This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/15/2023 at 21:46:12 (UTC).

In re: Centripetal Networks, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/23/2023 In re Centripetal Networks, LLC was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-127

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

 

Party Details

Petitioner

In re: CENTRIPETAL NETWORKS, LLC

Respondents

PALO ALTO NETWORKS, INC.

CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.

KEYSIGHT TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

KATHERINE K. VIDAL, Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Matthew James Dowd

Robert James Scheffel

Respondent Attorneys

Douglas Hallward-Driemeier Esq.

James Richard Batchelder Esq.

Scott Anthony McKeown

Andrew T. Radsch

Debra Janece McComas

Theodore M. Foster

David L. McCombs Esq.

Angela M. Oliver

Gerard M. Donovan

Jonah D. Mitchell

Robert J. McManus Esq.

Thomas W. Krause

Farheena Yasmeen Rasheed

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) Amended Entry of Appearance for Robert J. McManus as counsel for Respondent Katherine K. Vidal. Service: 06/08/2023 by email. [928784] [23-127] [Robert McManus] [Entered: 06/08/2023 04:11 PM]

#27

(#27) Notice from Respondent Katherine K. Vidal of Withdrawal of Counsel. Service: 06/08/2023 by email. [928783] [23-127] [Robert McManus] [Entered: 06/08/2023 04:10 PM]

#26

(#26) ORDER filed denying [ # 2 ] Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Centripetal Networks, LLC. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [923644] [NL] [Entered: 05/16/2023 09:45 AM]

#25

(#25) MODIFIED ENTRY: Citation of Supplemental Authority pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) for Petitioner Centripetal Networks, LLC. Service: 05/01/2023 by email. [920372]--[Edited 05/02/2023 by JCA - Reason: to correct filing event] [Matthew Dowd] [Entered: 05/01/2023 06:14 PM]

#24

(#24) MODIFIED ENTRY: REPLY of Petitioner Centripetal Networks, LLC to response [ # 19 ], response [ # 18 ]. Service: 04/28/2023 by email. [919997]--[Edited 05/01/2023 by JCA - Reason: to correct filing event] [Matthew Dowd] [Entered: 04/28/2023 05:31 PM]

#23

(#23) ORDER filed denying [ # 21 ] the motion. Centripetal's corrected reply, not to exceed 3,900 words, is due no later than Friday, April 28, 2023. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [919240] [LMS] [Entered: 04/26/2023 01:12 PM]

#21

(#21) MOTION of Petitioner Centripetal Networks, LLC Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Word Limit for Petitioner's Reply in Support of the Petition for Mandamus. Service: 04/25/2023 by email. [919123] [23-127] [Matthew Dowd] [Entered: 04/25/2023 11:20 PM]

#19

(#19) RESPONSE of Respondent Palo Alto Networks, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc. and Keysight Technologies, Inc. to Doc No. [ # 2 ]. Service: 04/21/2023 by email. [918395] [23-127] [Douglas Hallward-Driemeier] [Entered: 04/21/2023 05:06 PM]

#18

(#22) MODIFIED ENTRY: REPLY of Petitioner Centripetal Networks, LLC to response [ # 19 ], response [ # 18 ]. Service: 04/25/2023 by email. [919127]--[Edited 04/26/2023 by JCA - Reason: to correct filing event] [Matthew Dowd] [Entered: 04/25/2023 11:30 PM]

#8

(#8) RESPONSE of Petitioner Centripetal Networks, LLC to Doc No. [ # 7 ]. Service: 03/26/2023 by email. [912283] [23-127] [Matthew Dowd] [Entered: 03/26/2023 10:51 PM]

#7

(#9) ORDER filed granting motion to extend time to file [ # 7 ] to the extent that the responses from the Director, Palo Alto Networks, Cisco, and Keysight are due no later than April 21, 2023. Any reply in support of Centripetal's petition is due no later than April 25, 2023. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [912431] [LMS] [Entered: 03/27/2023 01:18 PM]

#6

(#6) Entry of Appearance for Molly R. Silfen; Thomas W. Krause; Farheena Y. Rasheed; Robert J. McManus as counsel for the Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 03/24/2023 by email. [912265] [23-127] [Molly Silfen] [Entered: 03/24/2023 05:03 PM]

#5

(#5) ORDER filed directing the Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office, Palo Alto Networks, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., and Keysight Technologies, Inc. to respond to the petition [ # 2 ] no later than seven days from the date of filing of this order. Any reply in support of the petition is due no later than three days from the date of filing of the last-filed response. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [912086] [LMS] [Entered: 03/24/2023 09:41 AM]

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interest for Petitioner Centripetal Networks, LLC. Service: 03/23/2023 by email. [911985] [23-127] [Matthew Dowd] [Entered: 03/23/2023 04:25 PM]

#3

(#3) Entry of Appearance for Matthew J. Dowd; Robert J. Scheffel as counsel for Petitioner Centripetal Networks, LLC. Service: 03/23/2023 by email. [911983] [23-127] [Matthew Dowd] [Entered: 03/23/2023 04:23 PM]

#2

Appendix

2 #1

Petition for Writ of Mandamus

#1

(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 03/23/2023. [911881] Entry of Appearance due 04/06/2023. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/06/2023. [KMH] [Entered: 03/23/2023 01:17 PM]

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) Amended Entry of Appearance for Robert J. McManus as counsel for Respondent Katherine K. Vidal. Service: 06/08/2023 by email. [928784] [23-127] [Robert McManus] [Entered: 06/08/2023 04:11 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) Notice from Respondent Katherine K. Vidal of Withdrawal of Counsel. Service: 06/08/2023 by email. [928783] [23-127] [Robert McManus] [Entered: 06/08/2023 04:10 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) ORDER filed denying [ # 2 ] Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Centripetal Networks, LLC. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [923644] [NL] [Entered: 05/16/2023 09:45 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) MODIFIED ENTRY: Citation of Supplemental Authority pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28(j) for Petitioner Centripetal Networks, LLC. Service: 05/01/2023 by email. [920372]--[Edited 05/02/2023 by JCA - Reason: to correct filing event] [Matthew Dowd] [Entered: 05/01/2023 06:14 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) MODIFIED ENTRY: REPLY of Petitioner Centripetal Networks, LLC to response [ # 19 ], response [ # 18 ]. Service: 04/28/2023 by email. [919997]--[Edited 05/01/2023 by JCA - Reason: to correct filing event] [Matthew Dowd] [Entered: 04/28/2023 05:31 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) ORDER filed denying [ # 21 ] the motion. Centripetal's corrected reply, not to exceed 3,900 words, is due no later than Friday, April 28, 2023. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [919240] [LMS] [Entered: 04/26/2023 01:12 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) MODIFIED ENTRY: REPLY of Petitioner Centripetal Networks, LLC to response [ # 19 ], response [ # 18 ]. Service: 04/25/2023 by email. [919127]--[Edited 04/26/2023 by JCA - Reason: to correct filing event] [Matthew Dowd] [Entered: 04/25/2023 11:30 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) MOTION of Petitioner Centripetal Networks, LLC Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Word Limit for Petitioner's Reply in Support of the Petition for Mandamus. Service: 04/25/2023 by email. [919123] [23-127] [Matthew Dowd] [Entered: 04/25/2023 11:20 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX FILED by Respondent Palo Alto Networks, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., Keysight Technologies, Inc. and Katherine K. Vidal. Service: 04/21/2023 by email. [918396] [23-127] [Douglas Hallward-Driemeier] [Entered: 04/21/2023 05:10 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) RESPONSE of Respondent Palo Alto Networks, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc. and Keysight Technologies, Inc. to Doc No. [ # 2 ]. Service: 04/21/2023 by email. [918395] [23-127] [Douglas Hallward-Driemeier] [Entered: 04/21/2023 05:06 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Entry of Appearance for Debra J. McComas; Theodore M. Foster; David L. McCombs; Angela M. Oliver as counsel for Respondent Cisco Systems, Inc.. Service: 04/03/2023 by email. [914121] [23-127] [Debra McComas] [Entered: 04/03/2023 05:37 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER filed granting motion to extend time to file [ # 7 ] to the extent that the responses from the Director, Palo Alto Networks, Cisco, and Keysight are due no later than April 21, 2023. Any reply in support of Centripetal's petition is due no later than April 25, 2023. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [912431] [LMS] [Entered: 03/27/2023 01:18 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) RESPONSE of Petitioner Centripetal Networks, LLC to Doc No. [ # 7 ]. Service: 03/26/2023 by email. [912283] [23-127] [Matthew Dowd] [Entered: 03/26/2023 10:51 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION of the Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office to extend time. Service: 03/24/2023 by email. [912267] [23-127] [Molly Silfen] [Entered: 03/24/2023 05:10 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Entry of Appearance for Molly R. Silfen; Thomas W. Krause; Farheena Y. Rasheed; Robert J. McManus as counsel for the Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 03/24/2023 by email. [912265] [23-127] [Molly Silfen] [Entered: 03/24/2023 05:03 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER filed directing the Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office, Palo Alto Networks, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., and Keysight Technologies, Inc. to respond to the petition [ # 2 ] no later than seven days from the date of filing of this order. Any reply in support of the petition is due no later than three days from the date of filing of the last-filed response. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [912086] [LMS] [Entered: 03/24/2023 09:41 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Petitioner Centripetal Networks, LLC. Service: 03/23/2023 by email. [911985] [23-127] [Matthew Dowd] [Entered: 03/23/2023 04:25 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Entry of Appearance for Matthew J. Dowd; Robert J. Scheffel as counsel for Petitioner Centripetal Networks, LLC. Service: 03/23/2023 by email. [911983] [23-127] [Matthew Dowd] [Entered: 03/23/2023 04:23 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) PETITION of Petitioner Centripetal Networks, LLC for Writ of Mandamus pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 21. Service: 03/23/2023 by US mail. [911886] [KMH] [Entered: 03/23/2023 01:24 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 03/23/2023. [911881] Entry of Appearance due 04/06/2023. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/06/2023. [KMH] [Entered: 03/23/2023 01:17 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less