This case was last updated from PACER on 07/27/2019 at 06:06:00 (UTC).

Chevron Corporation v. Donziger

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 Chevron Corporation filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Donziger. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1584

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

Omayihue Baihua

Daniel Carlos Lusitand Yaiguaje

Maria Magdalena Rodri Barcenes

Luisa Delia Tanguila Narvaez

Ehuenguinto Tega

Mencay Baihua Tega

Fermin Piaguaje Payaguaje

Lucio Enrique Grefa Tanguila

Compa Guiquita

Carlos Grefa Huatatoca

Namo Huani Yate

Weica Apica Huani

Lorenzo Jose Alvarado Yumbo

Lidia Alexandra Aguin Aguinda

Francisco Alvarado Yumbo

Bebanca Tega Huani

Respondent

Andrew Woods

Counter Claimants

Donziger & Associates, PLLC

Steven R. Donziger

New York, NY 10025

The Law Offices of Steven R. Donziger

82 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Claimant Attorney

Steven R. Donziger

245 West 104Th Street, #7D

New York, NY 10025

Other Attorneys

Randy Michael Mastro Esq.

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

William Edward Thomson Esq. III

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Andrea Ellen Neuman Esq.

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

3161 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) ORDER, vacating previous scheduling order [ # 41 ] dated 07/17/2019, copy to pro se, FILED.[2611218] [19-1584] [Entered: 07/18/2019 08:34 AM]

#41

(#41) ORDER, setting appellant brief due date as 07/22/2019, for Appellant Steven R. Donziger failure to submit a scheduling notification, copy to pro se, FILED. [2610547] [19-1584] [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:07 AM]

#37

(#37) NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, copy to pro se, ASSIGNED.[2610421] [19-1584] [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:20 AM]

#31

(#31) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Steven R. Donziger, FILED. Service date 06/27/2019 by US mail.[2597436] [19-1584] [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:33 PM]

#27

(#27) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM D-P, [26], on behalf of Appellant Steven R. Donziger, copy to pro se litigant, FILED.[2588442] [19-1584] [Entered: 06/17/2019 04:26 PM]

#24

(#24) ORDER, dated 06/11/2019, dismissing appeal by 07/02/52019, unless Appellant Steven R. Donziger, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2584870] [19-1584] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:38 PM]

#18

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#13

(#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [9], on behalf of Appellee Chevron Corporation, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2582983] [19-1584] [Entered: 06/10/2019 08:54 AM]

#8

(#8) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[2574819] [19-1584] [Entered: 05/29/2019 04:22 PM]

6 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

6 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/24/2019, RECEIVED.[2574748] [19-1584] [Entered: 05/29/2019 04:05 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION, dated 05/23/2019, RECEIVED.[2574746] [19-1584] [Entered: 05/29/2019 04:04 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER, vacating previous scheduling order [ # 41 ] dated 07/17/2019, copy to pro se, FILED.[2611218] [19-1584] [Entered: 07/18/2019 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ORDER, setting appellant brief due date as 07/22/2019, for Appellant Steven R. Donziger failure to submit a scheduling notification, copy to pro se, FILED. [2610547] [19-1584] [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, copy to pro se, ASSIGNED.[2610421] [19-1584] [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: FORM D-P, [ # 27 ], [ # 31 ], on behalf of Appellant Steven R. Donziger, FILED.[2597441] [19-1584] [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Steven R. Donziger, FILED. Service date 06/27/2019 by US mail.[2597436] [19-1584] [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Steven R. Donziger, FILED. Service date 06/27/2019 by US mail.[2597433] [19-1584] [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, FORM D-P, [26], on behalf of Appellant Steven R. Donziger, copy to pro se litigant, FILED.[2588442] [19-1584] [Entered: 06/17/2019 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER, dated 06/13/2019, dismissing appeal by 07/05/2019, unless Appellant Steven R. Donziger, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2586690] [19-1584] [Entered: 06/13/2019 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • (#26) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Steven R. Donziger, FILED. Service date 06/17/2019 by US mail.[2588438] [19-1584] [Entered: 06/17/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER, dated 06/11/2019, dismissing appeal by 07/02/52019, unless Appellant Steven R. Donziger, submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2584870] [19-1584] [Entered: 06/11/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [9], on behalf of Appellee Chevron Corporation, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2582983] [19-1584] [Entered: 06/10/2019 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • (#12) ATTORNEY, Andrea Ellen Neuman for Chevron Corporation, in case 19-1584, [10], ADDED.[2582979] [19-1584] [Entered: 06/10/2019 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • (#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Chevron Corporation, FILED. Service date 06/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2582716] [19-1584] [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • (#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Chevron Corporation, FILED. Service date 06/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2582687] [19-1584] [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • (#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Chevron Corporation, FILED. Service date 06/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2582647] [19-1584] [Entered: 06/07/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[2574819] [19-1584] [Entered: 05/29/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2574761] [19-1584] [Entered: 05/29/2019 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/24/2019, RECEIVED.[2574748] [19-1584] [Entered: 05/29/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION, dated 05/23/2019, RECEIVED.[2574746] [19-1584] [Entered: 05/29/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Steven R. Donziger, FILED. [2574685] [19-1584] [Entered: 05/29/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less