This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/14/2021 at 05:42:52 (UTC).

Cboe BYX Exchange, Inc., et al v. SEC

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 Cboe BYX Exchange, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against SEC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1168

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Cboe BYX Exchange, Inc.

Cboe BZX Exchange, Inc.

Cboe EDGA Exchange, Inc.

Cboe EDGX Exchange, Inc.

Cboe Exchange, Inc.

Respondent

Securities and Exchange Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Paul Greenwalt III

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael K. Molzberger

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CERTIFIED COPY [1909908] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1909906-2 ] [21-1168] [Entered: 08/11/2021 02:20 PM]

Open Document

PETITION FOR REVIEW [1909906] of a decision by federal agency filed by Cboe BYX Exchange, Inc., Cboe BZX Exchange, Inc., Cboe EDGA Exchange, Inc., Cboe EDGX Exchange, Inc. and Cboe Exchange, Inc. [Service Date: 08/09/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1168] [Entered: 08/11/2021 02:19 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1909984] filed by Tracey Hardin and co-counsel Martin Totaro on behalf of Respondent SEC in 21-1167, 21-1168, 21-1169. [21-1167, 21-1168, 21-1169] (Totaro, Martin) [Entered: 08/12/2021 10:38 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1909922] filed consolidating cases 21-1168, 21-1169 (Consolidation started 08/11/2021) with 21-1167; directing party to file in 21-1168, 21-1169 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 09/10/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 09/10/2021 [21-1167, 21-1168, 21-1169] [Entered: 08/11/2021 03:22 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1909984] filed by Tracey Hardin and co-counsel Martin Totaro on behalf of Respondent SEC in 21-1167, 21-1168, 21-1169. [21-1167, 21-1168, 21-1169] (Totaro, Martin) [Entered: 08/12/2021 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1909922] filed consolidating cases 21-1168, 21-1169 (Consolidation started 08/11/2021) with 21-1167; directing party to file in 21-1168, 21-1169 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 09/10/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 09/10/2021 [21-1167, 21-1168, 21-1169] [Entered: 08/11/2021 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1909908] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1909906-2 ] [21-1168] [Entered: 08/11/2021 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1909906] of a decision by federal agency filed by Cboe BYX Exchange, Inc., Cboe BZX Exchange, Inc., Cboe EDGA Exchange, Inc., Cboe EDGX Exchange, Inc. and Cboe Exchange, Inc. [Service Date: 08/09/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1168] [Entered: 08/11/2021 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1168] [Entered: 08/11/2021 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chicago Board Options Exchange Volatility Index Manipulation Antitrust Litigation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael K Molzberger