This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/24/2020 at 06:03:59 (UTC).

Chamber of Commerce of the USA, et al v. Xavier Becerra, et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 Chamber of Commerce of the USA, filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Xavier Becerra,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15291

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

HOME CARE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA

CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION FOR HEALTH SERVICES AT HOME

NATIONAL RETAIL FEDERATION

CALIFORNIA RETAILERS ASSOCIATION

NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECURITY COMPANIES

CALIFORNIA CHAMBER OF COMMERCE

Defendant / Appellants

KEVIN RICHARD KISH, in his official capacity as Director of the California Department of Fair Employment and Housing of the State of California

LILIA GARCIA-BROWER, in her official capacity as the Labor Commissioner of the State of California

JULIE A. SU, in her official capacity as the Secretary of the California Labor and Workforce Development Agency

XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of the State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Archis Ashok Parasharami

Andrew John Pincus

Donald Manwell Falk

Bruce J. Sarchet Esquire

Maurice Baskin Esquire

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Chad Allen Stegeman Esquire

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#3

#4

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellants Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Kevin Richard Kish and Julie A. Su Correspondence: NOTICE: The Court is notified that due to logistical issues related to the COVID-19 virus, Defendants-Appellants require a 60-day extension of time to file the Appellants Opening Brief, currently due on March 18, 2020.. Date of service: 03/17/2020 [11632135] [20-15291] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 03/17/2020 10:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or circumstances develop that might warrant settlement discussions. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11620471] (VS) [Entered: 03/06/2020 09:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/03/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11617251]. [20-15291] (AD) [Entered: 03/03/2020 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellants Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Kevin Richard Kish and Julie A. Su Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/03/2020. [11616673] [20-15291] (Stegeman, Chad) [Entered: 03/03/2020 01:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellants have filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11615958] (LW) [Entered: 03/03/2020 09:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed February 19, 2020 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than March 18, 2020; the answering brief is due April 15, 2020 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31- 2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11608673] (RT) [Entered: 02/25/2020 03:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: To be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal, C.R. 3-3. [11605925] (JBS) [Entered: 02/24/2020 09:09 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less