This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/27/2023 at 08:59:29 (UTC).

Serendipity at Sea, LLC v. Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to P

Case Summary

On 09/28/2023 Serendipity at Sea, LLC filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to P. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-13176

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

SERENDIPITY AT SEA, LLC

Defendant / Appellee

UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 187581

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Robert Ader

Elizabeth B. Hitt

Susan Zetta Jorgensen

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Andrew Nicholas Mescolotto

John Hearring Wilbur III

Darlene Mondi Lidondici

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Juan C. Martinez

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Darlene Lidondici Appeallee Lloyds of London Related cases? No. [23-13176] (ECF: Darlene Lidondici) [Entered: 10/27/2023 10:27 AM]

#23

(#23) Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. The AOC form does not list named parties represented. [Entered: 10/27/2023 10:06 AM]

#22

(#22) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Darlene M Lidondici Appealle. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-13176] (ECF: Darlene Lidondici) [Entered: 10/26/2023 05:30 PM]

#21

(#21) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Darlene M Lidondici Appellee Related cases? No. [23-13176] (ECF: Darlene Lidondici) [Entered: 10/26/2023 05:28 PM]

#19

(#19) Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/07/2023. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 10/20/2023 10:32 AM]

#18

(#18) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Elizabeth B. Hitt for Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 10/20/2023 10:31 AM]

#17

(#17) Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Robert Ader for Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. [Entered: 10/20/2023 10:28 AM]

#16

(#16) Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. ***CIP AND WEB CIP FILED*** [Entered: 10/20/2023 10:28 AM]

#6

(#6) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Elizabeth B. Hitt for Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [23-13176] (ECF: Elizabeth Hitt) [Entered: 10/04/2023 05:17 PM]

#5

(#5) ***NO ACTION TAKEN - Filed by someone who is not currently a member of this bar*** Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Elizabeth B. Hitt for Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-13176]--[Edited 10/13/2023 by KJK] (ECF: Elizabeth Hitt) [Entered: 10/04/2023 05:16 PM]

#4

(#4) ***NO ACTION TAKEN - Filed by someone who is not currently a member of this bar*** Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Elizabeth B. Hitt for Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. Related cases? No. [23-13176]--[Edited 10/13/2023 by KJK] (ECF: Elizabeth Hitt) [Entered: 10/04/2023 05:14 PM]

#3

(#3) ***NO ACTION TAKEN*** APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert Ader for Serendipity at Sea, LLC. Related cases? No. [23-13176]--[Edited 10/05/2023 by LDB] (ECF: Elizabeth Hitt) [Entered: 10/04/2023 04:54 PM]

#2

(#2) ***NO ACTION TAKEN**** APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elizabeth B. Hitt for Serendipity at Sea, LLC. Related cases? No. [23-13176]--[Edited 10/05/2023 by LDB] (ECF: Elizabeth Hitt) [Entered: 10/04/2023 04:53 PM]

1 #5

23-13176 DC Judgment doc#256

1 #4

23-13176 DC Order doc#255

1 #3

23-13176 DC Order doc#200

1 #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

#1

CIVIL - Notice of Docketing

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Darlene Lidondici Appeallee Lloyds of London Related cases? No. [23-13176] (ECF: Darlene Lidondici) [Entered: 10/27/2023 10:27 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

Docket(#24) NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (CIP) DEFICIENCY issued to Darlene Mondi Lidondici for Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy Number 187581. You have failed to complete the Web-Based CIP on the Court's website. If you are an appellant or petitioner, pursuant to 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-5(c) and 42-1(b), this appeal will be dismissed without further notice upon the expiration of 14 days from the date of this notice unless you both remedy the default(s) AND file a motion to remedy the default(s). [Entered: 10/27/2023 10:12 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. The AOC form does not list named parties represented. [Entered: 10/27/2023 10:06 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Darlene M Lidondici Appealle. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-13176] (ECF: Darlene Lidondici) [Entered: 10/26/2023 05:30 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Darlene M Lidondici Appellee Related cases? No. [23-13176] (ECF: Darlene Lidondici) [Entered: 10/26/2023 05:28 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

Docket(#20) Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Robert Ader for Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. Appellants brief due on 12/07/2023 as to Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. Appendix due seven (7) days after the Brief. Any request for a second or subsequent extension of time shall be subject to 11th Cir. R. 31-2(d). [Entered: 10/26/2023 02:01 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/07/2023. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 10/20/2023 10:32 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Elizabeth B. Hitt for Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [Entered: 10/20/2023 10:31 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Robert Ader for Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. [Entered: 10/20/2023 10:28 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. ***CIP AND WEB CIP FILED*** [Entered: 10/20/2023 10:28 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
10/13/2023

Docket(#10) Notice of deficient Appearance of Counsel filed by Robert Ader for Serendipity at Sea, LLC and Elizabeth B. Hitt for Serendipity at Sea, LLC. Pursuant to FRAP 25(a)(2)(B)(iii) a person cannot electronically file through another person's account. Please resubmit through the appropriate account of the ECF filer reflected on the signature block of the filed document. Bar admission fee is still due. [Entered: 10/13/2023 01:54 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ***NO ACTION TAKEN-see FRAP 25(a)(2)(B)(iii)*** APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elizabeth B. Hitt for Serendipity at Sea, LLC. Related cases? No. [23-13176]--[Edited 10/13/2023 by KJK] (ECF: Robert Ader) [Entered: 10/11/2023 03:38 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert Ader for Serendipity at Sea, LLC. Related cases? No. [23-13176] (ECF: Robert Ader) [Entered: 10/11/2023 02:44 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Robert Ader for Serendipity at Sea, LLC and Elizabeth B. Hitt for Serendipity at Sea, LLC is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. See FRAP 46, and the accompanying circuit rules. [Entered: 10/05/2023 09:45 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Elizabeth B. Hitt for Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [23-13176] (ECF: Elizabeth Hitt) [Entered: 10/04/2023 05:17 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ***NO ACTION TAKEN - Filed by someone who is not currently a member of this bar*** Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Elizabeth B. Hitt for Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [23-13176]--[Edited 10/13/2023 by KJK] (ECF: Elizabeth Hitt) [Entered: 10/04/2023 05:16 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ***NO ACTION TAKEN - Filed by someone who is not currently a member of this bar*** Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Elizabeth B. Hitt for Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. Related cases? No. [23-13176]--[Edited 10/13/2023 by KJK] (ECF: Elizabeth Hitt) [Entered: 10/04/2023 05:14 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ***NO ACTION TAKEN*** APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert Ader for Serendipity at Sea, LLC. Related cases? No. [23-13176]--[Edited 10/05/2023 by LDB] (ECF: Elizabeth Hitt) [Entered: 10/04/2023 04:54 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ***NO ACTION TAKEN**** APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elizabeth B. Hitt for Serendipity at Sea, LLC. Related cases? No. [23-13176]--[Edited 10/05/2023 by LDB] (ECF: Elizabeth Hitt) [Entered: 10/04/2023 04:53 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC on 09/27/2023. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/12/2023 as to Appellant Serendipity at Sea, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/26/2023 as to Appellee Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy Number 187581 [Entered: 09/28/2023 02:12 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less