This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2019 at 06:04:55 (UTC).

Chase Monarch Int'l, Inc. v. Medawar

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 Chase Monarch Int'l, Inc filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Medawar. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1333

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

CHASE MONARCH INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Appellee

CHERIF MEDAWAR

Interested Party

MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS

San Juan, PR 00901-1922

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Hector J. Figueroa-Vincenty

65 Infanteria 714, Norfe Bldg 201

San Juan, PR 00924

Appellee Attorney

Solymar N. Castillo-Morales

Attorney at Goldman Antonetti & Cordova LLC

Po Box 70364

San Juan, PR 00936-8364

Interested Party Attorney

Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas

Attorney at US Trustee's Office

500 Tanca St, Suite 301

San Juan, PR 00901-1922

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION to dismiss case and RESPONSE to motion to stay [ # 6254312-2 ] filed by Appellee Cherif Medawar. Certificate of service dated 05/28/2019. [19-1333] (SNC) [Entered: 05/28/2019 04:38 PM]

Open Document #2

MOTION to stayfiled by Appellant Chase Monarch International, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 05/15/2019. [19-1333] (HJF) [Entered: 05/15/2019 01:23 PM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellee Cherif Medawar. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2019. [19-1333] (SNC) [Entered: 04/30/2019 12:24 PM]

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Cherif Medawar filed by Attorney Solymar Castillo-Morales. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2019. [19-1333] (SNC) [Entered: 04/29/2019 05:07 PM]

Open Document

ORDER entered: Appellant Chase Monarch International, Inc.'s "motion requesting waiver from complying with the format required" is denied as moot. The appearance form, docketing statement, and corporate disclosure statement have been accepted as filed. [19-1333] (KC) [Entered: 04/24/2019 01:50 PM]

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Chase Monarch International, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 04/23/2019. [19-1333] (HJF) [Entered: 04/23/2019 10:46 PM]

Open Document #2

ANSWER TO LETTER D OF THE DOCKETING STATEMENT IN SEPARATE PAGES

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Chase Monarch International, Inc. filed by Attorney HECTOR J. FIGUEROA VINCENTY. Certificate of service dated 04/23/2019. [19-1333] (HJF) [Entered: 04/23/2019 08:17 PM]

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to dismiss case and RESPONSE to motion to stay [ # 6254312-2 ] filed by Appellee Cherif Medawar. Certificate of service dated 05/28/2019. [19-1333] (SNC) [Entered: 05/28/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to stayfiled by Appellant Chase Monarch International, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 05/15/2019. [19-1333] (HJF) [Entered: 05/15/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellee Cherif Medawar. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2019. [19-1333] (SNC) [Entered: 04/30/2019 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 06/10/2019 for appellant Chase Monarch International, Inc. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1333] (KC) [Entered: 04/30/2019 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Cherif Medawar filed by Attorney Solymar Castillo-Morales. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2019. [19-1333] (SNC) [Entered: 04/29/2019 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER entered: Appellant Chase Monarch International, Inc.'s "motion requesting waiver from complying with the format required" is denied as moot. The appearance form, docketing statement, and corporate disclosure statement have been accepted as filed. [19-1333] (KC) [Entered: 04/24/2019 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FORMAT RULES ON ALL FILINGS MADE TODAY BY APPELLANT filed by Appellant Chase Monarch International, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 04/23/2019. [19-1333] (HJF) [Entered: 04/23/2019 11:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Chase Monarch International, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 04/23/2019. [19-1333] (HJF) [Entered: 04/23/2019 10:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Chase Monarch International, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 04/23/2019. [19-1333] (HJF) [Entered: 04/23/2019 08:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Chase Monarch International, Inc. filed by Attorney HECTOR J. FIGUEROA VINCENTY. Certificate of service dated 04/23/2019. [19-1333] (HJF) [Entered: 04/23/2019 08:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Filing fee was paid in the district court by Appellant Chase Monarch International, Inc. on 04/09/2019. [19-1333] (KC) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #15) filed by Appellant Chase Monarch International, Inc. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 04/23/2019. Fee due 04/23/2019. [19-1333] (KC) [Entered: 04/09/2019 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less