This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:04:02 (UTC).

Channon v. LaRose

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Channon filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against LaRose. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2147

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

Brad LaRose, U.S. Marshals' Service

Petitioner / Appellant

Matthew Channon

Brooklyn, NY 11232

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Gregory L. Waples Esq.

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the District of Vermont

11 Elmwood Avenue, P.O. Box 570

Burlington, VT 05401

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Matthew Channon

Attorney at Federal Correctional Institution

Metropolitan Detention Center - Brooklyn, P.O. Box 329002

Brooklyn, NY 11232

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [7], on behalf of Appellant Matthew Channon, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2647680] [19-2147] [Entered: 09/05/2019 11:10 AM]

#4

(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2610319] [19-2147] [Entered: 07/16/2019 07:25 PM]

#15

(#15) MOTION, to set aside order, on behalf of Appellant Matthew Channon, FILED. Service date 08/29/2019 by US mail.[2647499] [19-2147] [Entered: 09/05/2019 09:51 AM]

5 #2

Certificate of Service

#10

(#10) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Matthew Channon, FILED. Service date 07/24/2019 by US mail.[2623774] [19-2147] [Entered: 08/05/2019 09:49 AM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2610317] [19-2147] [Entered: 07/16/2019 07:24 PM]

9 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#25

(#25) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Matthew Channon Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form [6] from the docket, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2654114] [19-2147] [Entered: 09/12/2019 02:40 PM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2610318] [19-2147] [Entered: 07/16/2019 07:25 PM]

5 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

#14

(#14) LETTER, dated 08/22/2019, on behalf of Appellant Matthew Channon, informing the Court of an address change, RECEIVED. Service date 08/22/2019 by US mail.[2644197] [19-2147] [Entered: 08/29/2019 06:49 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED+

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#13

(#13) ORDER, dated 08/19/2019, dismissing appeal by 09/09/2019, unless Appellant Matthew Channon, moves for certificate of appealability, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2635407] [19-2147] [Entered: 08/19/2019 10:03 AM]

9 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#8

(#8) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [6], on behalf of Appellant Matthew Channon, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2620085] [19-2147] [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:56 AM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER, dated 09/12/2019, dismissing appeal by 10/03/2019, unless Appellant Matthew Channon, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2654123] [19-2147] [Entered: 09/12/2019 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Matthew Channon Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form [6] from the docket, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2654114] [19-2147] [Entered: 09/12/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [7], on behalf of Appellant Matthew Channon, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2647680] [19-2147] [Entered: 09/05/2019 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION, to set aside order, on behalf of Appellant Matthew Channon, FILED. Service date 08/29/2019 by US mail.[2647499] [19-2147] [Entered: 09/05/2019 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) LETTER, dated 08/22/2019, on behalf of Appellant Matthew Channon, informing the Court of an address change, RECEIVED. Service date 08/22/2019 by US mail.[2644197] [19-2147] [Entered: 08/29/2019 06:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER, dated 08/19/2019, dismissing appeal by 09/09/2019, unless Appellant Matthew Channon, moves for certificate of appealability, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2635407] [19-2147] [Entered: 08/19/2019 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) UNDELIVERABLE MAIL, to USCA from USPS, RECEIVED.[2635402] [19-2147] [Entered: 08/19/2019 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Matthew Channon, FILED. Service date 07/24/2019 by US mail.[2623774] [19-2147] [Entered: 08/05/2019 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2623597] [19-2147] [Entered: 08/02/2019 05:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [6], on behalf of Appellant Matthew Channon, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2620085] [19-2147] [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#7) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Matthew Channon, FILED. Service date 07/24/2019 by US mail.[2620082] [19-2147] [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • (#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Matthew Channon, FILED. Service date 07/24/2019 by US mail.[2620081] [19-2147] [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Brad LaRose, FILED. Service date 07/29/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2619600] [19-2147] [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2610319] [19-2147] [Entered: 07/16/2019 07:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2610318] [19-2147] [Entered: 07/16/2019 07:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2610317] [19-2147] [Entered: 07/16/2019 07:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Matthew Channon, FILED. [2610316] [19-2147] [Entered: 07/16/2019 07:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less