This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:03:08 (UTC).

Casey Tyler v. Katy Poole

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Casey Tyler filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Katy Poole. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7025

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CAROL TORES, Captain, Individual capacity

KATY POOLE, Individual and official capacity

THORNE LOCKLEAR, Correctional officer, individual capacity

JERRY INGRAM, JR., Unit Manager, Individual capacity

RONALD E. COVINGTON, Captain, Individual capacity

WILLIAM BULLARD, Individual and official capacity

Plaintiff / Appellant

CASEY RAFAEL TYLER

Butner, NC 27509

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Yvonne Bulluck Ricci

Attorney at NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 629

Raleigh, NC 27602-0629

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Casey Rafael Tyler

Attorney at POLK CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

P. O. Box 2500

Butner, NC 27509

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/29/2019. [19-7025] JSN [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:48 AM]

#2

(#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Casey Rafael Tyler ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Casey Tyler. [19-7025] JSN [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:46 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-01142-WO-JLW. Case manager: JeffNeal. [19-7025] JSN [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:43 AM]

#6

(#6) ORDER filed [1000556127] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [5]. Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Casey Rafael Tyler, #1124017. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Casey Tyler. [19-7025] JSN [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:26 PM]

#3

(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 08/08/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. Mailed to: Casey Tyler.[19-7025] JSN [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:47 AM]

#8

(#8) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Casey Rafael Tyler. [19-7025] JSN [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:20 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Casey Rafael Tyler. [19-7025] JSN [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • (#7) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-01142-WO-JLW. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-7025] JSN [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER filed [1000556127] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [5]. Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Casey Rafael Tyler, #1124017. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Casey Tyler. [19-7025] JSN [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • (#5) PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Casey Rafael Tyler. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: Yes. [19-7025] JSN [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/29/2019. [19-7025] JSN [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 08/08/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. Mailed to: Casey Tyler.[19-7025] JSN [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Casey Rafael Tyler ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Casey Tyler. [19-7025] JSN [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-01142-WO-JLW. Case manager: JeffNeal. [19-7025] JSN [Entered: 07/15/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.