This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:01:52 (UTC).

Charles Epley v. Montford Unit, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Charles Epley filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Montford Unit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10781

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

CHARLES EPLEY, also known as Pierryck Castellazzi

Defendant / Appellees

JULIO ESPINOSA, III, Officer at Montford

MARCO GONZALEZ, Sergeant at Montford

DAVID CAMARGO, Officer at Montford

BOBBY GUTIERREZ, Officer at Montford

RAFAEL GUITRON, III, Officer at Montford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Charles Epley

 

Court Documents

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/08/2019 for Appellant Charles Epley. [19-10781] (CB) [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:15 AM]

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Charles Epley [19-10781] (MVM) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:51 AM]

Open Document

EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion to proceed IFP [ # 9129492-2 ] filed by Appellant Mr. Charles Epley [19-10781] (RAJ) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:15 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9101522-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-10781] (CB) [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:18 AM]

Open Document

DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 08/05/2019 denying IFP for Appellant Mr. Charles Epley. Fee due on 08/30/2019 for Appellant Charles Epley [19-10781] (RAJ) [Entered: 08/16/2019 02:32 PM]

Open Document

UPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent. [19-10781] (MVM) [Entered: 07/24/2019 11:40 AM]

Open Restricted Document #1

Motion Filed on Behalf of Party

Open Restricted Document #2

Financial Affidavit

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/08/2019 for Appellant Charles Epley. [19-10781] (CB) [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-10781] (CB) [Entered: 08/29/2019 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:18-CV-142. Electronic ROA due on 09/10/2019. [19-10781] (RAJ) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion to proceed IFP [ # 9129492-2 ] filed by Appellant Mr. Charles Epley [19-10781] (RAJ) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Charles Epley to proceed in forma pauperis [9129492-2] Fee deadline canceled. [19-10781] (RAJ) [Entered: 08/26/2019 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 08/05/2019 denying IFP for Appellant Mr. Charles Epley. Fee due on 08/30/2019 for Appellant Charles Epley [19-10781] (RAJ) [Entered: 08/16/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent. [19-10781] (MVM) [Entered: 07/24/2019 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:18-CV-142. Electronic ROA due on 08/05/2019. [19-10781] (CB) [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9101522-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-10781] (CB) [Entered: 07/19/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • PARTY LIMIT CASE. (FOR A FULL LIST OF PARTIES FOR THIS APPEAL, PLEASE REFER TO THE DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET SHEET.) [19-10781] (MVM) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Charles Epley [19-10781] (MVM) [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.