This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/30/2020 at 07:18:18 (UTC).

Cecilia Guardiola v. USA, et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 Cecilia Guardiola filed an Other lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15831

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Defendants

RENOWN HEALTH

RENOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER

Intervenor

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff / Appellee

CECILIA GUARDIOLA, ex. rel. United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Attorneys

Charles W. Scarborough Esquire

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Michael Raab

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Daniel L. Winik

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Nathan Kanute

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer, L.L.P.

50 West Liberty Street

Reno, NV 89501

William Eugene Peterson

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer, L.L.P.

50 West Liberty Street

Reno, NV 89501

Mitch Kreindler

Attorney at Kreindler & Associates

7676 Hillmont Street, Suite 240A

Houston, TX 77040-6478

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#4

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 07/23/2020. See order for details. [11729150] (VS) [Entered: 06/22/2020 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 06/22/2020, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 06/18/2020 ). [11717569] (VS) [Entered: 06/10/2020 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 06/18/2020, 1:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11695059] (VS) [Entered: 05/19/2020 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docket(#8) Added Attorney(s) Charles W. Scarborough, Michael Raab for party(s) Appellant USA, in case 20-15831. [11685198] (RR) [Entered: 05/08/2020 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael S. Raab (U.S. Department of Justice, Appellate Staff, Civil Division, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Room 7237, Washington, D.C. 20530) for Appellant USA. Date of service: 05/08/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11684441] [20-15831] (Raab, Michael) [Entered: 05/08/2020 07:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Charles Wylie Scarborough (U.S. Department of Justice; Civil Division, Appellate Staff; 950 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W., Room 7244; Washington D.C. 20530) for Appellant USA. Date of service: 05/08/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11684433] [20-15831] (Scarborough, Charles) [Entered: 05/08/2020 07:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/08/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11684427]. [20-15831] (AD) [Entered: 05/08/2020 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant USA Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/08/2020. [11684418] [20-15831] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 05/08/2020 05:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docket(#3) Attorney Roger Wenthe in 20-15831 substituted by Attorney Daniel L. Winik in 20-15831 [11680239] (RR) [Entered: 05/04/2020 05:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel Lee Winik (U.S. Department of Justice, Civil Division, Appellate Staff, 950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW, Room 7245, Washington, D.C. 20530) for Appellant USA. Substitution for Attorney Roger Wenthe, Esquire for Appellant USA. Date of service: 05/01/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11678580] [20-15831] (Winik, Daniel) [Entered: 05/01/2020 06:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant United States of America Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/08/2020. Transcript ordered by 06/01/2020. Transcript due 06/30/2020. Appellant United States of America opening brief due 08/10/2020. Appellee Cecilia Guardiola answering brief due 09/10/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11678110] (RT) [Entered: 05/01/2020 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RENOWN HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases where RENOWN SOUTH MEADOWS MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan Guy Kanute