This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/01/2022 at 06:04:12 (UTC).

Charles Talbert v. Department of Corrections, et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Charles Talbert filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1814

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

CHARLES TALBERT

Camp Hill, PA 17001

Defendant / Appellees

DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

JOHN E. WETZEL, Secretary of PA Department of Corrections

SUPERINTENDENT LAUREL HARRY

OFFICER BENNING, Level 5 Housing Unit Property Officer

BETH HERB, Health Care Administrator

THEODOR VOORSTAD, Contract Medical Doctor

MARGARET GORDON, Dietary Management Services Specialist, DOC

BRAD RITCHEY, Unit Manager, Level 5 Housing Unit, Camp Hill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Charles Talbert

Attorney at Camp Hill SCI

P.O. Box 8837, 2500 Lisburn Road

Camp Hill, PA 17001

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Nicole J. Boland Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square, 15Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Anthony Bowers Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square, 15Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Claudia M. Tesoro Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Alexander R. Ferrante Esq.

Attorney at Gold & Ferrante

716 North Bethlehem Pike, Suite 208

Lower Gwynedd, PA 19002

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case Docketed

1 #2

District Court Memorandum

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

#3

(#3) Brief Received from Appellant Charles Talbert.. As no briefing schedule has yet issued, the brief is construed as a document in support of the appeal. If after disposition of the pending motions the appeal is to proceed to briefing, the parties will be advised regarding the filing date of this brief and the date for filing a responsive brief. (JK) [Entered: 05/10/2022 05:20 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alexander R. Ferrante on behalf of Appellee(s) Theodor Voorstad, MD. [22-1814] (ARF) [Entered: 05/11/2022 11:01 AM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Claudia M. Tesoro on behalf of Appellee(s) Department of Corrections; John E. Wetzel; Beth Herb; Margaret Gordon. [22-1814] (CMT) [Entered: 05/18/2022 09:43 AM]

#6

(#6) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Nicole J. Boland, Esq. for Margaret Gordon, John E. Wetzel, Benning, Brad Ritchey, Department of Corrections, Laurel Harry and Beth Herb and Anthony Bowers, Esq. for Margaret Gordon, John E. Wetzel, Benning, Brad Ritchey, Department of Corrections, Laurel Harry and Beth Herb requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 06/03/2022. (JK) [Entered: 05/20/2022 11:34 AM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Claudia M. Tesoro on behalf of Appellee(s) Laurel Harry; Officer Benning; Brad Ritchey. [22-1814] (CMT) [Entered: 05/27/2022 09:50 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • Docket(#8) Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 06/15/2022. (JK) [Entered: 06/21/2022 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Claudia M. Tesoro on behalf of Appellee(s) Laurel Harry; Officer Benning; Brad Ritchey. [22-1814] (CMT) [Entered: 05/27/2022 09:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Nicole J. Boland, Esq. for Margaret Gordon, John E. Wetzel, Benning, Brad Ritchey, Department of Corrections, Laurel Harry and Beth Herb and Anthony Bowers, Esq. for Margaret Gordon, John E. Wetzel, Benning, Brad Ritchey, Department of Corrections, Laurel Harry and Beth Herb requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 06/03/2022. (JK) [Entered: 05/20/2022 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Claudia M. Tesoro on behalf of Appellee(s) Department of Corrections; John E. Wetzel; Beth Herb; Margaret Gordon. [22-1814] (CMT) [Entered: 05/18/2022 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alexander R. Ferrante on behalf of Appellee(s) Theodor Voorstad, MD. [22-1814] (ARF) [Entered: 05/11/2022 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Brief Received from Appellant Charles Talbert.. As no briefing schedule has yet issued, the brief is construed as a document in support of the appeal. If after disposition of the pending motions the appeal is to proceed to briefing, the parties will be advised regarding the filing date of this brief and the date for filing a responsive brief. (JK) [Entered: 05/10/2022 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 05/02/2022 05:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Charles Talbert in District Court No. 3-21-cv-01669. (JK) [Entered: 05/02/2022 05:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS REHAB. K.V.S.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander R Ferrante

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Claudia M. Tesoro Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole J. Boland Esq.