This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/29/2020 at 06:10:54 (UTC).

Chad Barnes v. Kris Henry, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Chad Barnes filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Kris Henry, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-17141

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

 

Party Details

Defendants

ALOHA OCEAN EXCURSIONS LLC

JOHN DOES 1-20

DOE GOVERNMENTAL AGENCIES 1-20

OTHER ENTITIES 1-20, In Personam

DOE ASSOCIATES 1-20

DOE PARTNERSHIPS 1-20

KRIS HENRY

MARY DOES 1-20

SEA HAWAII RAFTING, LLC

DOE CORPORATIONS 1-20

M/V TEHANI, Ha-1629-CP her engines, equipment, tackle, FARES, stores, PERMITS, furnishings, cargo and freight, In Rem

Defendant / Appellees

R.S. MARLIN INC., DBA Ali`i Ocean Tours

MARY LYN OLGETREE

KRIS HENRY, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

CHAD BARRY BARNES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Jared Washkowitz

Attorney at Jaw Legal

1050 Bishop Street, Suite 450

Honolulu, HI 96813

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jay Lawrence Friedheim Esquire

Attorney at Admiralty Advocates

866 Iwilei Road Suite 201

Honolulu, HI 96817

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

3 #1

Main Document

3 #2

Additional Document

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11910740] (LW) [Entered: 12/01/2020 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2020
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/20/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11902158]. [20-17141] (AD) [Entered: 11/21/2020 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellant Chad Barry Barnes Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/20/2020. [11902110] [20-17141] (Friedheim, Jay) [Entered: 11/20/2020 07:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11888568] (LW) [Entered: 11/10/2020 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Chad Barry Barnes Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/06/2020. Transcript ordered by 11/27/2020. Transcript due 12/28/2020. Appellant Chad Barry Barnes opening brief due 02/05/2021. Appellees Kris Henry, Inc., Mary Lyn Olgetree and R.S. Marlin Inc. answering brief due 03/08/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11876848] (JBS) [Entered: 10/30/2020 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sea Hawaii Rafting, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay L Friedheim