This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/20/2020 at 07:43:43 (UTC).

Cboe BYX Exchange, Inc., et al v. SEC

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Cboe BYX Exchange, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against SEC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1243

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Cboe BYX Exchange, Inc.

Cboe EDGA Exchange, Inc.

Cboe EDGX Exchange, Inc.

Cboe Exchange, Inc.

Cboe BZX Exchange, Inc.

Respondent

Securities and Exchange Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Paul Greenwalt III

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael K. Molzberger

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CERTIFIED COPY [1851413] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1851411-2 ] [20-1243] [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:29 PM]

Open Document

PETITION FOR REVIEW [1851411] of a decision by federal agency filed by Cboe BYX Exchange, Inc., Cboe BZX Exchange, Inc., Cboe EDGA Exchange, Inc., Cboe EDGX Exchange, Inc. and Cboe Exchange, Inc. [Service Date: 07/10/2020 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [20-1243] [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:27 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1851527] filed by Martin Totaro and co-counsel Tracey Hardin on behalf of Respondent SEC in 20-1242, 20-1243, 20-1244. [20-1242, 20-1243, 20-1244] (Totaro, Martin) [Entered: 07/14/2020 11:00 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1851421] filed consolidating cases 20-1243, 20-1244 (Consolidation started 07/13/2020) with 20-1242; directing party to file in 20-1242, 20-1243 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 08/12/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 08/12/2020 [20-1242, 20-1243, 20-1244] [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:49 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1851527] filed by Martin Totaro and co-counsel Tracey Hardin on behalf of Respondent SEC in 20-1242, 20-1243, 20-1244. [20-1242, 20-1243, 20-1244] (Totaro, Martin) [Entered: 07/14/2020 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1851421] filed consolidating cases 20-1243, 20-1244 (Consolidation started 07/13/2020) with 20-1242; directing party to file in 20-1242, 20-1243 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 08/12/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 08/12/2020 [20-1242, 20-1243, 20-1244] [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1851413] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1851411-2 ] [20-1243] [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1851411] of a decision by federal agency filed by Cboe BYX Exchange, Inc., Cboe BZX Exchange, Inc., Cboe EDGA Exchange, Inc., Cboe EDGX Exchange, Inc. and Cboe Exchange, Inc. [Service Date: 07/10/2020 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [20-1243] [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [20-1243] [Entered: 07/13/2020 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation is a litigant