04/2022 04:44 PM]

#4

(#4) Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Sarah Carroll for Appellants Commandant, United States Marine Corps and Secretary of the United States Department of Defense. [22-13522] (ECF: Sarah Carroll) [Entered: 11/07/2022 09:53 AM]

#5

(#5) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Sarah Carroll for Appellants Commandant, United States Marine Corps and Secretary of the United States Department of Defense. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [22-13522] (ECF: Sarah Carroll) [Entered: 11/07/2022 09:54 AM]

#6

(#6) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Sarah Carroll for Appellants Secretary of the United States Department of Defense and Commandant, United States Marine Corps. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 11/07/2022 02:03 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Charles W. Scarborough for the U.S. Secretary of Defense [22-13522] (ECF: Charles Scarborough) [Entered: 11/07/2022 06:03 PM]

#8

(#8) Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Commandant, United States Marine Corps and Secretary of the United States Department of Defense. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/28/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 11/09/2022 01:45 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel Joseph Schmid for Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chief Warrant Officer 3, Chief Warrant Officer 4, Colonel Financial Management Officer, First Lieutenant, Gunnery Sergeant, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lance Corporal 3, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Midshipman 2/C, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel and Second Lieutenant. [22-13522] (ECF: Daniel Schmid) [Entered: 11/15/2022 12:21 PM]

#11

(#11) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Daniel Joseph Schmid for Appellees Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chief Warrant Officer 3, Chief Warrant Officer 4, Colonel Financial Management Officer, First Lieutenant, Gunnery Sergeant, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lance Corporal 3, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Midshipman 2/C, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel and Second Lieutenant. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13522] (ECF: Daniel Schmid) [Entered: 11/15/2022 12:22 PM]

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Horatio Gabriel Mihet for Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chief Warrant Officer 3, Chief Warrant Officer 4, Colonel Financial Management Officer, First Lieutenant, Gunnery Sergeant, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lance Corporal 3, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Midshipman 2/C, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel and Second Lieutenant. [22-13522] (ECF: Horatio Mihet) [Entered: 11/20/2022 07:45 AM]

#13

(#13) MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 01/27/2023 filed by Commandant, United States Marine Corps and Secretary of the United States Department of Defense. Motion is Unopposed. [13] [22-13522] (ECF: Sarah Carroll) [Entered: 12/13/2022 04:15 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 01/27/2023 filed by Commandant, United States Marine Corps and Secretary of the United States Department of Defense. Motion is Unopposed. [13] [22-13522] (ECF: Sarah Carroll) [Entered: 12/13/2022 04:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Horatio Gabriel Mihet for Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chief Warrant Officer 3, Chief Warrant Officer 4, Colonel Financial Management Officer, First Lieutenant, Gunnery Sergeant, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lance Corporal 3, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Midshipman 2/C, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel and Second Lieutenant. [22-13522] (ECF: Horatio Mihet) [Entered: 11/20/2022 07:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Daniel Joseph Schmid for Appellees Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chief Warrant Officer 3, Chief Warrant Officer 4, Colonel Financial Management Officer, First Lieutenant, Gunnery Sergeant, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lance Corporal 3, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Midshipman 2/C, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel and Second Lieutenant. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13522] (ECF: Daniel Schmid) [Entered: 11/15/2022 12:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daniel Joseph Schmid for Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chief Warrant Officer 3, Chief Warrant Officer 4, Colonel Financial Management Officer, First Lieutenant, Gunnery Sergeant, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lance Corporal 3, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Midshipman 2/C, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel and Second Lieutenant. [22-13522] (ECF: Daniel Schmid) [Entered: 11/15/2022 12:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • Docket(#9) Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Sarah Carroll for Appellants Secretary of the United States Department of Defense and Commandant, United States Marine Corps. Appellants brief due on 12/28/2022 as to Appellants Commandant, United States Marine Corps and Secretary of the United States Department of Defense. Appendix due on 01/04/2023 as to Appellants Commandant, United States Marine Corps and Secretary of the United States Department of Defense. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 11/09/2022 01:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Commandant, United States Marine Corps and Secretary of the United States Department of Defense. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/28/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 11/09/2022 01:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Charles W. Scarborough for the U.S. Secretary of Defense [22-13522] (ECF: Charles Scarborough) [Entered: 11/07/2022 06:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Sarah Carroll for Appellants Secretary of the United States Department of Defense and Commandant, United States Marine Corps. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 11/07/2022 02:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Sarah Carroll for Appellants Commandant, United States Marine Corps and Secretary of the United States Department of Defense. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [22-13522] (ECF: Sarah Carroll) [Entered: 11/07/2022 09:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Sarah Carroll for Appellants Commandant, United States Marine Corps and Secretary of the United States Department of Defense. [22-13522] (ECF: Sarah Carroll) [Entered: 11/07/2022 09:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah Carroll, representing Secretary of the U.S. Department of Defense; Commandant, U.S. Marine Corps [22-13522] (ECF: Sarah Carroll) [Entered: 11/04/2022 04:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Sarah Carroll for Secretary of the U.S. Department of Defense et al.. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-13522] (ECF: Sarah Carroll) [Entered: 11/04/2022 04:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Commandant, United States Marine Corps and Secretary of the United States Department of Defense on 10/14/2022. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/07/2022 as to Appellant Secretary of the United States Department of Defense. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/21/2022 as to Appellee Chief Warrant Officer 4. [Entered: 10/24/2022 03:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less