This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/03/2021 at 06:07:01 (UTC).

Center for Biological Diversity v. University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Center for Biological Diversity filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2089

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY

SIERRA CLUB

Defendant / Appellee

UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Perrin W. De Jong

Attorney at CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY

P. O. Box 6414

Asheville, NC 28816

Robert Ukeiley

Attorney at CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY

1536 Wynkoop Street

Denver, CO 80202

Bridget M. Lee

Attorney at SIERRA CLUB

9 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

Zachary Max Fabish

Attorney at SIERRA CLUB

50 F Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Peter James McGrath Jr.

Attorney at MOORE & VAN ALLEN, PLLC

100 North Tryon Street

Charlotte, NC 28202-4003

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01179-CCE-JLW. [1001064749] [21-2089] MEB [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:47 PM]

#13

(#13) ORDER filed granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 12 ]. Copies to all parties. [1001064742] [21-2089] MEB [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:43 PM]

#12

(#12) CONSENT/STIPULATION by Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club and University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [12] [21-2089] Perrin De Jong [Entered: 11/23/2021 11:06 AM]

#11

(#11) NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Perrin W. De Jong re: change of address. [21-2089] MEB [Entered: 10/25/2021 02:42 PM]

10 #2

Transcript order acknowledgment

10 #1

Transcript order form

9 #2

Additional Document

9 #1

Docketing statement (civil/agency)

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sierra Club. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001042017] [21-2089] Perrin De Jong [Entered: 10/15/2021 02:18 PM]

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Center for Biological Diversity. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001042014] [21-2089] Perrin De Jong [Entered: 10/15/2021 02:16 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Zachary M. Fabish for Sierra Club. [1001042010] [21-2089]--[Edited 10/15/2021 by MEB to correct party represented] Perrin De Jong [Entered: 10/15/2021 02:14 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Perrin W. de Jong for Center for Biological Diversity and Sierra Club. [1001042009] [21-2089] Perrin De Jong [Entered: 10/15/2021 02:12 PM]

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001039225] [21-2089] Peter McGrath [Entered: 10/12/2021 12:49 PM]

#3

(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Peter J. McGrath Jr. for University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill. [1001039222] [21-2089] Peter McGrath [Entered: 10/12/2021 12:47 PM]

#2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01179-CCE-JLW. [1001064749] [21-2089] MEB [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER filed granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 12 ]. Copies to all parties. [1001064742] [21-2089] MEB [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT/STIPULATION by Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club and University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [12] [21-2089] Perrin De Jong [Entered: 11/23/2021 11:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Perrin W. De Jong re: change of address. [21-2089] MEB [Entered: 10/25/2021 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Jane Calhoun. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: Motion Hearing for summary judgment held on 6/30/2021. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Center for Biological Diversity and Sierra Club. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01179-CCE-JLW. Transcript due from Jane Calhoun, Official Court Reporter, on 12/27/2021. [21-2089] MEB [Entered: 10/18/2021 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Center for Biological Diversity and Sierra Club. [21-2089] Perrin De Jong [Entered: 10/15/2021 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sierra Club. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001042017] [21-2089] Perrin De Jong [Entered: 10/15/2021 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Center for Biological Diversity. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001042014] [21-2089] Perrin De Jong [Entered: 10/15/2021 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Zachary M. Fabish for Sierra Club. [1001042010] [21-2089]--[Edited 10/15/2021 by MEB to correct party represented] Perrin De Jong [Entered: 10/15/2021 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Perrin W. de Jong for Center for Biological Diversity and Sierra Club. [1001042009] [21-2089] Perrin De Jong [Entered: 10/15/2021 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1001039225] [21-2089] Peter McGrath [Entered: 10/12/2021 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Peter J. McGrath Jr. for University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill. [1001039222] [21-2089] Peter McGrath [Entered: 10/12/2021 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01179-CCE-JLW. Mailed to: Bridget M. Lee, SIERRA CLUB, Suite D, 9 Pine Street, New York, NY 10005; Peter James McGrath, Jr., MOORE & VAN ALLEN, PLLC, Suite 4700, 100 North Tryon Street, Charlotte, NC 28202-4003; Robert Ukeiley; CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, Suite 421, 1536 Wynkoop Street, Denver, CO 80202. [21-2089] MEB [Entered: 10/04/2021 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-01179-CCE-JLW. Case manager: MBeall. [21-2089] MEB [Entered: 10/04/2021 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL is a litigant

Latest cases where Sierra Club is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY is a litigant