This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/25/2019 at 06:04:55 (UTC).

Charbel Maksoud v. Philippe Guelton, et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2019 Charbel Maksoud filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Philippe Guelton. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55991

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

 

Party Details

Defendants

BT SOFTWARE AND RESEARCH, INC.

MOMENTUM MARKETING

ADLARGE

SCHRELL HOPKINS

PILLSBURY WINTHROP SHAW PITTMAN, LLP

BRUCE HOPKINS

TIRRELL PAYTON

DOES, 1-100

CHRISTIAN SALAMAN

SHAWN SMITH

PAUL WOODHULL

SHEKNOWS MEDIA

SOLUTIONS IQ, INC.

SUSAN GUILLORY

Defendant / Appellant

PHILIPPE GUELTON, an individual

Plaintiff / Appellee

CHARBEL MAKSOUD, Dr., an individual

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Dariush G. Adli

Attorney at ADLI Law Group

444 South Flower Street, Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Marc Y. Lazo

Attorney at Wilson Harvey Browndorf LLP

1900 Main Street

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 11/16/2019. See order for details. [11461633] (LW) [Entered: 10/11/2019 10:03 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 10/10/2019, 2:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11425531] (LW) [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant Philippe Guelton Correspondence: Representation Statement. Date of service: 09/04/2019 [11420365] [19-55991] (Adli, Dariush) [Entered: 09/04/2019 11:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • (#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/04/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11419716][19-55991] (AD) [Entered: 09/04/2019 06:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Appellee Charbel Maksoud Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/04/2019. [11419699] [19-55991] (Lazo, Marc) [Entered: 09/04/2019 02:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/03/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11419652][19-55991] (AD) [Entered: 09/03/2019 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Philippe Guelton Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/03/2019. [11419614] [19-55991] (Adli, Dariush) [Entered: 09/03/2019 05:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/03/2019. Transcript ordered by 09/23/2019. Transcript due 10/22/2019. Appellant Philippe Guelton opening brief due 12/02/2019. Appellee Charbel Maksoud answering brief due 01/03/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11410103] (RT) [Entered: 08/26/2019 11:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where EVOLVE MEDIA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABLITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc Y Lazo