This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/28/2020 at 06:06:18 (UTC).

Cedric Mack v. CarHop Finance

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 Cedric Mack filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CarHop Finance. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3279

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Cedric D. Mack

Defendant / Appellee

CarHop Finance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Cedric D. Mack

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Ashley Nichole Harrison

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee CarHop Finance. - FOR CAL [4972771] [20-3279] (ANH) [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:04 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Ashley Harrison for Appellee CarHop Finance w/service 11/03/2020 [4972245] [20-3279] (ANH) [Entered: 11/03/2020 10:16 AM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4971022] [20-3279] (CMH) [Entered: 10/29/2020 03:18 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dadted 10/21/2020, and Judgment dated 10/22/2020. [4971019] [20-3279] (CMH) [Entered: 10/29/2020 03:17 PM]

Open Document #2

ProSe NDA

Open Document #1

ProSe Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

11/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee CarHop Finance. - FOR CAL [4972771] [20-3279] (ANH) [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:04 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Ashley Harrison for Appellee CarHop Finance w/service 11/03/2020 [4972245] [20-3279] (ANH) [Entered: 11/03/2020 10:16 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4971022] [20-3279] (CMH) [Entered: 10/29/2020 03:18 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2020
View Court Documents

DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dadted 10/21/2020, and Judgment dated 10/22/2020. [4971019] [20-3279] (CMH) [Entered: 10/29/2020 03:17 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCivil case docketed. [4971010] [20-3279] (CMH) [Entered: 10/29/2020 03:08 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less