This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/14/2023 at 06:08:53 (UTC).

Chennault v. Bayer

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 Chennault filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Bayer. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-20647

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Regina Chennault

Jacksonville, TX 75766

Defendant / Appellees

Bayer Corporation, doing business as Indiana Bayer Corporation

Bayer Healthcare, L.L.C.

Bracco Diagnostics, Incorporated

McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Regina Chennault

P.O. Box 37

Jacksonville, TX 75766

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Edward Dumoulin

Attorney at Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Breenan & Baum, L.L.P.

200 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Sonila Themeli

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

600 Travis Street, Jpmorgan Chase Tower

Houston, TX 77002-2926

Jennifer Greenblatt

Attorney at Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Breenan & Baum, L.L.P.

200 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Elizabeth Bonvillain Kamin

Attorney at Clark Hill, P.L.C.

909 Fannin Street

Houston, TX 77010

Clifford Bowie Husted

Attorney at Clark Hill, P.L.C.

909 Fannin Street

Houston, TX 77010

Megan Sterchi Lammert

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice

2400 Pershing Road

Kansas City, MO 64108-0000

Paul S. Penticuff

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice

2400 Pershing Road

Kansas City, MO 64108-0000

Thomas N. Sterchi

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice

2400 Pershing Road

Kansas City, MO 64108-0000

Stephanie Reedy Esq.

Attorney at Wheeler, Trigg & O'Donnell, L.L.P.

370 17Th Street

Denver, CO 80202-0000

Habib Nasrullah

Attorney at Wheeler, Trigg & O'Donnell, L.L.P.

370 17Th Street

Denver, CO 80202-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

(#1) PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Regina Chennault [22-20647] (ABT) [Entered: 12/16/2022 04:17 PM]

#5

(#5) INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee deadline updated to 02/01/2023 for Appellant Regina Chennault [22-20647] (SDH) [Entered: 12/23/2022 02:32 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-20647] (Sonila Themeli ) [Entered: 12/30/2022 03:59 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Jennifer Greenblatt for Bayer Corporation and Bayer Healthcare, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-20647] (Jennifer Greenblatt ) [Entered: 12/30/2022 04:03 PM]

#13

(#17) CLERK ORDER granting Motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Ms. Regina Chennault [ # 13 ] [22-20647] (SDH) [Entered: 01/05/2023 02:49 PM]

#17

(#17) CLERK ORDER granting Motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Ms. Regina Chennault [ # 13 ] [22-20647] (SDH) [Entered: 01/05/2023 02:49 PM]

#18

(#18) APPEARANCE FORM received from Mrs. Elizabeth Bonvillain Kamin for Bracco Diagnostics, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-20647] (Elizabeth Bonvillain Kamin ) [Entered: 01/06/2023 09:57 AM]

#19

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#23

(#23) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 02/22/2023 for Appellant Regina Chennault. [22-20647] (DDL) [Entered: 01/09/2023 11:08 AM]

#29

(#29) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-20647] (Edward Dumoulin ) [Entered: 01/17/2023 04:29 PM]

#32

(#32) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-20647] (Thomas N. Sterchi ) [Entered: 01/25/2023 11:30 AM]

#33

(#33) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-20647] (Paul S Penticuff ) [Entered: 01/25/2023 11:59 AM]

#34

(#34) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-20647] (Megan Sterchi Lammert ) [Entered: 01/25/2023 12:01 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • Docket(#37) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Megan Sterchi Lammert for party(s) Appellee Bracco Diagnostics, Incorporated, in case 22-20647 [22-20647] (SDH) [Entered: 01/26/2023 03:21 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • Docket(#35) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Paul S Penticuff, Thomas N. Sterchi for party(s) Appellee Bracco Diagnostics, Incorporated, in case 22-20647 [22-20647] (ABT) [Entered: 01/26/2023 07:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-20647] (Megan Sterchi Lammert ) [Entered: 01/25/2023 12:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-20647] (Paul S Penticuff ) [Entered: 01/25/2023 11:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-20647] (Thomas N. Sterchi ) [Entered: 01/25/2023 11:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Docket(#30) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Edward Dumoulin for party(s) Appellee Bayer Healthcare, L.L.C. Appellee Bayer Corporation, in case 22-20647 [22-20647] (SDH) [Entered: 01/18/2023 10:28 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-20647] (Edward Dumoulin ) [Entered: 01/17/2023 04:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • Docket(#27) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Stephanie Reedy for party(s) Appellee McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated, in case 22-20647 [22-20647] (NFD) [Entered: 01/09/2023 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • Docket(#24) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Clifford Bowie Husted for party(s) Appellee Bracco Diagnostics, Incorporated, in case 22-20647 [22-20647] (SDH) [Entered: 01/09/2023 11:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 02/22/2023 for Appellant Regina Chennault. [22-20647] (DDL) [Entered: 01/09/2023 11:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPEARANCE FORM received from Mrs. Elizabeth Bonvillain Kamin for Bracco Diagnostics, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-20647] (Elizabeth Bonvillain Kamin ) [Entered: 01/06/2023 09:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CLERK ORDER granting Motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Ms. Regina Chennault [ # 13 ] [22-20647] (SDH) [Entered: 01/05/2023 02:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Regina Chennault for leave to file electronically as a pro se party [13]. Date of service: 01/03/2023 [22-20647] (SDH) [Entered: 01/05/2023 11:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Sonila Themeli for party(s) Appellee Bayer Healthcare, L.L.C. Appellee Bayer Corporation, in case 22-20647, by Attorney Jennifer Greenblatt for Appellee Bayer Healthcare, L.L.C. in 22-20647, Attorney Jennifer Greenblatt for Appellee Bayer Corporation in 22-20647 [22-20647] (ABT) [Entered: 01/02/2023 02:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Jennifer Greenblatt for Bayer Corporation and Bayer Healthcare, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-20647] (Jennifer Greenblatt ) [Entered: 12/30/2022 04:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-20647] (Sonila Themeli ) [Entered: 12/30/2022 03:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:22-CV-2083. Electronic ROA due on 01/13/2023. [22-20647] (DLM) [Entered: 12/29/2022 07:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • Docket(#6) FEE PAID by Appellant Ms. Regina Chennault. Fee deadline satisfied [22-20647] (DLM) [Entered: 12/29/2022 07:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee deadline updated to 02/01/2023 for Appellant Regina Chennault [22-20647] (SDH) [Entered: 12/23/2022 02:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Regina Chennault [22-20647] (ABT) [Entered: 12/16/2022 04:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less