This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/02/2019 at 06:08:14 (UTC).

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd v. Transport Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 Certain Underwriters at Lloyd filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Transport Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1310

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON

Respondent

TRANSPORT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Joseph Kevin Scully

Michael P. Mullins

Elizabeth Pesses Retersdorf

Respondent Attorneys

Rodney Elliott Gould

Lloyd A. Gura

Raymond Mastrangelo

Robert Charles Mueller

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 06/17/2019 for appellant Transport Insurance Company. Appendix due 06/17/2019 for appellant Transport Insurance Company. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1310] (GRC) [Entered: 05/08/2019 10:52 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London filed by Attorney Joseph K. Scully. Certificate of service dated 04/19/2019. [19-1310] (JKS) [Entered: 04/19/2019 04:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 05/02/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless she registers for an appellate ECF account: Elizabeth P. Retersdorf for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London. [19-1310] (GRC) [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Transport Insurance Company indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 04/17/2019. [19-1310] (LAG) [Entered: 04/17/2019 11:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Transport Insurance Company filed by Attorney Raymond Mastrangelo. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2019. [19-1310] (RM) [Entered: 04/12/2019 04:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Transport Insurance Company filed by Attorney Lloyd A. Gura. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2019. [19-1310] (LAG) [Entered: 04/12/2019 04:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Transport Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2019. [19-1310] (REG) [Entered: 04/12/2019 02:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Transport Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2019. [19-1310] (REG) [Entered: 04/12/2019 02:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Transport Insurance Company filed by Attorney Robert C. Mueller. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2019. [19-1310] (RCM) [Entered: 04/12/2019 02:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Transport Insurance Company filed by Attorney Rodney E. Gould. Certificate of service dated 04/12/2019. [19-1310] (REG) [Entered: 04/12/2019 02:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entry: 57 (sealed memorandum of decision). [19-1310] (GRC) [Entered: 04/05/2019 10:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #58) filed by Appellant Transport Insurance Company. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 04/17/2019. [19-1310] (GRC) [Entered: 04/03/2019 04:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less