This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:04:11 (UTC).

Cecilia Perry v. Jermanda Adams

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Cecilia Perry filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Jermanda Adams. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2478

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

Demetrius Staples

City of St. Louis

City of Jennings Detention Center

St. Louis City Justice Center

Kent Menning

City of Jennings

Defendant / Appellant

Jermanda Adams

Plaintiff / Appellee

Cecilia Perry, Plaintiff Ad Litem for Christina Brooks, Next of Friend for D.B, D.B, D.B and D.B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Andrew Wheaton

Attorney at CITY COUNSELOR'S OFFICE

314 City Hall, 1200 Market Street

Saint Louis, MO 63103-0000

Andrew D. Wheaton

Attorney at CITY COUNSELOR'S OFFICE

314 City Hall, 1200 Market Street

Saint Louis, MO 63103-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jerryl T. Christmas

Attorney at CHRISTMAS & ASSOCIATES

6101 Delmar Boulevard

Saint Louis, MO 63112

Todd R. Nissenholtz

Attorney at COFMAN & TOWNSLEY

Suite 1070, 200 S. Hanley Road

Clayton, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4808717] [19-2478] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:16 PM]

Open Document #1

Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Appellant Jermanda Adams's Interlocutory Appeal for

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 7/11/19, docket entries, Memo & Order 7/01/19, Order 7/01/19, ORder 7/11/19. [4808724] [19-2478] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:31 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4826902-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Andrew D. Wheaton. Brief of Jermanda Adams due 10/09/2019 [4827089] [19-2478] (CRJ) [Entered: 09/05/2019 11:04 AM]

Open Document

RESPONSE in opposition to motion to dismiss case [ # 4813839-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew D. Wheaton for Appellant Ms. Jermanda Adams , w/service 08/12/2019. [4818334] [19-2478] (ADW) [Entered: 08/12/2019 09:30 PM]

Open Document #1

Letter From Clerk's Office

Open Document #2

Exhibit 1 - District Court Opinion

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Ms. Jermanda Adams - w/service 07/30/2019. [4813789] [19-2478] (ADW) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:12 PM]

Open Document #2

Case Caption

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/09/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew D. Wheaton for Appellant Ms. Jermanda Adams w/service 09/04/2019. [4826902] [19-2478] (ADW) [Entered: 09/04/2019 06:09 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Ms. Jermanda Adams. No Transcript[4813785] [19-2478] (ADW) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:11 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Andrew Wheaton for Appellant Ms. Jermanda Adams w/service 07/18/2019 [4809489] [19-2478] (ADW) [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:22 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Ms. Jermanda Adams - Separate Appendix - w/service 07/30/2019 [4813783] [19-2478] (ADW) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:09 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Todd R. Nissenholtz for Appellee Ms. Cecilia Perry w/service 07/17/2019 [4809163] [19-2478] (TRN) [Entered: 07/17/2019 06:03 PM]

Open Document

CLERK LETTER sent to hold briefing schedule in abeyance - pending motion to dismiss. [4813939] [19-2478] (JMM) [Entered: 07/31/2019 09:26 AM]

Open Document

JUDGE ORDER: [ # 4813839-2 ] Denying motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction and allowing the appeal to proceed to briefing on the merits. Appellant's brief and appendix is now due September 9, 2019. Adp Aug 2019 [4820602] [19-2478]--[Edited 08/19/2019 by JMM to add the appellant's brief and appendix deadline] (JMM) [Entered: 08/19/2019 02:06 PM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4826902-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Andrew D. Wheaton. Brief of Jermanda Adams due 10/09/2019 [4827089] [19-2478] (CRJ) [Entered: 09/05/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/09/2019, filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew D. Wheaton for Appellant Ms. Jermanda Adams w/service 09/04/2019. [4826902] [19-2478] (ADW) [Entered: 09/04/2019 06:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGE ORDER: [ # 4813839-2 ] Denying motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction and allowing the appeal to proceed to briefing on the merits. Appellant's brief and appendix is now due September 9, 2019. Adp Aug 2019 [4820602] [19-2478]--[Edited 08/19/2019 by JMM to add the appellant's brief and appendix deadline] (JMM) [Entered: 08/19/2019 02:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE in opposition to motion to dismiss case [ # 4813839-2 ] filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew D. Wheaton for Appellant Ms. Jermanda Adams , w/service 08/12/2019. [4818334] [19-2478] (ADW) [Entered: 08/12/2019 09:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK LETTER sent to hold briefing schedule in abeyance - pending motion to dismiss. [4813939] [19-2478] (JMM) [Entered: 07/31/2019 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to dismiss case, filed by Attorney Mr. Todd R. Nissenholtz for Appellee Ms. Cecilia Perry w/service 07/30/2019. [4813839] [19-2478] (TRN) [Entered: 07/30/2019 07:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Ms. Jermanda Adams - w/service 07/30/2019. [4813789] [19-2478] (ADW) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Ms. Jermanda Adams. No Transcript[4813785] [19-2478] (ADW) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Ms. Jermanda Adams - Separate Appendix - w/service 07/30/2019 [4813783] [19-2478] (ADW) [Entered: 07/30/2019 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK LETTER sent regarding new caption in case. [4813261] [19-2478] (TMF) [Entered: 07/29/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Andrew Wheaton for Appellant Ms. Jermanda Adams w/service 07/18/2019 [4809489] [19-2478] (ADW) [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE filed by Todd R. Nissenholtz for Appellee Ms. Cecilia Perry w/service 07/17/2019 [4809163] [19-2478] (TRN) [Entered: 07/17/2019 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 08/26/2019. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Jermanda Adams due 08/26/2019. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4808725] [19-2478] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal 7/11/19, docket entries, Memo & Order 7/01/19, Order 7/01/19, ORder 7/11/19. [4808724] [19-2478] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case docketed. [4808717] [19-2478] (TMF) [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.