This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2020 at 06:08:48 (UTC).

Catherine Wang Anderson v. State of Nebraska, et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Catherine Wang Anderson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of Nebraska. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2751

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

Amanda Gurock

Sarita Ruma

Amy Schuchman

Janine F. Ucchino

Douglas Weinberg

Alegent Creighton Clinic

John Does, 1-15

Martin Harrington, M.D.

Nebraska Families Collaborative

Nicole Paul

Sonia Derr

Chad A. Miller

Laureate Psychiatric Clinic and Hospital, Inc.

Papillion LaVista Community Schools

Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services

Project Harmony

Melissa Nance

Anne Petzel

Christian Heritage Children's Home

Plaintiff / Appellant

Catherine Yang Wang Anderson

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Dan H. Ketcham

Attorney at ENGLES & KETCHAM

1350 Woodmen Tower, 1700 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-0000

Alberto Hernandez Jr.

Attorney at ENGLES & KETCHAM

1350 Woodmen Tower, 1700 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-0000

Sarah M. Dempsey

Attorney at LAMSON & DUGAN

10306 Regency Parkway Drive

Omaha, NE 68114-3743

Patrick G. Vipond I

Attorney at LAMSON & DUGAN

10306 Regency Parkway Drive

Omaha, NE 68114-3743

Barry S. Grossman

Attorney at GROSSMAN LAW OFFICE

Suite 600, 1905 Harney Street

Omaha, NE 68102

Timothy K. Dolan

Attorney at DOUGLAS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Room 909, Civic Center, 1819 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68183-0000

Jennifer Chrystal-Clark

Attorney at DOUGLAS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Room 909, Civic Center, 1819 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68183-0000

Megan S. Wright

Attorney at CLINE & WILLIAMS

Suite 200 Sterling Ridge, 12910 Pierce Street

Omaha, NE 68144-1105

Carly L. Bahramzad

Attorney at KNUDSEN & BERKHEIMER

Suite 200, 3800 Vermaas Place

Lincoln, NE 68502

Jeanelle R. Lust

Attorney at KNUDSEN & BERKHEIMER

Suite 200, 3800 Vermaas Place

Lincoln, NE 68502

Danielle Rowley

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

2115 State Capitol, P.O. Box 98920

Lincoln, NE 68509-0000

Thomas J. Culhane

Attorney at ERICKSON & SEDERSTROM

100 One Regency Westpoint, 10330 Regency Parkway Drive

Omaha, NE 68114-0000

Matthew B. Reilly

Attorney at ERICKSON & SEDERSTROM

100 One Regency Westpoint, 10330 Regency Parkway Drive

Omaha, NE 68114-0000

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joshua D. Barber

Attorney at BARBER & BARBER.

Suite 205, 300 N. 44Th Street, P.O. Box 4555

Lincoln, NE 68504-0555

Other Attorneys

Duncan Alexander Young Sr.

Attorney at YOUNG & WHITE

8742 Frederick Street, P.O. Box 241358

Omaha, NE 68124-5358

Cathy Trent-Vilim

Attorney at LAMSON & DUGAN

10306 Regency Parkway Drive

Omaha, NE 68114-3743

Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios

Attorney at WOLFE & SNOWDEN

Suite 800, Wells Fargo Building, 1248 O Street

Lincoln, NE 68508-1424

John A. McWilliams

Attorney at CASSEM & TIERNEY

Suite 302, 9290 W. Dodge Road

Omaha, NE 68114-0000

Brien McLeod Welch

Attorney at CASSEM & TIERNEY

Suite 302, 9290 W. Dodge Road

Omaha, NE 68114-0000

Mark E. Novotny

Attorney at LAMSON & DUGAN

10306 Regency Parkway Drive

Omaha, NE 68114-3743

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellees Daniel Little, Melissa Nance, Nebraska Families Collaborative, David Newell, Nicole Paul, Anne Petzel, Anna Richardson, Jennifer Richey, Deanna "Nina" Sheller, Sara Smith and Evan Winans. w/service 10/01/2020 [4961639] [20-2751] (DHK) [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:16 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER: Granting in Part [ # 4960892-3 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Joshua D. Barber. Brief of Catherine Yang Wang Anderson due 10/30/2020. Appendix due on 10/30/2020. [4961048] [20-2751] (HAG) [Entered: 09/30/2020 10:41 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/30/2020, filed by Attorney Mr. Joshua D. Barber for Appellant Mr. Catherine Yang Wang Anderson w/service 09/29/2020. [4960892] [20-2751]--[Edited to revise dkt txt 09/30/2020 by HAG] (JDB) [Entered: 09/29/2020 06:55 PM]

Open Document

DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Mr. Catherine Yang Wang Anderson. w/service 09/19/2020 [4957512] [20-2751] (JDB) [Entered: 09/19/2020 01:58 PM]

Open Document #2

Case Caption

Open Document #1

Letter From Clerk's Office

Open Document #2

Case Caption

Open Document #1

Letter From Clerk's Office

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Ryan S. Post for Appellees Carla Heathershaw-Risko, Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services, State of Nebraska and Jennifer White w/service 09/16/2020 [4956585] [20-2751] (RP) [Entered: 09/16/2020 10:31 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Matthew B. Reilly for Appellees Christian Heritage Children's Home and Project Harmony w/service 08/24/2020 [4948505] [20-2751] (MBR) [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:34 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Timothy K. Dolan for Appellees County of Douglas, Mark Gentile, Chad A. Miller and Ms. Brenda Wheeler w/service 08/24/2020 [4948366] [20-2751] (TKD) [Entered: 08/24/2020 11:55 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Megan S. Wright for Appellees Laureate Psychiatric Clinic and Hospital, Inc. and Nancy E. Parke w/service 08/24/2020 [4948237] [20-2751] (MSW) [Entered: 08/24/2020 10:32 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Cathy S. Trent-Vilim for Appellee KVC Behavioral Healthcare Nebraska w/service 08/24/2020 [4948168] [20-2751] (CT) [Entered: 08/24/2020 09:22 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios for Appellees Tyler Hansen and Jennice Reid-Hansen w/service 08/24/2020 [4948137] [20-2751] (MJW) [Entered: 08/24/2020 09:02 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Joshua D. Barber for Appellant Mr. Catherine Yang Wang Anderson w/service 08/21/2020 [4948054] [20-2751] (JDB) [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:29 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 09/30/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Catherine Yang Wang Anderson due 09/30/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4948018] [20-2751] (AEV) [Entered: 08/21/2020 04:12 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order and Findings and Recommendation 6/15/20, Memorandum and Order 7/21/20, Judgment 7/21/20, docket entries, [4948014] [20-2751] (AEV) [Entered: 08/21/2020 04:10 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4947997] [20-2751] (AEV) [Entered: 08/21/2020 04:01 PM]

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of record filed by Appellees Daniel Little, Melissa Nance, Nebraska Families Collaborative, David Newell, Nicole Paul, Anne Petzel, Anna Richardson, Jennifer Richey, Deanna "Nina" Sheller, Sara Smith and Evan Winans. w/service 10/01/2020 [4961639] [20-2751] (DHK) [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER: Granting in Part [ # 4960892-3 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Joshua D. Barber. Brief of Catherine Yang Wang Anderson due 10/30/2020. Appendix due on 10/30/2020. [4961048] [20-2751] (HAG) [Entered: 09/30/2020 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/30/2020, filed by Attorney Mr. Joshua D. Barber for Appellant Mr. Catherine Yang Wang Anderson w/service 09/29/2020. [4960892] [20-2751]--[Edited to revise dkt txt 09/30/2020 by HAG] (JDB) [Entered: 09/29/2020 06:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Mr. Catherine Yang Wang Anderson. w/service 09/19/2020 [4957512] [20-2751] (JDB) [Entered: 09/19/2020 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK LETTER sent regarding new caption in case. Sonia Derr should be included as an appellee to this matter. [4957450] [20-2751] (AEV) [Entered: 09/18/2020 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK LETTER sent regarding new caption in case. Upon further review, it was determined the following parties should not have been included as appellees at case opening: Sonia Derr, Courtney Phillips, Douglas Weinberg, Camas Steutter, Judy McAuliffe-Treinen, Amanda Gurock, Komi Amededji, Reliable Rock Counseling and Consulting, P.c., Martin Harrington, MD, Kara Beals, Children's Hospital and Medical Center, Sarita Ruma, Michael Vance. [4957381] [20-2751] (AEV) [Entered: 09/18/2020 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Ryan S. Post for Appellees Carla Heathershaw-Risko, Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services, State of Nebraska and Jennifer White w/service 09/16/2020 [4956585] [20-2751] (RP) [Entered: 09/16/2020 10:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Catherine Yang Wang Anderson - Separate Appendix - w/service 09/04/2020 [4952573] [20-2751] (JDB) [Entered: 09/04/2020 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Catherine Yang Wang Anderson. No Transcript[4952545] [20-2751] (JDB) [Entered: 09/03/2020 06:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Catherine Yang Wang Anderson - w/service 09/03/2020. [4952544] [20-2751] (JDB) [Entered: 09/03/2020 06:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Matthew B. Reilly for Appellees Christian Heritage Children's Home and Project Harmony w/service 08/24/2020 [4948505] [20-2751] (MBR) [Entered: 08/24/2020 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Timothy K. Dolan for Appellees County of Douglas, Mark Gentile, Chad A. Miller and Ms. Brenda Wheeler w/service 08/24/2020 [4948366] [20-2751] (TKD) [Entered: 08/24/2020 11:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Megan S. Wright for Appellees Laureate Psychiatric Clinic and Hospital, Inc. and Nancy E. Parke w/service 08/24/2020 [4948237] [20-2751] (MSW) [Entered: 08/24/2020 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Timothy K. Dolan for Appellees Ms. Brenda Wheeler, Chad A. Miller, Mark Gentile, County of Douglas and Not Party Amy Schuchman w/service 08/24/2020 **LOCKED - Counsel to refile w/o A. Schuchman listed** [4948194] [20-2751]--[Edited to indicate locked 08/24/2020 by HAG] (TKD) [Entered: 08/24/2020 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Cathy S. Trent-Vilim for Appellee KVC Behavioral Healthcare Nebraska w/service 08/24/2020 [4948168] [20-2751] (CT) [Entered: 08/24/2020 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios for Appellees Tyler Hansen and Jennice Reid-Hansen w/service 08/24/2020 [4948137] [20-2751] (MJW) [Entered: 08/24/2020 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Joshua D. Barber for Appellant Mr. Catherine Yang Wang Anderson w/service 08/21/2020 [4948054] [20-2751] (JDB) [Entered: 08/21/2020 05:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 09/30/2020. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Catherine Yang Wang Anderson due 09/30/2020. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4948018] [20-2751] (AEV) [Entered: 08/21/2020 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, Order and Findings and Recommendation 6/15/20, Memorandum and Order 7/21/20, Judgment 7/21/20, docket entries, [4948014] [20-2751] (AEV) [Entered: 08/21/2020 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4947997] [20-2751] (AEV) [Entered: 08/21/2020 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melanie J. Whittamore-Mantzios

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Duncan A. Young

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John A. McWilliams