This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/12/2021 at 06:26:28 (UTC).

Chad Parker, et al v. Governor of Pennsylvania, et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 Chad Parker filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Governor of Pennsylvania. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3518

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

REBECCA KENWICK-PARKER

MARK REDMAN

DONNA REDMAN

CHAD PARKER

Defendant / Appellees

SECRETARY PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH

ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA

GOVERNOR OF PENNSYLVANIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Robert J. Muise Esq.

Attorney at American Freedom Law Center

P.O. Box 131098

Ann Arbor, MI 48113

Andrea L. Shaw Esq.

2011 West Trindle Road, P.O. Box 1766

Carlisle, PA 17013

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Claudia M. Tesoro Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1600 Arch Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Karen M. Romano Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Keli M. Neary Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Nicole J. Boland Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Sean A. Kirkpatrick Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

J. Bart DeLone Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Daniel B. Mullen Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania

1251 Waterfront Place, Mezzanine Level

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

12 #2

Exhibits

12 #1

Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal

11 #2

Briefing Notice Issued

11 #1

Briefing and Scheduling Order

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #4

MEMORANDUM AND ORDER

1 #3

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Case Caption

#1

Case Opening Letter

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • Docket(#20) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Rebecca Kenwick-Parker, Chad Parker, Donna Redman and Mark Redman - Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 2 (Volume I attached to Brief). (GPK) [Entered: 02/05/2021 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • Docket(#19) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Rebecca Kenwick-Parker, Chad Parker, Donna Redman and Mark Redman - Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 7. (KEL) [Entered: 02/04/2021 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Rebecca Kenwick-Parker, Chad Parker, Donna Redman and Mark Redman. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2021 by ECF. [20-3518] (RJM) [Entered: 02/01/2021 09:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellants Rebecca Kenwick-Parker, Chad Parker, Donna Redman and Mark Redman. Certificate of Service dated 02/01/2021 by ECF. [20-3518] (RJM) [Entered: 02/01/2021 09:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER (AMBRO and SHWARTZ, Circuit Judges) The foregoing Motion by Appellants Rebecca Kenwick-Parker, Chad Parker, Donna Redman and Mark Redman for injunction pending appeal is denied. Panel No.: BCO-028-E. Ambro, Authoring Judge. (LMR) [Entered: 01/19/2021 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: Reply by Appellants Rebecca Kenwick-Parker, Chad Parker, Donna Redman and Mark Redman to Response. Certificate of Service dated 01/14/2021. Service made by ECF [20-3518] (RJM) [Entered: 01/14/2021 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: Opposition Response filed by Appellees Attorney General Pennsylvania, Governor of Pennsylvania and Secretary Pennsylvania Department of Health to motion. Certificate of Service dated 01/12/2021. [20-3518] (SAK) [Entered: 01/12/2021 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk). Any response to Appellants' motion for injunction pending appeal must be filed and served no later than Tuesday, January 12, 2021. (KM) [Entered: 01/06/2021 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellants Rebecca Kenwick-Parker, Chad Parker, Donna Redman and Mark Redman for injunction pending appeal. Certificate of Service dated 01/05/2021. Service made by ECF. [20-3518] (RJM) [Entered: 01/05/2021 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Rebecca Kenwick-Parker, Chad Parker, Donna Redman and Mark Redman due on or before 02/01/2021. Appendix due on or before 02/01/2021. (LMR) [Entered: 12/21/2020 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Rebecca Kenwick-Parker, Chad Parker, Donna Redman and Mark Redman. [20-3518] (RJM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Rebecca Kenwick-Parker, Chad Parker, Donna Redman and Mark Redman. [20-3518] (RJM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daniel B. Mullen on behalf of Appellee(s) Governor of Pennsylvania; Attorney General of Pennsylvania; Secretary Pennsylvania Department of Health. [20-3518] (DBM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Rebecca Kenwick-Parker, Chad Parker, Donna Redman and Mark Redman advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. Wendy C. Yinger. [20-3518] (RJM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert Joseph Muise on behalf of Appellant(s) Chad Parker, Rebecca Kenwick-Parker, Mark Redman, Donna Redman. [20-3518] (RJM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J. Bart DeLone, Chief Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Appellee(s) Governor of Pa., Attorney General of Pa., Secretary of Pa. Dept. of Health. [20-3518] (JBD) [Entered: 12/15/2020 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Claudia M. Tesoro on behalf of Appellee(s) Governor of Pennsylvania, Attorney General of Pennsylvania, Secretary of Pennsylvania Department of Health. [20-3518] (CMT) [Entered: 12/14/2020 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sean A. Kirkpatrick on behalf of Appellee(s) Governor of Pennsylvania, Attorney General of Pennsylvania, Secretary of Pennsylvania Department of Health. [20-3518] (SAK) [Entered: 12/14/2020 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 12/14/2020 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Rebecca Kenwick-Parker, Chad Parker, Donna Redman and Mark Redman in District Court No. 1-20-cv-01601. (LMR) [Entered: 12/14/2020 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOVERNOR OF PENNSYLVANIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Bart DeLone Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Claudia M. Tesoro Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole J. Boland Esq.