This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2019 at 06:08:34 (UTC).

Charlie's Project LLC, et al v. T2B LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Charlie's Project LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against T2B LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1280

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

BRANDON MCDANIEL

NICOLE MCDANIEL

T2B, LLC

T2B LLC

Plaintiff / Appellees

ANNA K. HERNANDEZ

CHARLIE'S PROJECT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Irwin B. Schwartz

Attorney at BLA Schwartz, PC

1 University Ave, Ste 302B

Westwood, MA 02090

Nicholas R. Cassie

Attorney at BLA Schwartz, PC

1 University Ave, Ste 302B

Westwood, MA 02090

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Michele Connolly

Attorney at Fitch Law Partners LLP

1 Beacon St, 16Th Flr

Boston, MA 02108-0000

Nathalie K. Salomon

Attorney at Fitch Law Partners LLP

1 Beacon St, 16Th Flr

Boston, MA 02108-0000

Andrea Peraner-Sweet

Attorney at Fitch Law Partners LLP

1 Beacon St, 16Th Flr

Boston, MA 02108-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Brandon McDaniel, Nicole McDaniel and T2B, LLC filed by Attorney Nicholas R. Cassie. Certificate of service dated 04/10/2019. [19-1280] (NRC) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:12 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Brandon McDaniel, Nicole McDaniel and T2B, LLC filed by Attorney Irwin B. Schwartz. Certificate of service dated 04/10/2019. [19-1280] (IBS) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:09 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Brandon McDaniel, Nicole McDaniel and T2B, LLC. Certificate of service dated 04/10/2019. [19-1280] (NRC) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:12 PM]

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Brandon McDaniel, Nicole McDaniel and T2B, LLC indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 04/10/2019. [19-1280] (NRC) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:13 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 06/17/2019 for appellant Brandon McDaniel, Nicole McDaniel and T2B LLC. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1280] (AL) [Entered: 05/06/2019 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Brandon McDaniel, Nicole McDaniel and T2B, LLC indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 04/10/2019. [19-1280] (NRC) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Brandon McDaniel, Nicole McDaniel and T2B, LLC. Certificate of service dated 04/10/2019. [19-1280] (NRC) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Brandon McDaniel, Nicole McDaniel and T2B, LLC filed by Attorney Nicholas R. Cassie. Certificate of service dated 04/10/2019. [19-1280] (NRC) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Brandon McDaniel, Nicole McDaniel and T2B, LLC filed by Attorney Irwin B. Schwartz. Certificate of service dated 04/10/2019. [19-1280] (IBS) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #38) filed by Appellants Brandon McDaniel, Nicole McDaniel and T2B, LLC. Docketing Statement due 04/10/2019. Transcript Report/Order form due 04/10/2019. Appearance form due 04/10/2019. [19-1280] (AL) [Entered: 03/27/2019 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.