This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/30/2021 at 06:17:48 (UTC).

Cboe Futures Exchange, LLC v. SEC

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 Cboe Futures Exchange, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SEC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1038

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cboe Futures Exchange, LLC

Respondent

Securities and Exchange Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Paul Greenwalt III

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael K. Molzberger

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

Respondent Attorneys

Dominick V. Freda

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549

Rachel M. McKenzie

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1882230] filed by Rachel M. McKenzie and co-counsel Dominick V. Freda on behalf of Respondent SEC. [21-1038] (McKenzie, Rachel) [Entered: 01/27/2021 04:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1882084] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 02/26/2021. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 02/26/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 02/26/2021. PETITIONER underlying decision due 02/26/2021. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 02/26/2021. PETITIONER procedural motions due 02/26/2021. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 03/15/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 02/26/2021. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 02/26/2021. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 03/15/2021. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 03/15/2021 [21-1038] [Entered: 01/27/2021 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1882083] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1882066-2 ] [21-1038] [Entered: 01/27/2021 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1882066] of a decision by federal agency filed by Cboe Futures Exchange, LLC [Service Date: 01/22/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1038] [Entered: 01/27/2021 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1038] [Entered: 01/27/2021 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CBOE Futures Exchange, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael K Molzberger