This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:07 (UTC).

Charles Picarella, Jr. v. Secretary Pennsylvania Departm, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Charles Picarella, Jr filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary Pennsylvania Departm. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2588

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

CHARLES T. PICARELLA, JR.

Bellefonte, PA 16823

Defendant / Appellees

SECRETARY PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Charles T. Picarella Jr.

Attorney at Benner Township SCI

301 Institution Drive

Bellefonte, PA 16823

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John C. Manning Esq.

Attorney at Pennsylvania Board of Probation & Parole

1101 South Front Street, Suite 5100

Harrisburg, PA 17104

Ronald Eisenberg Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

Open Document #2

DC Order

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Charles T. Picarella, Jr. to Dismiss Appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Certificate of Service dated 07/28/2019. Service made by US mail. (MB) [Entered: 08/01/2019 04:14 PM]

Open Document #3

Caption

Open Document #4

Standing Order

Open Document #2

DC Order

Open Document

CLERK ORDER - RULE 4(a)(4) staying case pending disposition of post decision motion(s). (MB) [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:15 AM]

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). (MB) [Entered: 08/01/2019 04:16 PM]

Open Document #1

Send screening letter

Open Document #1

DC Memorandum

Open Document #2

1291

Open Document #5

Case Opening Letter

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) remanding appeal to District Court for the purpose of either issuance of a certficate of appealability or a statement of reasons why one should not issue. The appeal is STAYED pending determination by the District Court. (MB) [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:19 AM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). (MB) [Entered: 08/01/2019 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Charles T. Picarella, Jr. to Dismiss Appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Certificate of Service dated 07/28/2019. Service made by US mail. (MB) [Entered: 08/01/2019 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (SH) [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COPY OF MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF DISTRICT COURT dated 07/24/2019 signed by Christopher C. Conner. The motion for reconsideration is granted, the order dated June 6, 2019 is vacated and the Clerk of Court is directed to reopen this action, filed. (MB) [Entered: 07/24/2019 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) remanding appeal to District Court for the purpose of either issuance of a certficate of appealability or a statement of reasons why one should not issue. The appeal is STAYED pending determination by the District Court. (MB) [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER - RULE 4(a)(4) staying case pending disposition of post decision motion(s). (MB) [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (MB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Charles T. Picarella, Jr. in District Court No. 1-19-cv-00382. (MB) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.