This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:28 (UTC).

Chancy Jones v. Mike Parris

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Chancy Jones filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Mike Parris. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5758

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

MIKE PARRIS, Warden

Petitioner / Appellant

CHANCY JONES

Wartburg, TN 37887

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

John H. Bledsoe

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202-0207

Meredith Wood Bowen

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

500 Charlotte Avenue

Nashville, TN 37243

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Chancy Jones

Attorney at Morgan County Correctional Complex

P.O. Box 2000

Wartburg, TN 37887

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed regarding motion grant certificate of appealability previously filed by Mr. Chancy Jones in 19-5758. Certificate of service:08/11/2019. (MMP) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:38 PM]

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Chancy Jones to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 08/11/2019. (MMP) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:25 PM]

#5

(#5) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 4 ], filed by Ms. Meredith Wood Bowen for Mike Parris is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. (MMP) [Entered: 08/13/2019 08:33 AM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Mike Parris by Meredith W. Bowen. Certificate of Service: 08/12/2019. [19-5758] (MWB) [Entered: 08/12/2019 04:00 PM]

#7

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Chancy Jones to grant a certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 08/11/2019. (MMP) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:36 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Mike Parris by John H. Bledsoe. Certificate of Service: 07/17/2019. [19-5758] (JHB) [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:22 AM]

#1

(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied in district court on 6/13/19. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Chancy Jones. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:36 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed regarding motion grant certificate of appealability previously filed by Mr. Chancy Jones in 19-5758. Certificate of service:08/11/2019. (MMP) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Chancy Jones to grant a certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 08/11/2019. (MMP) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Prisoner trust account statement filed. (MMP) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Financial Affidavit filed by Party Mr. Chancy Jones Certificate of Service: 08/11/2019. (MMP) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Chancy Jones to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 08/11/2019. (MMP) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form , [ # 4 ], filed by Ms. Meredith Wood Bowen for Mike Parris is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. (MMP) [Entered: 08/13/2019 08:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Mike Parris by Meredith W. Bowen. Certificate of Service: 08/12/2019. [19-5758] (MWB) [Entered: 08/12/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Mike Parris by John H. Bledsoe. Certificate of Service: 07/17/2019. [19-5758] (JHB) [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#2) The case manager for this case is: Monica Page (MMP) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied in district court on 6/13/19. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Chancy Jones. Transcript needed: n. (MMP) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less