This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/13/2021 at 05:57:31 (UTC).

Cboe BYX Exchange, Inc., et al v. SEC

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 Cboe BYX Exchange, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against SEC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1051

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Cboe BYX Exchange, Inc.

Cboe EDGA Exchange, Inc.

Cboe EDGX Exchange, Inc.

Cboe Exchange, Inc.

Cboe BZX Exchange, Inc.

Respondent

Securities and Exchange Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Paul Greenwalt III

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael K. Molzberger

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

Respondent Attorneys

Dominick V. Freda

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549

Daniel Staroselsky

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549

Martin Totaro

Attorney at Securities and Exchange Commission

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1884554] filed by Martin Totaro and co-counsel Dominick Freda; Daniel Staroselsky on behalf of Respondent SEC in 21-1050, 21-1051, 21-1053. [21-1050, 21-1051, 21-1053] (Totaro, Martin) [Entered: 02/10/2021 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1884487] filed consolidating cases 21-1051, 21-1053 (Consolidation started 02/09/2021) with 21-1050; directing party to file in 21-1050 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/11/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/11/2021 [21-1050, 21-1051, 21-1053] [Entered: 02/09/2021 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1884429] filed consolidating cases 21-1053 (Consolidation started 02/09/2021) with 21-1051; directing party to file in 21-1053 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/11/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/11/2021 [21-1051, 21-1053] [Entered: 02/09/2021 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1884360] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 03/11/2021. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 03/11/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 03/11/2021. PETITIONER underlying decision due 03/11/2021. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 03/11/2021. PETITIONER procedural motions due 03/11/2021. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 03/26/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 03/11/2021. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 03/11/2021. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 03/26/2021. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 03/26/2021 [21-1051] [Entered: 02/09/2021 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1884354] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1884352-2 ] [21-1051] [Entered: 02/09/2021 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1884352] of a decision by federal agency filed by Cboe BYX Exchange, Inc., Cboe BZX Exchange, Inc., Cboe EDGA Exchange, Inc., Cboe EDGX Exchange, Inc. and Cboe Exchange, Inc. [Service Date: 02/05/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1051] [Entered: 02/09/2021 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1051] [Entered: 02/09/2021 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dominick V. Freda

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Staroselsky

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin Totaro