This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/21/2021 at 06:06:09 (UTC).

Charles Holzner, et al v. DaVita Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 Charles Holzner filed an Other lawsuit against DaVita Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55261

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ex rel

Defendants

LIFELINE VASCULAR CARE

SOUTHWEST KIDNEY INSTITUTE, PLC

Defendant / Appellees

DAVITA KIDNEY CARE, a business entity, form unknown

DAVITA INC., a Delaware Corporation

DAVITA RX, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liablity Company

Plaintiff / Appellant

CHARLES M. HOLZNER, M.D., Relator, individually

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Aileen Marie Hunter Esquire

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

1920 Main Street, Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92614-7276

Michael J. Hofmann

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LLP

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 4100

Denver, CO 80203

Anne Redcross Beehler

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

1920 Main Street, Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92614-7276

Zachary Wood Fitzgerald

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner, LLP

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 4100

Denver, CO 80203-4541

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Abram Jay Zinberg

Attorney at The Zinberg Law Firm, APC

412 Olive Ave., Suite 528

Huntington Beach, CA 92648

William Kioki Hanagami

Attorney at Hanagami Law, A.P.C.

913 Tahoe Boulevard, Suite 5

Incline Village, NV 89451-7414

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

2 #1

Main Document

#2

Additional Document

#5

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12100685] (CL) [Entered: 05/03/2021 05:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Zachary Wood Fitzgerald for party(s) Appellee DaVita RX, LLC Appellee DaVita Inc. Appellee DaVita Kidney Care, in case 21-55261. [12077266] (NAC) [Entered: 04/16/2021 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Zachary W. Fitzgerald (Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP - 1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 4100, Denver, Colorado, 80203) for Appellees DaVita Inc., DaVita Kidney Care and DaVita RX, LLC. Date of service: 04/16/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12077195] [21-55261] (Fitzgerald, Zachary) [Entered: 04/16/2021 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 04/08/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12053596] (MS) [Entered: 03/25/2021 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docket(#4) Added Attorney(s) Anne Redcross Beehler for party(s) Appellee DaVita RX, LLC Appellee DaVita Inc. Appellee DaVita Kidney Care, in case 21-55261. [12053213] (RT) [Entered: 03/25/2021 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/24/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12052625]. [21-55261] (AD) [Entered: 03/24/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles M. Holzner Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/24/2021. [12052195] [21-55261] (Hanagami, William) [Entered: 03/24/2021 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Charles M. Holzner Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/29/2021. Transcript ordered by 04/19/2021. Transcript due 05/17/2021. Appellant Charles M. Holzner opening brief due 06/28/2021. Appellees DaVita Inc., DaVita Kidney Care and DaVita RX, LLC answering brief due 07/28/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12048586] (RT) [Entered: 03/22/2021 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAVITA RX LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DAVITA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abram Zinberg