Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2019 at 06:02:52 (UTC).

Cheryl Inabinet v. Greenville County Sheriff's

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 Cheryl Inabinet filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Greenville County Sheriff's. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2079

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

KEVIN JAMES AZZARA, Master Deputy

WILL LEWIS, Former Sheriff

JARED RANDALL OLIVER, Deputy

THE GREENVILLE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

JUAN JOSE OLALDE, Deputy

IVAN RODRIGUEZ, Master Deputy

GREENVILLE COUNTY

Plaintiff / Appellants

SETH INABINET

BRITTANY INABINET

VALERIE INABINET

CHERYL INABINET, personally and as personal representative for the Estate of Joseph Inabinet

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

James P. Walsh

Attorney at CLARKSON WALSH TERRELL & COULTER, PA

P. O. Box 6728

Greenville, SC 29606-0000

P. Christopher Smith Jr.

Attorney at CLARKSON WALSH TERRELL & COULTER, PA

P. O. Box 6728

Greenville, SC 29606-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Joshua Thomas Hawkins

Attorney at HAWKINS & JEDZINIAK, LLC

1225 South Church Street

Greenville, SC 29605

Helena LeeAnn Jedziniak

Attorney at HAWKINS & JEDZINIAK, LLC

1225 South Church Street

Greenville, SC 29605

 

Court Documents

11 #2

Judgment order filed

11 #1

Notice of Judgment

#10

(#10) COURT ORDER filed granting Motion to dismiss appeal [ # 6 ]. Copies to all parties. [1000628415] [19-2079] AB [Entered: 11/19/2019 08:09 AM]

#9

(#9) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Cheryl Inabinet, Brittany Inabinet, Seth Inabinet and Valerie Inabinet to Motion [ # 6 ]. [19-2079] Helena Jedziniak [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:13 PM]

#8

(#8) NOTICE ISSUED to Brittany Inabinet, Cheryl Inabinet, Seth Inabinet and Valerie Inabinet requesting response to Motion to dismiss appeal [ # 6 ]. Response due: 10/28/2019.[1000608809] [19-2079] AB [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:51 PM]

#7

(#7) ORDER filed suspending briefing schedule. Copies to all parties. [1000608802] [19-2079] AB [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:48 PM]

#6

(#6) MOTION by Kevin James Azzara, Greenville County, Greenville County Sheriff's Office, Will Lewis, Juan Jose Olalde, Jared Randall Oliver and Ivan Rodriguez to dismiss appeal [6]. Date and method of service: 10/17/2019 ecf. [1000608767] [19-2079] P. Smith [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:30 PM]

5 #7

Additional Document

5 #6

Additional Document

5 #4

Additional Document

5 #3

Additional Document

5 #2

Additional Document

5 #1

Disclosure of corporate affiliations

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by P. Christopher Smith, Jr. for Kevin James Azzara, Greenville County, Greenville County Sheriff's Office, Will Lewis, Juan Jose Olalde, Jared Randall Oliver and Ivan Rodriguez. [1000608750] [19-2079] P. Smith [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:20 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 11/12/2019. Response Brief due 12/12/2019. [19-2079] AB [Entered: 10/03/2019 01:45 PM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 6:19-cv-01501-TMC-KFM. [19-2079] AB [Entered: 10/03/2019 01:42 PM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:19-cv-01501-TMC-KFM. Case manager: ABrownlee. [19-2079] AB [Entered: 10/03/2019 01:40 PM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Decision: Dismissed. Originating case number: 6:19-cv-01501-TMC-KFM. Entered on Docket Date: 11/19/2019. [1000628417] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [19-2079] AB [Entered: 11/19/2019 08:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) COURT ORDER filed granting Motion to dismiss appeal [ # 6 ]. Copies to all parties. [1000628415] [19-2079] AB [Entered: 11/19/2019 08:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Cheryl Inabinet, Brittany Inabinet, Seth Inabinet and Valerie Inabinet to Motion [ # 6 ]. [19-2079] Helena Jedziniak [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE ISSUED to Brittany Inabinet, Cheryl Inabinet, Seth Inabinet and Valerie Inabinet requesting response to Motion to dismiss appeal [ # 6 ]. Response due: 10/28/2019.[1000608809] [19-2079] AB [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER filed suspending briefing schedule. Copies to all parties. [1000608802] [19-2079] AB [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Kevin James Azzara, Greenville County, Greenville County Sheriff's Office, Will Lewis, Juan Jose Olalde, Jared Randall Oliver and Ivan Rodriguez to dismiss appeal [6]. Date and method of service: 10/17/2019 ecf. [1000608767] [19-2079] P. Smith [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Kevin James Azzara, Greenville County, Greenville County Sheriff's Office, Will Lewis, Juan Jose Olalde, Jared Randall Oliver and Ivan Rodriguez. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000608758] [19-2079] P. Smith [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by P. Christopher Smith, Jr. for Kevin James Azzara, Greenville County, Greenville County Sheriff's Office, Will Lewis, Juan Jose Olalde, Jared Randall Oliver and Ivan Rodriguez. [1000608750] [19-2079] P. Smith [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 11/12/2019. Response Brief due 12/12/2019. [19-2079] AB [Entered: 10/03/2019 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 6:19-cv-01501-TMC-KFM. [19-2079] AB [Entered: 10/03/2019 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:19-cv-01501-TMC-KFM. Case manager: ABrownlee. [19-2079] AB [Entered: 10/03/2019 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Granville County is a litigant