This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/17/2020 at 06:14:53 (UTC).

Chandan Panda, et al v. Michael Pompeo, et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Chandan Panda filed an Other lawsuit against Michael Pompeo. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5284

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Sruthi Kasam

Krishnan Gopalan

Pragya Diwakar

Chandan Panda

Anish Reddy Kuchanpally

Vinod Winston Albuquerque

Karan Murgai

Akshay Joshi

Ravi Krishna Paladagu

Narendra Singh

Gautham Ganesh Ambekar

Lokesh Ramamurthy

Sabitha Polsani

Nagesh Shenisetty

Sarabu Puduppadi Sairam

Sankeerth Rajuri

Naga Anusha Polineni

Renuka Deshmukh

Defendant / Appellees

Eugene Scalia, Secretary, U.S. Department of Labor

Michael R. Pompeo, Secretary, U.S. Department of State

33 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Bradley Bruce Banias

Attorney at Wasden Banias LLC

1037 Chuck Dawley Boulevard, Suite D100

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Geoffrey Forney

Attorney at Wasden Banias LLC

411 West Ellet Street

Philadelphia, PA 19119

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

DOJ Appellate Counsel

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Aaron Steven Goldsmith

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0868

Joshua Samuel Press Esquire

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0868

Matthew J. Glover

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Glenn Matthew Girdharry

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0868

Scott Grant Stewart

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Jeffrey Bossert Clark Esquire Sr.

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Appellants' Appendix

Open Document #1

Motion Filed (Unopposed)

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1870037] filed by Radhika Adusumilli, Gautham Ganesh Ambekar, Somya Arora, Meghana Barkalle, Kiruthika Baskaran, Sobhana Bhartiya, Mallikarjuna Rao Cheruvu, Renuka Deshmukh, Pragya Diwakar, Poorva Dixit, Lokesh Ghanta, Saptha Aswini Gidugu, Krishnan Gopalan, Vamshi Goparapu, Pradeep Gunda, Akshay Joshi, Sruthi Kasam, Parveen Kaur, Shivani Khanduja, Ammi Reddy Konda, Siddharth Krishnan, Anish Reddy Kuchanpally, Anusha Kumar, Ardhendu Mishra, Karan Murgai, Daksha Nagpal, Kartheek Reddy Nannuru, Vinod Kumar Pabbathi, Ravi Krishna Paladagu, Chandan Panda, Naga Monika Penmetsa, Naga Anusha Polineni, Sabitha Polsani, Prasiddha Raghuraman, Sankeerth Rajuri, Devendrakumar Ramachandran, Lokesh Ramamurthy, Rashmitha Ramasahayam, Renukadevi Ravichandran, Sarabu Puduppadi Sairam, Avdeep Singh Sandhu, Nagesh Shenisetty, Adityadev Singh, Harpreet Singh, Narendra Singh, Chitra Viswanathan and Aman Wadhwa [Service Date: 11/06/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6490 Words. [20-5284] (Forney, Geoffrey) [Entered: 11/06/2020 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1869201] filed by Radhika Adusumilli, Gautham Ganesh Ambekar, Somya Arora, Meghana Barkalle, Kiruthika Baskaran, Sobhana Bhartiya, Mallikarjuna Rao Cheruvu, Renuka Deshmukh, Pragya Diwakar, Poorva Dixit, Lokesh Ghanta, Saptha Aswini Gidugu, Krishnan Gopalan, Vamshi Goparapu, Pradeep Gunda, Akshay Joshi, Sruthi Kasam, Parveen Kaur, Shivani Khanduja, Ammi Reddy Konda, Siddharth Krishnan, Anish Reddy Kuchanpally, Anusha Kumar, Ardhendu Mishra, Karan Murgai, Daksha Nagpal, Kartheek Reddy Nannuru, Vinod Kumar Pabbathi, Ravi Krishna Paladagu, Chandan Panda, Naga Anusha Polineni, Sabitha Polsani, Prasiddha Raghuraman, Sankeerth Rajuri, Devendrakumar Ramachandran, Lokesh Ramamurthy, Rashmitha Ramasahayam, Renukadevi Ravichandran, Sarabu Puduppadi Sairam, Avdeep Singh Sandhu, Nagesh Shenisetty, Adityadev Singh, Harpreet Singh, Narendra Singh, Chitra Viswanathan and Aman Wadhwa [Service Date: 10/30/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6492 Words. [20-5284] (Forney, Geoffrey) [Entered: 10/30/2020 10:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1869178] filed by Radhika Adusumilli, Gautham Ganesh Ambekar, Somya Arora, Meghana Barkalle, Kiruthika Baskaran, Sobhana Bhartiya, Mallikarjuna Rao Cheruvu, Renuka Deshmukh, Pragya Diwakar, Poorva Dixit, Lokesh Ghanta, Saptha Aswini Gidugu, Krishnan Gopalan, Vamshi Goparapu, Pradeep Gunda, Akshay Joshi, Sruthi Kasam, Parveen Kaur, Shivani Khanduja, Ammi Reddy Konda, Siddharth Krishnan, Anish Reddy Kuchanpally, Anusha Kumar, Ardhendu Mishra, Karan Murgai, Daksha Nagpal, Kartheek Reddy Nannuru, Vinod Kumar Pabbathi, Ravi Krishna Paladagu, Chandan Panda, Naga Monika Penmetsa, Naga Anusha Polineni, Sabitha Polsani, Prasiddha Raghuraman, Sankeerth Rajuri, Devendrakumar Ramachandran, Lokesh Ramamurthy, Rashmitha Ramasahayam, Renukadevi Ravichandran, Sarabu Puduppadi Sairam, Avdeep Singh Sandhu, Nagesh Shenisetty, Adityadev Singh, Harpreet Singh, Narendra Singh, Chitra Viswanathan and Aman Wadhwa [Service Date: 10/30/2020 ] Length of Brief: 6470 Words. [20-5284] (Forney, Geoffrey) [Entered: 10/30/2020 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPER CURIAM ORDER [1868231] filed denying motion to expedite oral argument [ # 1867124-2 ] in 20-5284. The Clerk will calendar these cases for oral argument on the same day before the same merits panel, and that merits panel retains the discretion to reschedule oral argument to an earlier date, if appropriate. Before Judges: Henderson, Rogers and Walker. [20-5284, 20-5292] [Entered: 10/27/2020 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1867144] filed by Radhika Adusumilli, Gautham Ganesh Ambekar, Somya Arora, Meghana Barkalle, Kiruthika Baskaran, Sobhana Bhartiya, Mallikarjuna Rao Cheruvu, Renuka Deshmukh, Pragya Diwakar, Poorva Dixit, Lokesh Ghanta, Saptha Aswini Gidugu, Krishnan Gopalan, Vamshi Goparapu, Pradeep Gunda, Akshay Joshi, Sruthi Kasam, Parveen Kaur, Shivani Khanduja, Ammi Reddy Konda, Siddharth Krishnan, Anish Reddy Kuchanpally, Anusha Kumar, Ardhendu Mishra, Karan Murgai, Daksha Nagpal, Kartheek Reddy Nannuru, Vinod Kumar Pabbathi, Ravi Krishna Paladagu, Chandan Panda, Naga Monika Penmetsa, Naga Anusha Polineni, Sabitha Polsani, Prasiddha Raghuraman, Sankeerth Rajuri, Devendrakumar Ramachandran, Lokesh Ramamurthy, Rashmitha Ramasahayam, Renukadevi Ravichandran, Sarabu Puduppadi Sairam, Avdeep Singh Sandhu, Nagesh Shenisetty, Adityadev Singh, Narendra Singh, Chitra Viswanathan and Aman Wadhwa [Service Date: 10/19/2020 ] [20-5284] (Forney, Geoffrey) [Entered: 10/19/2020 11:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION [1867124] to expedite oral argument filed by Radhika Adusumilli, Vinod Winston Albuquerque, Gautham Ganesh Ambekar, Somya Arora, Meghana Barkalle, Kiruthika Baskaran, Sobhana Bhartiya, Mallikarjuna Rao Cheruvu, Mounika Damarla, Renuka Deshmukh, Pragya Diwakar, Poorva Dixit, Lokesh Ghanta, Saptha Aswini Gidugu, Krishnan Gopalan, Vamshi Goparapu, Pradeep Gunda, Akshay Joshi, Sruthi Kasam, Parveen Kaur, Shivani Khanduja, Ammi Reddy Konda, Siddharth Krishnan, Anish Reddy Kuchanpally, Anusha Kumar, Ardhendu Mishra, Karan Murgai, Daksha Nagpal, Kartheek Reddy Nannuru, Vinod Kumar Pabbathi, Ravi Krishna Paladagu, Chandan Panda, Nagesh Peddada, Naga Monika Penmetsa, Naga Anusha Polineni, Sabitha Polsani, Prasiddha Raghuraman, Sankeerth Rajuri, Devendrakumar Ramachandran, Lokesh Ramamurthy, Rashmitha Ramasahayam, Renukadevi Ravichandran, Sarabu Puduppadi Sairam, Avdeep Singh Sandhu, Nagesh Shenisetty, Adityadev Singh, Harpreet Singh, Narendra Singh, Chitra Viswanathan and Aman Wadhwa (Service Date: 10/19/2020 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2040 words. [20-5284] (Banias, Bradley) [Entered: 10/19/2020 05:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPER CURIAM ORDER [1866320] filed considering unopposed motion to expedite case [ # 1865515-2 ] in 20-5292, setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 10/29/2020. APPENDIX due 10/29/2020. APPELLEE Brief due on 11/30/2020. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 12/11/2020; The Clerk is directed to calendar No. 20-5284 and No. 20-5292 for oral argument on the same day and before the same panel on the first appropriate date in January 2021. The parties will be informed later of the date of oral argument and the composition of the merits panel. Before Judges: Henderson, Rogers and Walker. [20-5284, 20-5292] [Entered: 10/14/2020 05:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLEE BRIEF [1866023] filed by Mr. Michael R. Pompeo, Eugene Scalia and Chad F. Wolf [Service Date: 10/13/2020 ] Length of Brief: 12,863 Words. [20-5284] (Girdharry, Glenn) [Entered: 10/13/2020 11:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX [1863502] filed by Radhika Adusumilli, Gautham Ganesh Ambekar, Somya Arora, Meghana Barkalle, Kiruthika Baskaran, Sobhana Bhartiya, Mallikarjuna Rao Cheruvu, Renuka Deshmukh, Pragya Diwakar, Poorva Dixit, Lokesh Ghanta, Saptha Aswini Gidugu, Krishnan Gopalan, Vamshi Goparapu, Pradeep Gunda, Akshay Joshi, Parveen Kaur, Shivani Khanduja, Ammi Reddy Konda, Siddharth Krishnan, Anish Reddy Kuchanpally, Anusha Kumar, Ardhendu Mishra, Karan Murgai, Daksha Nagpal, Kartheek Reddy Nannuru, Vinod Kumar Pabbathi, Ravi Krishna Paladagu, Chandan Panda, Naga Monika Penmetsa, Naga Anusha Polineni, Sabitha Polsani, Prasiddha Raghuraman, Sankeerth Rajuri, Devendrakumar Ramachandran, Lokesh Ramamurthy, Rashmitha Ramasahayam, Renukadevi Ravichandran, Sarabu Puduppadi Sairam, Avdeep Singh Sandhu, Nagesh Shenisetty, Adityadev Singh, Harpreet Singh, Narendra Singh, Chitra Viswanathan and Aman Wadhwa. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 09/25/2020 ] [20-5284] (Forney, Geoffrey) [Entered: 09/25/2020 05:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT BRIEF [1863421] filed by Radhika Adusumilli, Gautham Ganesh Ambekar, Somya Arora, Meghana Barkalle, Kiruthika Baskaran, Sobhana Bhartiya, Mallikarjuna Rao Cheruvu, Renuka Deshmukh, Pragya Diwakar, Poorva Dixit, Lokesh Ghanta, Saptha Aswini Gidugu, Krishnan Gopalan, Vamshi Goparapu, Pradeep Gunda, Akshay Joshi, Sruthi Kasam, Parveen Kaur, Shivani Khanduja, Ammi Reddy Konda, Siddharth Krishnan, Anish Reddy Kuchanpally, Anusha Kumar, Ardhendu Mishra, Karan Murgai, Daksha Nagpal, Kartheek Reddy Nannuru, Vinod Kumar Pabbathi, Ravi Krishna Paladagu, Chandan Panda, Naga Monika Penmetsa, Naga Anusha Polineni, Sabitha Polsani, Prasiddha Raghuraman, Sankeerth Rajuri, Devendrakumar Ramachandran, Lokesh Ramamurthy, Rashmitha Ramasahayam, Renukadevi Ravichandran, Sarabu Puduppadi Sairam, Avdeep Singh Sandhu, Nagesh Shenisetty, Adityadev Singh, Harpreet Singh, Narendra Singh, Chitra Viswanathan and Aman Wadhwa [Service Date: 09/25/2020 ] Length of Brief: 12,972 words. [20-5284] (Forney, Geoffrey) [Entered: 09/25/2020 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1862899] filed by Radhika Adusumilli, Gautham Ganesh Ambekar, Somya Arora, Meghana Barkalle, Kiruthika Baskaran, Sobhana Bhartiya, Mallikarjuna Rao Cheruvu, Renuka Deshmukh, Pragya Diwakar, Poorva Dixit, Lokesh Ghanta, Saptha Aswini Gidugu, Krishnan Gopalan, Vamshi Goparapu, Pradeep Gunda, Akshay Joshi, Sruthi Kasam, Parveen Kaur, Shivani Khanduja, Ammi Reddy Konda, Siddharth Krishnan, Anish Reddy Kuchanpally, Anusha Kumar, Ardhendu Mishra, Karan Murgai, Daksha Nagpal, Kartheek Reddy Nannuru, Vinod Kumar Pabbathi, Ravi Krishna Paladagu, Chandan Panda, Naga Monika Penmetsa, Naga Anusha Polineni, Sabitha Polsani, Prasiddha Raghuraman, Sankeerth Rajuri, Devendrakumar Ramachandran, Lokesh Ramamurthy, Rashmitha Ramasahayam, Renukadevi Ravichandran, Sarabu Puduppadi Sairam, Avdeep Singh Sandhu, Nagesh Shenisetty, Adityadev Singh, Harpreet Singh, Narendra Singh, Chitra Viswanathan and Aman Wadhwa [Service Date: 09/20/2020 ] [20-5284] (Forney, Geoffrey) [Entered: 09/23/2020 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION [1862896] to expedite case filed by Radhika Adusumilli, Gautham Ganesh Ambekar, Somya Arora, Meghana Barkalle, Kiruthika Baskaran, Sobhana Bhartiya, Mallikarjuna Rao Cheruvu, Renuka Deshmukh, Pragya Diwakar, Poorva Dixit, Lokesh Ghanta, Saptha Aswini Gidugu, Krishnan Gopalan, Vamshi Goparapu, Pradeep Gunda, Akshay Joshi, Sruthi Kasam, Parveen Kaur, Shivani Khanduja, Ammi Reddy Konda, Siddharth Krishnan, Anish Reddy Kuchanpally, Anusha Kumar, Ardhendu Mishra, Karan Murgai, Daksha Nagpal, Kartheek Reddy Nannuru, Vinod Kumar Pabbathi, Ravi Krishna Paladagu, Chandan Panda, Naga Monika Penmetsa, Naga Anusha Polineni, Sabitha Polsani, Prasiddha Raghuraman, Sankeerth Rajuri, Devendrakumar Ramachandran, Lokesh Ramamurthy, Rashmitha Ramasahayam, Renukadevi Ravichandran, Sarabu Puduppadi Sairam, Avdeep Singh Sandhu, Nagesh Shenisetty, Adityadev Singh, Harpreet Singh, Narendra Singh, Chitra Viswanathan and Aman Wadhwa [Service Date: 09/22/2020 ] Length Certification: 12 pages of text (without certificates) containing 2709 words. [20-5284] (Forney, Geoffrey) [Entered: 09/22/2020 10:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1862697] submitted by Radhika Adusumilli, Vinod Winston Albuquerque, Gautham Ganesh Ambekar, Somya Arora, Meghana Barkalle, Kiruthika Baskaran, Sobhana Bhartiya, Mallikarjuna Rao Cheruvu, Mounika Damarla, Renuka Deshmukh, Pragya Diwakar, Poorva Dixit, Lokesh Ghanta, Saptha Aswini Gidugu, Krishnan Gopalan, Vamshi Goparapu, Pradeep Gunda, Akshay Joshi, Sruthi Kasam, Parveen Kaur, Shivani Khanduja, Ammi Reddy Konda, Siddharth Krishnan, Anish Reddy Kuchanpally, Anusha Kumar, Ardhendu Mishra, Karan Murgai, Daksha Nagpal, Kartheek Reddy Nannuru, Vinod Kumar Pabbathi, Ravi Krishna Paladagu, Chandan Panda, Nagesh Peddada, Naga Monika Penmetsa, Naga Anusha Polineni, Sabitha Polsani, Prasiddha Raghuraman, Sankeerth Rajuri, Devendrakumar Ramachandran, Lokesh Ramamurthy, Rashmitha Ramasahayam, Renukadevi Ravichandran, Sarabu Puduppadi Sairam, Avdeep Singh Sandhu, Nagesh Shenisetty, Adityadev Singh, Harpreet Singh, Narendra Singh, Chitra Viswanathan and Aman Wadhwa [Service Date: 09/21/2020 ] [20-5284] (Forney, Geoffrey) [Entered: 09/21/2020 09:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1862678] filed by Radhika Adusumilli, Vinod Winston Albuquerque, Gautham Ganesh Ambekar, Somya Arora, Meghana Barkalle, Kiruthika Baskaran, Sobhana Bhartiya, Mallikarjuna Rao Cheruvu, Mounika Damarla, Renuka Deshmukh, Pragya Diwakar, Poorva Dixit, Lokesh Ghanta, Saptha Aswini Gidugu, Krishnan Gopalan, Vamshi Goparapu, Pradeep Gunda, Akshay Joshi, Sruthi Kasam, Parveen Kaur, Shivani Khanduja, Ammi Reddy Konda, Siddharth Krishnan, Anish Reddy Kuchanpally, Anusha Kumar, Ardhendu Mishra, Karan Murgai, Daksha Nagpal, Kartheek Reddy Nannuru, Vinod Kumar Pabbathi, Ravi Krishna Paladagu, Chandan Panda, Nagesh Peddada, Naga Monika Penmetsa, Naga Anusha Polineni, Sabitha Polsani, Prasiddha Raghuraman, Sankeerth Rajuri, Devendrakumar Ramachandran, Lokesh Ramamurthy, Rashmitha Ramasahayam, Renukadevi Ravichandran, Sarabu Puduppadi Sairam, Avdeep Singh Sandhu, Nagesh Shenisetty, Adityadev Singh, Harpreet Singh, Narendra Singh, Chitra Viswanathan and Aman Wadhwa [Service Date: 09/21/2020 ] [20-5284] (Forney, Geoffrey) [Entered: 09/21/2020 06:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1862674] filed by Geoffrey Forney and co-counsel Bradley B. Banias on behalf of Appellants Radhika Adusumilli, Vinod Winston Albuquerque, Gautham Ganesh Ambekar, Somya Arora, Meghana Barkalle, Kiruthika Baskaran, Sobhana Bhartiya, Mallikarjuna Rao Cheruvu, Mounika Damarla, Renuka Deshmukh, Pragya Diwakar, Poorva Dixit, Lokesh Ghanta, Saptha Aswini Gidugu, Krishnan Gopalan, Vamshi Goparapu, Pradeep Gunda, Akshay Joshi, Sruthi Kasam, Parveen Kaur, Shivani Khanduja, Ammi Reddy Konda, Siddharth Krishnan, Anish Reddy Kuchanpally, Anusha Kumar, Ardhendu Mishra, Karan Murgai, Daksha Nagpal, Kartheek Reddy Nannuru, Vinod Kumar Pabbathi, Ravi Krishna Paladagu, Chandan Panda, Nagesh Peddada, Naga Monika Penmetsa, Naga Anusha Polineni, Sabitha Polsani, Prasiddha Raghuraman, Sankeerth Rajuri, Devendrakumar Ramachandran, Lokesh Ramamurthy, Rashmitha Ramasahayam, Renukadevi Ravichandran, Sarabu Puduppadi Sairam, Avdeep Singh Sandhu, Nagesh Shenisetty, Adityadev Singh, Harpreet Singh, Narendra Singh, Chitra Viswanathan and Aman Wadhwa. [20-5284] (Forney, Geoffrey) [Entered: 09/21/2020 06:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1862398] filed by Aaron S. Goldsmith and co-counsel Joshua S. Press on behalf of Appellees Eugene Scalia, Mr. Michael R. Pompeo and Chad F. Wolf. [20-5284] (Press, Joshua) [Entered: 09/18/2020 08:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1862392] filed by Glenn M. Girdharry and co-counsel Matthew J. Glover on behalf of Appellees Mr. Michael R. Pompeo, Eugene Scalia and Chad F. Wolf. [20-5284] (Glover, Matthew) [Entered: 09/18/2020 07:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1862323] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 10/19/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 10/19/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 10/19/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 10/19/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 10/19/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 10/19/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 10/19/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 10/19/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 11/02/2020. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 10/19/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 10/19/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 10/19/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 11/02/2020 [20-5284] [Entered: 09/18/2020 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1862320] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:20-cv-01907-APM filed by Radhika Adusumilli, Vinod Winston Albuquerque, Gautham Ganesh Ambekar, Somya Arora, Meghana Barkalle, Kiruthika Baskaran, Sobhana Bhartiya, Mallikarjuna Rao Cheruvu, Mounika Damarla, Renuka Deshmukh, Pragya Diwakar, Poorva Dixit, Lokesh Ghanta, Saptha Aswini Gidugu, Krishnan Gopalan, Vamshi Goparapu, Pradeep Gunda, Akshay Joshi, Sruthi Kasam, Parveen Kaur, Shivani Khanduja, Ammi Reddy Konda, Siddharth Krishnan, Anish Reddy Kuchanpally, Anusha Kumar, Ardhendu Mishra, Karan Murgai, Daksha Nagpal, Kartheek Reddy Nannuru, Vinod Kumar Pabbathi, Ravi Krishna Paladagu, Chandan Panda, Nagesh Peddada, Naga Monika Penmetsa, Naga Anusha Polineni, Sabitha Polsani, Prasiddha Raghuraman, Sankeerth Rajuri, Devendrakumar Ramachandran, Lokesh Ramamurthy, Rashmitha Ramasahayam, Renukadevi Ravichandran, Sarabu Puduppadi Sairam, Avdeep Singh Sandhu, Nagesh Shenisetty, Adityadev Singh, Harpreet Singh, Narendra Singh, Chitra Viswanathan and Aman Wadhwa. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5284. [20-5284] [Entered: 09/18/2020 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5284] [Entered: 09/18/2020 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eugene Scalia, Secretary, US Department of Labor is a litigant

Latest cases where Michael R. Pompeo, Secretary of State is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron Steven Goldsmith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Glenn Matthew Girdharry