This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2020 at 06:05:22 (UTC).

Charles Van Tassel, et al v. State Farm Mutual Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 Charles Van Tassel filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-35121

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

CHARLES VAN TASSEL

JEREMY PLANK

Defendant / Appellee

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Stephen M. Hansen

Attorney at Law Offices of Stephen M. Hansen, P.S.

1821 Dock Street, Suite 103

Tacoma, WA 98402

Scott Purington Nealey

Attorney at Law Office of Scott P. Nealey

71 Stevenson Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94114

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Tracey K. Ledbetter

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP

999 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 2300

Atlanta, GA 30309-3996

Joseph D. Hampton Esquire

Attorney at Betts, Patterson & Mines, P.S.

701 Pike Street, Suite 1400

Seattle, WA 98101

Herbert Matthew Munson

Attorney at Betts, Patterson & Mines, P.S.

701 Pike Street, Suite 1400

Seattle, WA 98101

Thomas W. Curvin

Attorney at Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP

999 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 2300

Atlanta, GA 30309-3996

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11622317] (LW) [Entered: 03/09/2020 10:26 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 03/04/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11603479] (LW) [Entered: 02/20/2020 01:59 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Jeremy Plank and Charles Van Tassel Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/19/2020. [11601559] [20-35121] (Hansen, Stephen) [Entered: 02/19/2020 11:18 AM]

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Scott Purington Nealey for party(s) Appellant Charles Van Tassel Appellant Jeremy Plank, in case 20-35121. [11654756] (RR) [Entered: 04/07/2020 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Scott Purington Nealey (71 Stevenson, Suite 400 San Francisco, CA 94015) for Appellants Jeremy Plank and Charles Van Tassel. Date of service: 04/07/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11654023] [20-35121] (Nealey, Scott) [Entered: 04/07/2020 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11622317] (LW) [Entered: 03/09/2020 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 03/04/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11603479] (LW) [Entered: 02/20/2020 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/19/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11601766]. [20-35121] (AD) [Entered: 02/19/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Jeremy Plank and Charles Van Tassel Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/19/2020. [11601559] [20-35121] (Hansen, Stephen) [Entered: 02/19/2020 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Jeremy Plank and Charles Van Tassel Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/19/2020. Transcript ordered by 03/12/2020. Transcript due 04/13/2020. Appellants Jeremy Plank and Charles Van Tassel opening brief due 05/21/2020. Appellee State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company answering brief due 06/22/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11594359] (JBS) [Entered: 02/12/2020 09:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.