This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/22/2020 at 06:00:30 (UTC).

Cebollero-Bertran v. PR Aqueduct & Sewer Authority

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Cebollero-Bertran filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against PR Aqueduct Sewer Authority. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1096

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

NATALIA CEBOLLERO-BERTRAN

Defendant / Appellee

PUERTO RICO AQUEDUCT AND SEWER AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Edelmiro Antonio Salas Gonzalez

Attorney at Law Office of Edelmiro A. Salas Gonzalez

1072 Calle 17, Urb. Villa Nevarez

San Juan, PR 00927

Jose Luis Ramirez de Leon

Attorney at Bufete Ramirez de Leon

Po Box 190251

San Juan, PR 00919-0251

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jorge Marrero-Narvaez

Attorney at Puerto Rico Aqueduct & Sewer Authority

604 Barbosa Avenue, P.O. Box 7066

San Juan, PR 00916-0000

Carlos Ramirez-Isern

Attorney at Bennazar, Garcia & Milian, CSP

416 Ponce De Leon, Union Plaza 1701

San Juan, PR 00918

Antonio Juan Bennazar-Zequeira

Attorney at Bennazar Garcia & Milian

Po Box 194000, #212

San Juan, PR 00919-4000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 03/11/2020, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Jorge Marrero-Narvaez for Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority. [20-1096] (RMK) [Entered: 02/26/2020 12:39 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Natalia Cebollero-Bertran. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2020. [20-1096] (EAS) [Entered: 02/01/2020 12:59 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Natalia Cebollero-Bertran filed by Attorney Edelmiro Salas-Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2020. [20-1096] (EAS) [Entered: 02/01/2020 12:33 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Natalia Cebollero-Bertan filed by Attorney Jose L. Ramirez de Leon. Certificate of service dated 01/23/2020. [20-1096] (JLR) [Entered: 01/23/2020 12:50 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 03/11/2020, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Jorge Marrero-Narvaez for Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority. [20-1096] (RMK) [Entered: 02/26/2020 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Natalia Cebollero-Bertran. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2020. [20-1096] (EAS) [Entered: 02/01/2020 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Natalia Cebollero-Bertran filed by Attorney Edelmiro Salas-Gonzalez. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2020. [20-1096] (EAS) [Entered: 02/01/2020 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Natalia Cebollero-Bertan filed by Attorney Jose L. Ramirez de Leon. Certificate of service dated 01/23/2020. [20-1096] (JLR) [Entered: 01/23/2020 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #16) filed by Appellant Natalia Cebollero-Bertan. Appearance form due 02/05/2020. Docketing Statement due 02/05/2020. [20-1096] (GRC) [Entered: 01/22/2020 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Puerto Rico Aqueduct and Sewer Authority is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Antonio Juan Bennazar-Zequeira