This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:02:23 (UTC).

Castagna, et al v. Jean, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Castagna filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Jean. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1677

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

GAVIN MCHALE

STEPHEN SMIGLIANI

TERRY COTTON

WILLIAM SAMARAS

KAMAU PRITCHARD

JON-MICHAEL HARBER

CLIFTON HAYNES

DONALD WIGHTMAN

RICHARD DEVOE

ANTHONY TROY

GARY W. BARKER

JEAN MOISE ACLOQUE

BRENDAN WALSH

JAY TULLY

MICHAEL BIZZOZERO

Defendant / Appellants

HARRY JEAN

DARAN EDWARDS

KEITH KAPLAN

Plaintiff / Appellees

CHRISTOPHER CASTAGNA

GAVIN CASTAGNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Katherine Nowland Galle

Attorney at City of Boston Law Department

1 City Hall Square, Rm 615

Boston, MA 02201-0000

Nicole Marie O'Connor

Attorney at City of Boston Law Department

1 City Hall Square, Rm 615

Boston, MA 02201-0000

Matthew Michael McGarry

Attorney at City of Boston Law Department

1 City Hall Square, Rm 615

Boston, MA 02201-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Paul Joseph Klehm

Attorney at Krasnoo Klehm & Falkner LLP

28 Andover St, Ste 240

Andover, MA 01810-0000

Benjamin L. Falkner

Attorney at Krasnoo Klehm & Falkner LLP

28 Andover St, Ste 240

Andover, MA 01810-0000

James B. Krasnoo

Attorney at Krasnoo Klehm & Falkner LLP

28 Andover St, Ste 240

Andover, MA 01810-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Harry Jean, Keith Kaplan and Daran Edwards. Brief and appendix due 10/09/2019 for appellant Daran Edwards, Harry Jean and Keith Kaplan. [19-1677] (GRC) [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:32 PM]

Open Document

ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Daran Edwards, Harry Jean and Keith Kaplan. Certificate of service dated 08/28/2019. [19-1677] (MMM) [Entered: 08/28/2019 11:15 AM]

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Daran Edwards, Keith Kaplan and Harry Jean indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2019. [19-1677] (NMO) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:04 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Christopher Castagna and Gavin Castagna filed by Attorney Benjamin L. Falkner. Certificate of service dated 07/18/2019. [19-1677] (BLF) [Entered: 07/18/2019 11:50 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Christopher Castagna and Gavin Castagna filed by Attorney James B. Krasnoo. Certificate of service dated 07/18/2019. [19-1677] (JBK) [Entered: 07/18/2019 11:47 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Christopher Castagna and Gavin Castagna filed by Attorney Paul J. Klehm. Certificate of service dated 07/18/2019. [19-1677] (PJK) [Entered: 07/18/2019 11:45 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Daran Edwards, Keith Kaplan and Harry Jean filed by Attorney Matthew M. McGarry. Certificate of service dated 07/18/2019. [19-1677] (MMM) [Entered: 07/18/2019 09:29 AM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Daran Edwards, Harry Jean and Keith Kaplan. Certificate of service dated 07/18/2019. [19-1677] (NMO) [Entered: 07/18/2019 08:49 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Daran Edwards, Harry Jean and Keith Kaplan indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 07/18/2019. [19-1677] (NMO) [Entered: 07/18/2019 08:37 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Daran Edwards, Keith Kaplan and Harry Jean filed by Attorney Nicole M. O'Connor. Certificate of service dated 07/17/2019. [19-1677] (NMO) [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:00 AM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Harry Jean, Keith Kaplan and Daran Edwards. Brief and appendix due 10/09/2019 for appellant Daran Edwards, Harry Jean and Keith Kaplan. [19-1677] (GRC) [Entered: 08/29/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Daran Edwards, Harry Jean and Keith Kaplan. Certificate of service dated 08/28/2019. [19-1677] (MMM) [Entered: 08/28/2019 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and appendix due 09/09/2019 for appellant Daran Edwards, Harry Jean and Keith Kaplan. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1677] (GRC) [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Daran Edwards, Keith Kaplan and Harry Jean indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2019. [19-1677] (NMO) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Christopher Castagna and Gavin Castagna filed by Attorney Benjamin L. Falkner. Certificate of service dated 07/18/2019. [19-1677] (BLF) [Entered: 07/18/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Christopher Castagna and Gavin Castagna filed by Attorney James B. Krasnoo. Certificate of service dated 07/18/2019. [19-1677] (JBK) [Entered: 07/18/2019 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Christopher Castagna and Gavin Castagna filed by Attorney Paul J. Klehm. Certificate of service dated 07/18/2019. [19-1677] (PJK) [Entered: 07/18/2019 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Daran Edwards, Keith Kaplan and Harry Jean filed by Attorney Matthew M. McGarry. Certificate of service dated 07/18/2019. [19-1677] (MMM) [Entered: 07/18/2019 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Daran Edwards, Harry Jean and Keith Kaplan. Certificate of service dated 07/18/2019. [19-1677] (NMO) [Entered: 07/18/2019 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Daran Edwards, Harry Jean and Keith Kaplan indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 07/18/2019. [19-1677] (NMO) [Entered: 07/18/2019 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Daran Edwards, Keith Kaplan and Harry Jean filed by Attorney Nicole M. O'Connor. Certificate of service dated 07/17/2019. [19-1677] (NMO) [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #327) filed by Appellants Daran Edwards, Harry Jean and Keith Kaplan. Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 07/31/2019. [19-1677] (GRC) [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.